Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 3415 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16821 Week
» 69837 Month
» 189364 Year
» 3216217 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Scrap Merchant: National Coal Board
Locomotives
Type |
Company |
Class |
Wheels |
Number when Cut |
Date Built |
Date Withdrawn |
Service (yrs) |
Awaiting Scrap (yrs) |
|
Depot on Withdrawal |
Date Scrapped |
Age (yrs) |
Diesel |
BR |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12050 |
17/02/1949 |
11/07/1970 |
21.408 |
1.348 |
|
|
11/1971 |
22.756 |
Diesel |
BR |
05 |
0-6-0 |
D2616 |
17/03/1961 |
30/12/1967 |
6.792 |
5.463 |
|
|
06/1973 |
12.255 |
Diesel |
BR |
D2/12 |
0-6-0 |
D2518 |
22/11/1961 |
25/02/1967 |
5.263 |
6.307 |
|
|
06/1973 |
11.570 |
Diesel |
BR |
05 |
0-6-0 |
D2598 |
30/06/1960 |
30/12/1967 |
7.504 |
7.378 |
|
|
05/1975 |
14.882 |
Diesel |
BR |
D2/12 |
0-6-0 |
D2513 |
05/10/1961 |
19/08/1967 |
5.874 |
8.162 |
|
|
10/1975 |
14.036 |
Diesel |
BR |
10 |
0-6-0 |
D3638 |
24/11/1958 |
07/11/1970 |
11.962 |
4.940 |
|
|
10/1975 |
16.901 |
Diesel |
BR |
04 |
0-6-0 |
D2326 |
02/06/1961 |
20/08/1968 |
7.222 |
7.493 |
|
|
02/1976 |
14.715 |
Diesel |
BR |
05 |
0-6-0 |
D2611 |
16/01/1961 |
30/12/1967 |
6.956 |
8.885 |
|
|
11/1976 |
15.841 |
Diesel |
BR |
05 |
0-6-0 |
D2613 |
21/02/1961 |
30/12/1967 |
6.858 |
9.466 |
|
|
06/1977 |
16.323 |
Diesel |
BR |
04 |
0-6-0 |
D2336 |
24/08/1961 |
15/07/1968 |
6.896 |
9.595 |
|
|
02/1978 |
16.490 |
Diesel |
BR |
04 |
0-6-0 |
D2213 |
23/10/1954 |
17/08/1968 |
13.827 |
9.504 |
|
|
02/1978 |
23.332 |
Diesel |
BR |
10 |
0-6-0 |
D4074 |
24/08/1961 |
23/04/1972 |
10.671 |
6.315 |
31B |
March |
08/1978 |
16.986 |
Diesel |
BR |
04 |
0-6-0 |
D2208 |
14/02/1953 |
27/07/1968 |
15.458 |
10.058 |
|
|
08/1978 |
25.515 |
Diesel |
BR |
02 |
0-4-0 |
D2862 |
14/10/1961 |
31/12/1969 |
8.219 |
9.293 |
|
|
04/1979 |
17.512 |
Diesel |
BR |
14 |
0-6-0 |
D9545 |
08/06/1965 |
01/04/1968 |
2.816 |
11.293 |
50B |
Hull Dairycoates |
07/1979 |
14.110 |
Diesel |
BR |
14 |
0-6-0 |
D9511 |
17/09/1964 |
01/04/1968 |
3.540 |
11.293 |
50B |
Hull Dairycoates |
07/1979 |
14.833 |
Diesel |
BR |
04 |
0-6-0 |
D2335 |
27/07/1961 |
08/07/1968 |
6.953 |
11.614 |
|
|
02/1980 |
18.567 |
Diesel |
BR |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12120 |
20/09/1952 |
28/12/1968 |
16.282 |
11.219 |
|
|
03/1980 |
27.501 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3038 |
28/11/1953 |
30/12/1972 |
19.101 |
7.378 |
9A |
Longsight |
05/1980 |
26.479 |
Diesel |
BR |
04 |
0-6-0 |
D2274 |
10/07/1959 |
17/05/1969 |
9.860 |
11.340 |
|
|
09/1980 |
21.200 |
Diesel |
BR |
05 |
0-6-0 |
D2599 |
08/07/1960 |
30/12/1967 |
7.482 |
13.384 |
|
|
05/1981 |
20.866 |
Diesel |
BR |
14 |
0-6-0 |
D9528 |
21/01/1965 |
02/03/1969 |
4.112 |
12.797 |
|
|
12/1981 |
16.910 |
Diesel |
BR |
03 |
0-6-0 |
D2373 |
02/08/1961 |
11/05/1968 |
6.778 |
13.852 |
9D |
Newton Heath |
03/1982 |
20.630 |
Diesel |
BR |
14 |
0-6-0 |
D9530 |
02/02/1965 |
05/10/1968 |
3.674 |
13.868 |
|
|
08/1982 |
17.542 |
Diesel |
BR |
04 |
0-6-0 |
D2238 |
10/05/1956 |
27/07/1968 |
12.222 |
14.312 |
|
|
11/1982 |
26.534 |
Diesel |
BR |
10 |
0-6-0 |
D4056 |
11/02/1961 |
11/06/1972 |
11.337 |
10.764 |
40B |
Immingham |
