Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 849 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18652 Week
» 71668 Month
» 191195 Year
» 3218048 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Scrapyard: T J Thomson and Son Ltd. Stockton
Locomotives
Type |
Company |
Class |
Wheels |
Number when Cut |
Date Built |
Date Withdrawn |
Service (yrs) |
Awaiting Scrap (yrs) |
|
Depot on Withdrawal |
Date Scrapped |
Age (yrs) |
Steam |
LNER |
O1 |
2-8-0 |
63663 |
08/1918 |
01/11/1964 |
46.247 |
|
41H |
Staveley (G.C.) |
|
|
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47150 |
19/06/1964 |
31/07/2008 |
44.145 |
|
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08402 |
23/05/1958 |
30/09/2008 |
50.392 |
|
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08813 |
25/07/1960 |
13/09/1981 |
21.151 |
|
TI |
Tinsley |
|
|
Diesel |
BR |
56 |
Co-Co |
56070 |
21/12/1979 |
02/2004 |
24.170 |
|
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
BR |
56 |
Co-Co |
56107 |
16/05/1982 |
01/2004 |
21.682 |
|
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
BR |
56 |
Co-Co |
56109 |
15/08/1982 |
12/2003 |
21.348 |
|
|
|
|
|
Steam |
WD |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
90067 |
06/1944 |
05/10/1964 |
20.321 |
0.279 |
|
|
01/1965 |
20.600 |
Steam |
WD |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
90098 |
01/1945 |
10/11/1964 |
19.833 |
0.266 |
|
|
02/1965 |
20.099 |
Steam |
WD |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
90656 |
09/1944 |
01/02/1965 |
20.395 |
0.115 |
|
|
03/1965 |
20.510 |
Steam |
LNER |
V2 |
2-6-2 |
60884 |
27/10/1939 |
06/09/1965 |
25.879 |
0.107 |
51A |
Darlington |
10/1965 |
25.986 |
Steam |
LNER |
V2 |
2-6-2 |
60885 |
10/11/1939 |
06/09/1965 |
25.841 |
0.107 |
51A |
Darlington |
10/1965 |
25.948 |
Steam |
WD |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
90518 |
03/1945 |
16/02/1966 |
20.940 |
0.241 |
|
|
05/1966 |
21.181 |
Steam |
WD |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
90593 |
12/1943 |
24/07/1966 |
22.622 |
0.227 |
|
|
10/1966 |
22.849 |
Steam |
WD |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
90082 |
09/1944 |
24/07/1966 |
21.868 |
0.227 |
|
|
10/1966 |
22.096 |
Steam |
WD |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
90445 |
03/1944 |
24/07/1966 |
22.373 |
0.227 |
|
|
10/1966 |
22.600 |
Steam |
BR |
Std 9F |
2-10-0 |
92063 |
30/11/1955 |
24/11/1966 |
10.992 |
0.389 |
|
|
04/1967 |
11.381 |
Steam |
BR |
Std 9F |
2-10-0 |
92064 |
31/12/1955 |
24/11/1966 |
10.907 |
0.389 |
|
|
04/1967 |
11.296 |
Steam |
BR |
Std 9F |
2-10-0 |
92106 |
30/09/1956 |
29/07/1967 |
10.833 |
0.381 |
|
|
12/1967 |
11.214 |
Steam |
BR |
Std 9F |
2-10-0 |
92078 |
31/03/1956 |
06/05/1967 |
11.104 |
0.696 |
|
|
01/1968 |
11.800 |
Steam |
BR |
Std 9F |
2-10-0 |
92121 |
28/02/1957 |
29/07/1967 |
10.419 |
0.466 |
|
|
01/1968 |
10.885 |
Steam |
BR |
Std 9F |
2-10-0 |
92133 |
30/06/1957 |
22/07/1967 |
10.066 |
0.485 |
|
|
01/1968 |
10.551 |
Steam |
BR |
Std 9F |
2-10-0 |
92154 |
31/10/1957 |
22/07/1967 |
9.729 |
0.485 |
|
|
01/1968 |
10.214 |
Steam |
BR |
Std 9F |
2-10-0 |
92159 |
30/11/1957 |
22/07/1967 |
9.647 |
0.485 |
|
|
01/1968 |
10.132 |
Diesel |
BR |
35 |
B-B |
D7089 |
23/07/1963 |
06/05/1973 |
9.795 |
2.781 |
BR |
Bristol Bath Road |
02/1976 |
12.575 |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31135 |
24/09/1959 |
04/02/2000 |
40.392 |
-0.055 |
|
|
01/2000 |
40.337 |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31248 |
08/12/1960 |
31/03/2000 |
39.337 |
-0.044 |
|
|
03/2000 |
39.293 |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31250 |
15/12/1960 |
11/02/2000 |
39.184 |
0.090 |
|
|
03/2000 |
39.274 |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31268 |
18/05/1961 |
11/02/2000 |
38.762 |
0.090 |
|
|
03/2000 |
38.852 |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31276 |
