Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 1429 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14835 Week
» 67851 Month
» 187378 Year
» 3214231 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Scrapyard: Ron Hull Jr. Rotherham
Locomotives
Type |
Company |
Class |
Wheels |
Number when Cut |
Date Built |
Date Withdrawn |
Service (yrs) |
Awaiting Scrap (yrs) |
|
Depot on Withdrawal |
Date Scrapped |
Age (yrs) |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08350 |
07/12/1957 |
17/01/1984 |
26.129 |
|
CF |
Cardiff Canton |
|
|
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31549 |
10/05/1962 |
01/03/1996 |
33.833 |
8.967 |
|
|
02/2005 |
42.800 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47471 |
29/06/1964 |
31/12/2004 |
40.534 |
0.099 |
|
|
05/02/2005 |
40.633 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47285 |
29/01/1966 |
31/12/2004 |
38.948 |
0.099 |
|
|
05/02/2005 |
39.047 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47547 |
19/12/1964 |
01/03/1996 |
31.219 |
9.044 |
|
|
03/2005 |
40.263 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47574 |
22/10/1964 |
01/12/1996 |
32.132 |
8.542 |
|
|
06/2005 |
40.674 |
Electric |
BR |
86 |
Bo-Bo |
86227 |
27/09/1965 |
10/2004 |
39.077 |
0.792 |
|
|
31/07/2005 |
39.868 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08931 |
26/04/1962 |
30/06/2005 |
43.208 |
0.126 |
|
|
08/2005 |
43.334 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08914 |
31/08/1962 |
30/06/2005 |
42.860 |
0.126 |
|
|
08/2005 |
42.986 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08901 |
18/05/1962 |
26/06/1998 |
36.132 |
7.142 |
|
|
08/2005 |
43.274 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08893 |
20/03/1962 |
26/06/1998 |
36.293 |
7.142 |
|
|
08/2005 |
43.436 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08882 |
30/08/1961 |
30/06/2005 |
43.863 |
0.126 |
|
|
08/2005 |
43.989 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08758 |
08/02/1961 |
30/06/2005 |
44.419 |
0.126 |
|
|
08/2005 |
44.545 |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31511 |
16/03/1961 |
30/11/2005 |
44.740 |
-0.041 |
|
|
11/2005 |
44.699 |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31558 |
12/04/1962 |
01/01/1996 |
33.745 |
9.962 |
|
|
12/2005 |
43.707 |
Diesel |
BR |
56 |
Co-Co |
56066 |
11/12/1979 |
12/2005 |
26.030 |
0.000 |
|
|
12/2005 |
26.030 |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31417 |
30/08/1962 |
30/11/2005 |
43.282 |
0.126 |
|
|
01/2006 |
43.408 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47628 |
20/02/1965 |
01/05/1997 |
32.214 |
8.877 |
|
|
03/2006 |
41.090 |
Electric |
BR |
86 |
Bo-Bo |
86256 |
21/01/1966 |
10/2002 |
36.756 |
3.378 |
|
|
01/03/2006 |
40.134 |
Electric |
BR |
86 |
Bo-Bo |
86214 |
19/06/1965 |
10/2002 |
37.348 |
3.405 |
|
|
11/03/2006 |
40.753 |
Electric |
BR |
86 |
Bo-Bo |
86225 |
21/08/1965 |
07/2002 |
36.923 |
3.721 |
|
|
03/04/2006 |
40.644 |
Electric |
BR |
86 |
Bo-Bo |
86207 |
27/09/1965 |
07/2002 |
36.822 |
3.734 |
|
|
08/04/2006 |
40.556 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47644 |
16/12/1965 |
01/10/2003 |
37.816 |
2.622 |
|
|
05/2006 |
40.438 |
Electric |
BR |
86 |
Bo-Bo |
86224 |
15/12/1965 |
07/2002 |
36.605 |
3.797 |
|
|
01/05/2006 |
40.403 |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31154 |
17/12/1959 |
31/05/2006 |
46.485 |
0.123 |
|
|
07/2006 |
46.608 |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31462 |
12/07/1962 |
01/04/1998 |
35.745 |
8.293 |
|
|
07/2006 |
44.038 |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31524 |
23/12/1959 |
01/05/1996 |
36.381 |
10.296 |
|
|
08/2006 |
46.677 |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31533 |
03/11/1960 |
01/07/1995 |
34.679 |
11.216 |
|
|
09/2006 |
45.896 |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31507 |
18/08/1960 |
31/05/2006 |
45.814 |
0.375 |
|
|
10/2006 |
46.189 |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31512 |
23/03/1961 |
31/05/2006 |
45.219 |
0.375 |
|
|
10/2006 |
45.595 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47704 |
07/04/1966 |
01/05/1997 |
31.088 |
9.630 |
|
|
12/2006 |
40.718 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47348 |
05/03/1965 |
30/11/2006 |
41.767 |
0.041 |
|
|
12/2006 |
41.808 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47803 |
22/12/1966 |
01/04/1995 |
28.293 |
11.885 |
|
|
02/2007 |
40.178 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47345 |
11/03/1965 |
30/06/2006 |
41.332 |
0.666 |
|
|
28/02/2007 |
41.997 |
Electric |
BR |
86 |
Bo-Bo |
86606 |
24/08/1965 |
11/2003 |
38.252 |
3.545 |
|
|
01/06/2007 |
41.797 |
Electric |
BR |
86 |
Bo-Bo |
86620 |
27/09/1965 |
09/2005 |
39.995 |
1.710 |
|
|
01/06/2007 |
41.704 |
Electric |
BR |
86 |
Bo-Bo |
86615 |
28/10/1965 |
04/2005 |
39.490 |
2.211 |
|
|
01/07/2007 |
41.701 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47809 |
16/12/1964 |
01/06/2002 |
37.482 |
5.375 |
|
|
10/2007 |
42.858 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47587 |
17/09/1965 |
01/08/2003 |
37.896 |
4.293 |
|
|
11/2007 |
42.189 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47819 |
09/04/1964 |
01/02/2004 |
39.841 |
3.871 |
|
|
12/2007 |
43.712 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47559 |
29/07/1964 |
01/01/2003 |
38.452 |
5.041 |
|
|
01/2008 |
43.493 |
Diesel |
BR |
37 |
Co-Co |
37420 |
21/07/1965 |
01/07/2000 |
34.970 |
7.630 |
|
|
02/2008 |
42.600 |
Diesel |
BR |
37 |
Co-Co |
37695 |
25/07/1963 |
01/03/2004 |
40.630 |
4.126 |
|
|
04/2008 |
44.756 |
Electric |
BR |
86 |
Bo-Bo |
86240 |
26/10/1965 |
10/2002 |
36.995 |
5.540 |
|
|
28/04/2008 |
42.534 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47528 |
25/02/1967 |
29/02/2008 |
41.038 |
0.208 |
|
|
05/2008 |
41.247 |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31107 |
09/04/1959 |
31/10/2008 |
49.597 |
0.537 |
|
|
05/2009 |
50.134 |