03/1983 |
22.101 |
Diesel |
BR |
14 |
0-6-0 |
D9508 |
07/09/1964 |
05/10/1968 |
4.079 |
15.288 |
|
|
01/1984 |
19.367 |
Diesel |
BR |
14 |
0-6-0 |
D9517 |
12/11/1964 |
05/10/1968 |
3.899 |
15.288 |
|
|
01/1984 |
19.186 |
Diesel |
BR |
14 |
0-6-0 |
D9527 |
18/01/1965 |
03/05/1969 |
4.290 |
14.712 |
|
|
01/1984 |
19.003 |
Diesel |
BR |
14 |
0-6-0 |
D9535 |
08/03/1965 |
21/12/1968 |
3.792 |
15.077 |
|
|
01/1984 |
18.868 |
Diesel |
BR |
14 |
0-6-0 |
D9540 |
22/04/1965 |
01/04/1968 |
2.945 |
15.800 |
50B |
Hull Dairycoates |
01/1984 |
18.745 |
Diesel |
BR |
10 |
0-6-0 |
D3613 |
27/06/1958 |
15/03/1969 |
10.723 |
16.096 |
|
|
04/1985 |
26.819 |
Diesel |
BR |
10 |
0-6-0 |
D3618 |
21/08/1958 |
19/04/1969 |
10.668 |
16.000 |
|
|
04/1985 |
26.668 |
Diesel |
BR |
10 |
0-6-0 |
D3619 |
26/08/1958 |
15/03/1969 |
10.559 |
16.096 |
|
|
04/1985 |
26.655 |
Diesel |
BR |
04 |
0-6-0 |
D2225 |
15/10/1955 |
19/04/1969 |
13.521 |
16.249 |
|
|
07/1985 |
29.770 |
Diesel |
BR |
04 |
0-6-0 |
D2322 |
28/03/1961 |
08/08/1968 |
7.370 |
17.197 |
|
|
10/1985 |
24.567 |
Diesel |
BR |
04 |
0-6-0 |
D2300 |
24/10/1960 |
17/05/1969 |
8.567 |
16.425 |
|
|
10/1985 |
24.992 |
Diesel |
BR |
04 |
0-6-0 |
D2209 |
14/03/1953 |
27/07/1968 |
15.381 |
17.230 |
|
|
10/1985 |
32.611 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08073 |
06/11/1954 |
01/12/1973 |
19.082 |
11.879 |
|
|
10/1985 |
30.962 |
Diesel |
BR |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12133 |
13/12/1952 |
01/02/1969 |
16.148 |
16.797 |
|
|
11/1985 |
32.945 |
Diesel |
BR |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12119 |
20/09/1952 |
18/11/1968 |
16.173 |
17.003 |
|
|
11/1985 |
33.175 |
Diesel |
BR |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12084 |
09/12/1950 |
16/05/1971 |
20.447 |
14.512 |
|
|
11/1985 |
34.959 |
Diesel |
BR |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12060 |
11/11/1949 |
07/02/1971 |
21.255 |
14.781 |
9A |
Longsight |
11/1985 |
36.036 |
Diesel |
BR |
10 |
0-6-0 |
D4072 |
26/07/1961 |
23/04/1972 |
10.751 |
13.573 |
31B |
March |
11/1985 |
24.323 |
Diesel |
BR |
14 |
0-6-0 |
D9536 |
16/03/1965 |
03/05/1969 |
4.134 |
16.630 |
|
|
12/1985 |
20.764 |
Diesel |
BR |
14 |
0-6-0 |
D9514 |
06/10/1964 |
03/05/1969 |
4.575 |
16.630 |
|
|
12/1985 |
21.205 |
Diesel |
BR |
10 |
0-6-0 |
D4068 |
10/05/1961 |
11/06/1972 |
11.096 |
13.521 |
40B |
Immingham |
12/1985 |
24.616 |
Diesel |
BR |
10 |
0-6-0 |
D4069 |
25/05/1961 |
23/04/1972 |
10.921 |
13.655 |
41J |
Shirebrook |
12/1985 |
24.575 |
Diesel |
BR |
10 |
0-6-0 |
D4070 |
05/06/1961 |
23/04/1972 |
10.890 |
13.655 |
41J |
Shirebrook |
12/1985 |
24.545 |
Diesel |
BR |
04 |
0-6-0 |
D2328 |
06/06/1961 |
16/09/1968 |
7.285 |
17.838 |
|
|
07/1986 |
25.123 |
Diesel |
BR |
04 |
0-6-0 |
D2332 |
10/07/1961 |
06/1969 |
7.937 |
17.093 |
|
|
07/1986 |
25.030 |
Diesel |
BR |
04 |
0-6-0 |
D2317 |
22/02/1961 |
30/09/1969 |
8.608 |
16.970 |
|
|
09/1986 |
25.578 |
Diesel |
BR |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12063 |
12/12/1949 |
01/01/1972 |
22.068 |
15.882 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
11/1987 |
37.951 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3183 |
24/10/1955 |
30/12/1972 |
17.197 |
14.967 |
82C |
Swindon |
12/1987 |
32.164 |