13/07/1961 |
11/02/2000 |
38.608 |
0.090 |
|
|
03/2000 |
38.699 |
Diesel |
BR |
56 |
Co-Co |
56013 |
01/08/1977 |
17/12/1993 |
16.389 |
7.751 |
|
|
09/2001 |
24.140 |
Diesel |
BR |
37 |
Co-Co |
37184 |
14/11/1963 |
19/05/2000 |
36.537 |
1.367 |
|
|
30/09/2001 |
37.904 |
Diesel |
BR |
37 |
Co-Co |
37330 |
07/06/1963 |
01/02/1997 |
33.679 |
4.789 |
|
|
11/2001 |
38.468 |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31553 |
04/06/1959 |
01/11/1995 |
36.436 |
6.126 |
|
|
12/2001 |
42.562 |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31185 |
21/04/1960 |
31/03/2000 |
39.970 |
1.710 |
|
|
12/2001 |
41.679 |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31205 |
30/06/1960 |
18/02/2000 |
39.663 |
2.405 |
|
|
07/2002 |
42.068 |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31402 |
25/02/1960 |
20/03/1992 |
32.088 |
10.663 |
|
|
11/2002 |
42.751 |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31224 |
15/09/1960 |
30/06/2000 |
39.816 |
2.378 |
|
|
11/2002 |
42.195 |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31547 |
28/12/1961 |
01/01/1996 |
34.033 |
6.877 |
|
|
11/2002 |
40.910 |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31546 |
18/07/1962 |
01/11/1995 |
33.312 |
7.458 |
|
|
04/2003 |
40.770 |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31181 |
31/03/1960 |
13/03/2003 |
42.978 |
0.173 |
|
|
05/2003 |
43.151 |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31209 |
14/07/1960 |
15/05/2003 |
42.863 |
0.000 |
|
|
05/2003 |
42.863 |
Diesel |
BR |
37 |
Co-Co |
37213 |
07/01/1964 |
23/04/2003 |
39.318 |
0.030 |
|
|
04/05/2003 |
39.348 |
Diesel |
BR |
37 |
Co-Co |
37278 |
23/04/1965 |
16/05/2003 |
38.088 |
0.022 |
|
|
24/05/2003 |
38.110 |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31403 |
10/03/1960 |
04/02/2000 |
39.932 |
3.362 |
|
|
06/2003 |
43.293 |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31180 |
24/03/1960 |
03/03/2000 |
39.970 |
3.285 |
|
|
06/2003 |
43.255 |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31187 |
28/04/1960 |
03/03/2000 |
39.874 |
3.285 |
|
|
06/2003 |
43.159 |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31219 |
25/08/1960 |
18/02/2000 |
39.510 |
3.323 |
|
|
06/2003 |
42.833 |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31247 |
08/12/1960 |
04/02/2000 |
39.184 |
3.362 |
|
|
06/2003 |
42.545 |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31569 |
20/07/1961 |
01/02/1995 |
33.559 |
8.373 |
|
|
06/2003 |
41.932 |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31116 |
11/06/1959 |
04/02/2000 |
40.679 |
3.444 |
|
|
07/2003 |
44.123 |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31158 |
31/12/1959 |
07/07/2000 |
40.545 |
3.022 |
|
|
07/2003 |
43.567 |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31184 |
14/04/1960 |
04/02/2000 |
39.836 |
3.444 |
|
|
07/2003 |
43.279 |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31531 |
05/01/1961 |
01/01/1995 |
34.011 |
8.540 |
|
|
07/2003 |
42.551 |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31290 |
09/11/1961 |
04/02/2000 |
38.263 |
3.444 |
|
|
07/2003 |
41.707 |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31294 |
14/12/1961 |
04/02/2000 |
38.167 |
3.444 |
|
|
07/2003 |
41.611 |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31232 |
20/10/1960 |
26/05/2000 |
39.625 |
3.222 |
|
|
08/2003 |
42.847 |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31178 |
17/03/1960 |
23/06/2000 |
40.296 |
3.312 |
|
|
10/2003 |
43.608 |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31112 |
14/05/1959 |
01/05/1997 |
37.992 |
6.545 |
|
|
11/2003 |
44.537 |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31132 |
24/09/1959 |
16/06/2000 |
40.756 |
3.416 |
|
|
11/2003 |
44.173 |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31142 |
29/10/1959 |
05/05/2000 |
40.545 |
3.614 |
|
|
12/2003 |
