Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 2064 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19867 Week
» 72883 Month
» 192410 Year
» 3219263 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Scrapyard: National Coal Board Philadelphia
Locomotives
Type |
Company |
Class |
Wheels |
Number when Cut |
Date Built |
Date Withdrawn |
Service (yrs) |
Awaiting Scrap (yrs) |
|
Depot on Withdrawal |
Date Scrapped |
Age (yrs) |
Diesel |
BR |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12050 |
17/02/1949 |
11/07/1970 |
21.408 |
1.348 |
|
|
11/1971 |
22.756 |
Diesel |
BR |
05 |
0-6-0 |
D2598 |
30/06/1960 |
30/12/1967 |
7.504 |
7.378 |
|
|
05/1975 |
14.882 |
Diesel |
BR |
10 |
0-6-0 |
D4074 |
24/08/1961 |
23/04/1972 |
10.671 |
6.315 |
31B |
March |
08/1978 |
16.986 |
Diesel |
BR |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12120 |
20/09/1952 |
28/12/1968 |
16.282 |
11.219 |
|
|
03/1980 |
27.501 |
Diesel |
BR |
10 |
0-6-0 |
D4072 |
26/07/1961 |
23/04/1972 |
10.751 |
13.573 |
31B |
March |
11/1985 |
24.323 |
Diesel |
BR |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12060 |
11/11/1949 |
07/02/1971 |
21.255 |
14.781 |
9A |
Longsight |
11/1985 |
36.036 |
Diesel |
BR |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12084 |
09/12/1950 |
16/05/1971 |
20.447 |
14.512 |
|
|
11/1985 |
34.959 |
Diesel |
BR |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12119 |
20/09/1952 |
18/11/1968 |
16.173 |
17.003 |
|
|
11/1985 |
33.175 |
Diesel |
BR |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12133 |
13/12/1952 |
01/02/1969 |
16.148 |
16.797 |
|
|
11/1985 |
32.945 |