Scrapyard: T W Ward Killamarsh
Type | Company | Class | Wheels | Number when Cut | Date Built | Date Withdrawn | Service (yrs) | Awaiting Scrap (yrs) | Depot on Withdrawal | Date Scrapped | Age (yrs) | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | LNER | O1 | 2-8-0 | 63786 | 06/1918 | 27/09/1964 | 46.318 | 41H | Staveley (G.C.) | |||
Steam | GCR | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63691 | 04/1918 | 20/06/1965 | 47.214 | 41J | Langwith Junction | |||
Steam | GCR | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63685 | 01/1918 | 31/03/1964 | 46.238 | 41H | Staveley (G.C.) | |||
Steam | LNER | O1 | 2-8-0 | 63670 | 09/1917 | 04/06/1964 | 46.751 | 41H | Staveley (G.C.) | |||
Steam | GCR | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63611 | 01/1914 | 26/03/1964 | 50.227 | 41H | Staveley (G.C.) | |||
Steam | LNER | O1 | 2-8-0 | 63773 | 08/1912 | 18/10/1964 | 52.211 | 41H | Staveley (G.C.) | |||
Steam | GCR | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63586 | 10/1911 | 03/10/1965 | 54.005 | 36C | Frodingham | |||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90102 | 05/02/1943 | 12/10/1963 | 20.696 | 0.260 | 01/1964 | 20.956 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90700 | 01/1945 | 14/02/1964 | 19.093 | 0.249 | 05/1964 | 19.342 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90224 | 05/1943 | 24/03/1964 | 20.874 | 0.310 | 07/1964 | 21.184 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90612 | 01/1944 | 01/03/1964 | 20.140 | 0.458 | 08/1964 | 20.597 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90145 | 06/1943 | 23/06/1964 | 21.038 | 0.312 | 10/1964 | 21.351 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90544 | 07/1943 | 11/06/1964 | 20.923 | 0.345 | 10/1964 | 21.268 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90411 | 02/1945 | 18/08/1964 | 19.518 | 0.244 | 11/1964 | 19.762 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90485 | 08/1944 | 09/08/1964 | 19.997 | 0.268 | 11/1964 | 20.266 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90311 | 03/1944 | 18/08/1964 | 20.441 | 0.244 | 11/1964 | 20.685 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90302 | 02/1944 | 18/08/1964 | 20.521 | 0.244 | 11/1964 | 20.764 | ||
Steam | LNER | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61269 | 24/12/1947 | 21/12/1963 | 16.003 | 0.986 | 9G | Gorton | 12/1964 | 16.989 |
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90129 | 04/1943 | 06/1964 | 21.184 | 0.586 | 01/1965 | 21.770 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 9F | 2-10-0 | 92170 | 31/12/1957 | 31/05/1964 | 6.419 | 0.627 | 01/1965 | 7.047 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 9F | 2-10-0 | 92169 | 31/12/1957 | 31/05/1964 | 6.419 | 0.627 | 01/1965 | 7.047 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90304 | 02/1944 | 07/09/1964 | 20.575 | 0.356 | 01/1965 | 20.932 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90354 | 08/1944 | 10/10/1964 | 20.167 | 0.351 | 02/1965 | 20.518 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90209 | 01/1943 | 06/1964 | 21.430 | 0.671 | 02/1965 | 22.101 | ||
Steam | LNER | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61369 | 16/05/1950 | 21/12/1963 | 13.608 | 1.156 | 9G | Gorton | 02/1965 | 14.764 |
Steam | BR | Std 9F | 2-10-0 | 92175 | 28/02/1958 | 31/05/1964 | 6.258 | 0.712 | 02/1965 | 6.970 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 9F | 2-10-0 | 92171 | 28/02/1958 | 31/05/1964 | 6.258 | 0.789 | 03/1965 | 7.047 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 9F | 2-10-0 | 92176 | 31/03/1958 | 31/05/1964 | 6.173 | 0.789 | 03/1965 | 6.962 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90486 | 08/1944 | 03/04/1965 | 20.647 | 0.282 | 07/1965 | 20.929 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90353 | 08/1944 | 22/02/1965 | 20.537 | 0.477 | 08/1965 | 21.014 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 9F | 2-10-0 | 92034 | 02/12/1954 | 31/05/1964 | 9.501 | 1.208 | 08/1965 | 10.710 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90146 | 06/1943 | 13/06/1965 | 22.011 | 0.173 | 08/1965 | 22.184 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90204 | 10/1943 | 19/06/1965 | 21.693 | 0.323 | 10/1965 | 22.016 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90171 | 08/1943 | 03/07/1965 | 21.899 | 0.285 | 10/1965 | 22.184 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90681 | 11/1944 | 03/07/1965 | 20.644 | 0.285 | 10/1965 | 20.929 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90474 | 06/1944 | 18/07/1965 | 21.104 | 0.244 | 10/1965 | 21.348 | ||
Steam | LNER | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61392 | 27/12/1951 | 20/06/1965 | 13.490 | 0.321 | 40E | Colwick | 10/1965 | 13.811 |
Steam | LNER | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61168 | 04/06/1947 | 03/10/1965 | 18.345 | 0.118 | 40B | Immingham | 11/1965 | 18.463 |