44.159 |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31171 |
18/02/1960 |
31/10/2003 |
43.729 |
0.123 |
|
|
12/2003 |
43.852 |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31199 |
09/06/1960 |
05/05/2000 |
39.932 |
3.614 |
|
|
12/2003 |
43.545 |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31149 |
26/11/1959 |
05/05/2000 |
40.468 |
3.699 |
|
|
01/2004 |
44.167 |
Diesel |
BR |
37 |
Co-Co |
37139 |
03/05/1963 |
31/10/2003 |
40.523 |
0.329 |
|
|
28/02/2004 |
40.852 |
Diesel |
BR |
56 |
Co-Co |
56039 |
07/02/1978 |
01/2004 |
25.953 |
0.164 |
|
|
03/2004 |
26.118 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47318 |
21/01/1965 |
30/07/1993 |
28.540 |
10.967 |
|
|
07/2004 |
39.507 |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31155 |
17/12/1959 |
26/05/2000 |
40.468 |
4.310 |
|
|
09/2004 |
44.778 |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31237 |
03/11/1960 |
16/06/2000 |
39.644 |
4.252 |
|
|
09/2004 |
43.896 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47519 |
09/09/1966 |
30/06/2005 |
38.833 |
0.274 |
|
|
08/10/2005 |
39.107 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47474 |
07/07/1964 |
30/06/2005 |
41.008 |
0.378 |
|
|
11/2005 |
41.386 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47585 |
29/10/1964 |
01/02/2004 |
39.285 |
2.118 |
|
|
03/2006 |
41.403 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08906 |
22/06/1962 |
31/08/2005 |
43.222 |
0.830 |
|
|
30/06/2006 |
44.052 |
Diesel |
BR |
37 |
Co-Co |
37137 |
24/04/1963 |
31/05/2006 |
43.132 |
0.123 |
|
|
07/2006 |
43.255 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47326 |
25/01/1965 |
31/08/2006 |
41.625 |
0.123 |
|
|
10/2006 |
41.748 |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31526 |
19/05/1960 |
01/05/1995 |
34.973 |
11.551 |
|
|
11/2006 |
46.523 |
Diesel |
BR |
56 |
Co-Co |
56061 |
09/08/1979 |
11/2006 |
27.288 |
0.082 |
|
|
12/2006 |
27.370 |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31460 |
04/05/1961 |
01/12/1992 |
31.600 |
14.132 |
|
|
01/2007 |
45.732 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47229 |
23/09/1965 |
31/12/2006 |
41.299 |
0.203 |
|
|
03/2007 |
41.501 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47824 |
30/10/1964 |
01/09/2003 |
38.863 |
3.622 |
|
|
04/2007 |
42.485 |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31110 |
30/04/1959 |
31/05/2006 |
47.118 |
0.874 |
|
|
04/2007 |
47.992 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08534 |
28/04/1959 |
31/08/2005 |
46.375 |
1.704 |
|
|
05/2007 |
48.079 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08576 |
20/06/1959 |
30/04/2006 |
46.893 |
1.041 |
|
|
05/2007 |
47.934 |
Diesel |
BR |
37 |
Co-Co |
37358 |
31/01/1963 |
01/03/1997 |
34.104 |
10.211 |
|
|
05/2007 |
44.315 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08675 |
27/06/1959 |
31/08/2005 |
46.211 |
1.830 |
|
|
30/06/2007 |
48.041 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08768 |
13/04/1961 |
31/08/2005 |
44.414 |
1.830 |
|
|
30/06/2007 |
46.244 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08806 |
25/06/1960 |
31/08/2005 |
45.214 |
1.830 |
|
|
30/06/2007 |
47.044 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08867 |
17/10/1960 |
31/08/2005 |
44.901 |
1.830 |
|
|
30/06/2007 |
46.732 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08506 |
06/06/1958 |
28/02/2007 |
48.764 |
0.375 |
|
|
07/2007 |
49.140 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08902 |
28/05/1962 |
28/02/2007 |
44.786 |
0.375 |
|
|
07/2007 |
45.162 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47302 |
14/11/1964 |
28/02/2007 |
42.318 |
0.460 |
|
|
08/2007 |
42.778 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47279 |
18/12/1965 |
28/02/2007 |
41.225 |
0.460 |
|
|
08/2007 |
41.685 |
Diesel |
BR |
37 |
Co-Co |
37705 |
19/10/1962 |
01/12/1999 |
37.142 |
7.710 |
|
|
