Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 9 Today
» 954 Yesterday
» 2870 Week
» 21652 Month
» 269945 Year
» 1154326 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Scrapyard: National Coal Board Ashington


Locomotives
Type Company Class Wheels Number when Cut Date Built Date Withdrawn Service (yrs) Awaiting Scrap (yrs) Depot on Withdrawal Date Scrapped Age (yrs)
Diesel BR 10 0-6-0 D3638 24/11/1958 07/11/1970 11.962 4.901     01/10/1975 16.863
Diesel BR 14 0-6-0 D9511 17/09/1964 01/04/1968 3.540 11.255 50B Hull Dairycoates 01/07/1979 14.795
Diesel BR 14 0-6-0 D9545 08/06/1965 01/04/1968 2.816 11.255 50B Hull Dairycoates 01/07/1979 14.071
Diesel BR 14 0-6-0 D9528 21/01/1965 09/11/1968 3.803 13.068     01/12/1981 16.871
Diesel BR 14 0-6-0 D9508 07/09/1964 05/10/1968 4.079 15.249     01/01/1984 19.329
Diesel BR 14 0-6-0 D9517 12/11/1964 05/10/1968 3.899 15.249     01/01/1984 19.148
Diesel BR 14 0-6-0 D9527 18/01/1965 03/05/1969 4.290 14.674     01/01/1984 18.964
Diesel BR 14 0-6-0 D9535 08/03/1965 21/12/1968 3.792 15.038     01/01/1984 18.830
Diesel BR 14 0-6-0 D9540 22/04/1965 01/04/1968 2.945 15.762 50B Hull Dairycoates 01/01/1984 18.707
Diesel BR 14 0-6-0 D9514 06/10/1964 03/05/1969 4.575 16.592     01/12/1985 21.167
Diesel BR 14 0-6-0 D9536 16/03/1965 03/05/1969 4.134 16.592     01/12/1985 20.726