Steam | BR | Std 2MT | 2-6-0 | 78011 | 12/1953 | 18/09/1965 | 11.767 | 0.241 | 12/1965 | 12.008 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 9F | 2-10-0 | 92200 | 18/11/1958 | 03/10/1965 | 6.879 | 0.200 | 12/1965 | 7.079 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 9F | 2-10-0 | 92178 | 30/09/1957 | 03/10/1965 | 8.014 | 0.200 | 12/1965 | 8.214 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 2MT | 2-6-0 | 78042 | 25/12/1954 | 18/09/1965 | 10.740 | 0.241 | 12/1965 | 10.981 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 2MT | 2-6-0 | 78014 | 02/1954 | 18/09/1965 | 11.597 | 0.241 | 12/1965 | 11.838 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 9F | 2-10-0 | 92039 | 17/12/1954 | 17/10/1965 | 10.841 | 0.247 | 01/1966 | 11.088 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 3MT | 2-6-0 | 77001 | 11/02/1954 | 02/01/1966 | 11.899 | 0.121 | 02/1966 | 12.019 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 5MT | 4-6-0 | 73163 | 02/1957 | 20/11/1965 | 8.767 | 0.238 | 02/1966 | 9.005 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 4MT | 4-6-0 | 75025 | 29/04/1954 | 31/12/1965 | 11.682 | 0.288 | 04/1966 | 11.970 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 4MT | 4-6-0 | 75022 | 02/12/1953 | 31/12/1965 | 12.088 | 0.288 | 04/1966 | 12.375 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 4MT | 4-6-0 | 75008 | 05/10/1951 | 31/12/1965 | 14.249 | 0.288 | 04/1966 | 14.537 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 4MT | 4-6-0 | 75000 | 21/05/1951 | 31/12/1965 | 14.625 | 0.288 | 04/1966 | 14.912 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 2MT | 2-6-0 | 78034 | 10/1954 | 08/01/1966 | 11.241 | 0.266 | 04/1966 | 11.507 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 9F | 2-10-0 | 92035 | 03/12/1954 | 10/02/1966 | 11.197 | 0.175 | 04/1966 | 11.373 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 4MT | 4-6-0 | 75044 | 09/1953 | 12/03/1966 | 12.496 | 0.260 | 06/1966 | 12.756 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90054 | 04/1944 | 21/01/1967 | 22.784 | 0.145 | 03/1967 | 22.929 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 2MT | 2-6-0 | 78061 | 13/10/1956 | 12/11/1966 | 10.088 | 0.337 | 03/1967 | 10.425 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 2MT | 2-6-0 | 78064 | 11/1956 | 12/1966 | 10.088 | 0.247 | 03/1967 | 10.334 | ||
Steam | LNER | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61309 | 15/04/1948 | 23/01/1967 | 18.786 | 0.140 | 56A | Wakefield | 03/1967 | 18.926 |
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90465 | 05/1944 | 21/01/1967 | 22.701 | 0.145 | 03/1967 | 22.847 | ||
Steam | LNER | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61216 | 15/07/1947 | 23/01/1967 | 19.540 | 0.140 | 50A | York (North) | 03/1967 | 19.679 |
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90332 | 06/1944 | 21/01/1967 | 22.616 | 0.145 | 03/1967 | 22.762 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90503 | 09/1944 | 21/01/1967 | 22.364 | 0.230 | 04/1967 | 22.595 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 9F | 2-10-0 | 92124 | 31/03/1957 | 03/12/1966 | 9.682 | 0.364 | 04/1967 | 10.047 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 4MT | 2-6-0 | 76076 | 19/12/1956 | 26/11/1966 | 9.942 | 0.384 | 04/1967 | 10.326 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90645 | 06/1944 | 21/01/1967 | 22.616 | 0.230 | 04/1967 | 22.847 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90694 | 12/1944 | 21/01/1967 | 22.115 | 0.312 | 05/1967 | 22.427 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90680 | 11/1944 | 21/01/1967 | 22.197 | 0.312 | 05/1967 | 22.510 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 9F | 2-10-0 | 92105 | 30/09/1956 | 14/01/1967 | 10.296 | 0.332 | 05/1967 | 10.627 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 9F | 2-10-0 | 92031 | 11/11/1954 | 07/01/1967 | 12.164 | 0.351 | 05/1967 | 12.515 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 4MT | 4-6-0 | 75061 | 15/05/1957 | 04/02/1967 | 9.732 | 0.359 | 06/1967 | 10.090 | ||
Steam | LNER | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61138 | 31/03/1947 | 03/01/1965 | 17.775 | 2.866 | 34E | New England | 11/1967 | 20.641 |
Steam | LNER | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61337 | 12/08/1948 | 30/09/1967 | 19.145 | 0.126 | 55J | Low Moor | 11/1967 | 19.271 |
Steam | BR | Std 9F | 2-10-0 | 92117 | 31/12/1956 | 23/12/1967 | 10.984 | 0.312 | 04/1968 | 11.296 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 7P | 4-6-2 | 70024 | 06/10/1951 | 30/12/1967 | 16.244 | 0.321 | 25/04/1968 | 16.564 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 4MT | 4-6-0 | 75033 | 03/07/1953 | 30/12/1967 | 14.501 | 0.460 | 06/1968 | 14.962 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 4MT | 4-6-0 | 75016 | 03/01/1952 | 08/07/1967 | 15.521 | 0.940 | 06/1968 | 16.460 |