08/2007 |
44.852 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08792 |
07/05/1960 |
28/02/2007 |
46.844 |
0.586 |
|
|
30/09/2007 |
47.430 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08894 |
29/03/1962 |
28/02/2007 |
44.951 |
0.586 |
|
|
30/09/2007 |
45.537 |
Diesel |
BR |
37 |
Co-Co |
37520 |
07/06/1962 |
01/06/2002 |
40.011 |
5.375 |
|
|
10/2007 |
45.386 |
Diesel |
BR |
37 |
Co-Co |
37351 |
19/12/1960 |
01/12/1999 |
38.975 |
7.962 |
|
|
11/2007 |
46.937 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08720 |
10/06/1960 |
28/02/2007 |
46.751 |
0.753 |
|
|
30/11/2007 |
47.504 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08942 |
07/06/1962 |
28/02/2007 |
44.759 |
0.753 |
|
|
30/11/2007 |
45.512 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47303 |
07/11/1964 |
28/02/2007 |
42.337 |
0.795 |
|
|
12/2007 |
43.132 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08883 |
08/09/1961 |
28/02/2007 |
45.504 |
0.795 |
|
|
12/2007 |
46.299 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08910 |
02/08/1962 |
28/02/2007 |
44.605 |
0.795 |
|
|
12/2007 |
45.400 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47197 |
05/06/1965 |
28/02/2007 |
41.762 |
0.879 |
|
|
01/2008 |
42.641 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47475 |
17/07/1964 |
31/01/2003 |
38.567 |
5.123 |
|
|
03/2008 |
43.690 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47033 |
25/08/1964 |
31/12/2007 |
43.378 |
0.205 |
|
|
03/2008 |
43.584 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08526 |
27/02/1959 |
28/02/2007 |
48.036 |
1.044 |
|
|
03/2008 |
49.079 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08599 |
09/05/1959 |
31/12/2007 |
48.679 |
0.205 |
|
|
03/2008 |
48.885 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47316 |
06/01/1965 |
31/12/2007 |
43.011 |
0.332 |
|
|
30/04/2008 |
43.342 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47200 |
19/06/1965 |
31/12/2007 |
42.562 |
0.373 |
|
|
05/2008 |
42.934 |
Diesel |
BR |
37 |
Co-Co |
37222 |
24/01/1964 |
31/07/2008 |
44.548 |
0.041 |
|
|
08/2008 |
44.589 |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31188 |
28/04/1960 |
24/01/1999 |
38.767 |
9.649 |
|
|
09/2008 |
48.416 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47309 |
10/12/1964 |
28/02/2007 |
42.247 |
1.967 |
|
|
02/2009 |
44.214 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08715 |
04/05/1960 |
30/09/2008 |
48.441 |
0.378 |
|
|
02/2009 |
48.819 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08900 |
14/05/1962 |
30/09/2008 |
46.414 |
0.378 |
|
|
02/2009 |
46.792 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47358 |
11/06/1965 |
28/02/2007 |
41.745 |
2.044 |
|
|
03/2009 |
43.789 |
Diesel |
BR |
10 |
0-6-0 |
D3476 |
24/12/1957 |
01/06/1968 |
10.444 |
40.814 |
|
|
03/2009 |
51.258 |
Diesel |
BR |
37 |
Co-Co |
37414 |
06/06/1965 |
01/03/2000 |
34.759 |
9.044 |
|
|
03/2009 |
43.803 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08489 |
07/11/1958 |
30/09/2008 |
49.932 |
0.622 |
|
|
05/2009 |
50.553 |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31166 |
25/01/1960 |
19/01/1999 |
39.011 |
10.411 |
|
|
06/2009 |
49.422 |
Diesel |
BR |
37 |
Co-Co |
37704 |
26/03/1962 |
01/10/2003 |
41.545 |
5.710 |
|
|
06/2009 |
47.255 |
Diesel |
BR |
56 |
Co-Co |
56021 |
17/06/1977 |
06/2008 |
31.016 |
1.082 |
|
|
07/2009 |
32.099 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47145 |
28/05/1964 |
01/02/2007 |
42.710 |
2.537 |
|
|
08/2009 |
45.247 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47370 |
23/07/1965 |
01/01/2003 |
37.468 |
6.625 |
|
|
08/2009 |
44.093 |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31423 |
02/06/1960 |
01/09/1996 |
36.274 |
13.047 |
|
|
09/2009 |
49.321 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08587 |
14/09/1959 |
30/09/2008 |
49.079 |
1.208 |
|
|
12/2009 |
50.288 |