Works: Ashford Works
Company | Class | Wheels | Number as Built | Works Number | Date Built | Date Withdrawn |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SR | F1 | 4-4-0 | 1002 | 11/1886 | 12/06/1948 | |
SR | O1 | 0-6-0 | 1003 | 05/1896 | 01/1949 | |
SR | C | 0-6-0 | 1004 | 07/1901 | 11/1961 | |
SR | H | 0-4-4T | 1005 | 05/1907 | 09/1963 | |
SR | O1 | 0-6-0 | 1007 | 08/1899 | 05/1949 | |
SR | R1 | 0-6-0T | 1010 | 12/1890 | 08/1959 | |
SR | B1 | 4-4-0 | 1013 | 10/1898 | 09/1948 | |
SR | O1 | 0-6-0 | 1014 | 06/1893 | 12/06/1948 | |
SR | H | 0-4-4T | 1016 | 07/1915 | 07/1951 | |
SR | C | 0-6-0 | 1018 | 10/1900 | 01/1959 | |
SR | E1A | 4-4-0 | 1019 | 07/1908 | 04/1961 | |
SR | P | 0-6-0T | 1027 | 02/1910 | 03/1961 | |
SR | F1 | 4-4-0 | 1028 | 12/1889 | 08/05/1948 | |
SR | F1 | 4-4-0 | 1031 | 09/1894 | 01/05/1948 | |
SR | C | 0-6-0 | 1033 | 10/1900 | 03/1960 | |
SR | E | 4-4-0 | 1036 | 12/1908 | 03/1951 | |
SR | C | 0-6-0 | 1037 | 03/1901 | 02/1961 | |
SR | C | 0-6-0 | 1038 | 07/1901 | 03/1954 | |
SR | O1 | 0-6-0 | 1039 | 06/1897 | 08/1949 | |
SR | O1 | 0-6-0 | 1041 | 06/1893 | 05/1951 | |
SR | F1 | 4-4-0 | 1042 | 03/1896 | 01/1948 | |
SR | O1 | 0-6-0 | 1044 | 12/1898 | 06/1951 | |
SR | O1 | 0-6-0 | 1046 | 06/1894 | 10/1948 | |
SR | R1 | 0-6-0T | 1047 | 08/1895 | 03/1960 | |
SR | O1 | 0-6-0 | 1048 | 12/1893 | 15/10/1960 | |
SR | O1 | 0-6-0 | 1051 | 12/1898 | 08/1948 | |
SR | C | 0-6-0 | 1054 | 03/1901 | 1960 | |
SR | D | 4-4-0 | 1057 | 06/1902 | 04/1951 | |
SR | C | 0-6-0 | 1059 | 11/1902 | 02/1958 | |
SR | C | 0-6-0 | 1061 | 07/1901 | 07/1961 | |
SR | C | 0-6-0 | 1063 | 07/1900 | 04/1956 | |
SR | O1 | 0-6-0 | 1064 | 11/1896 | 05/1958 | |
SR | O1 | 0-6-0 | 1065 | 09/1896 | 06/1961 | |
SR | O1 | 0-6-0 | 1066 | 06/1897 | 06/1951 | |
SR | E1A | 4-4-0 | 1067 | 08/1908 | 11/11/1961 | |
SR | C | 0-6-0 | 1068 | 01/1903 | 10/1961 | |
SR | R1 | 0-6-0T | 1069 | 06/1898 | 06/1958 | |
SR | C | 0-6-0 | 1071 | 07/1901 | 09/1959 | |
SR | F1 | 4-4-0 | 1078 | 12/1886 | 03/1949 | |
SR | O1 | 0-6-0 | 1080 | 06/1897 | 08/1949 | |
SR | C | 0-6-0 | 1086 | 09/1900 | 22/10/1960 | |
SR | C | 0-6-0 | 1090 | 01/1903 | 08/1953 | |
SR | O1 | 0-6-0 | 1093 | 11/1897 | 05/1951 | |
SR | C | 0-6-0 | 1102 | 09/1900 | 05/1960 | |
SR | F1 | 4-4-0 | 1105 | 03/1896 | 02/1949 | |
SR | O1 | 0-6-0 | 1106 | 05/1894 | 01/1949 | |
SR | R1 | 0-6-0T | 1107 | 06/1898 | 08/1959 | |
SR | O1 | 0-6-0 | 1108 | 06/1897 | 07/1951 | |
SR | O1 | 0-6-0 | 1109 | 05/1896 | 01/1949 | |
SR | C | 0-6-0 | 1112 | 09/1900 | 05/05/1962 | |
SR | C | 0-6-0 | 1113 | 03/1902 | 07/1961 | |
SR | O1 | 0-6-0 | 1123 | 05/1896 | 01/1950 | |
SR | R1 | 0-6-0T | 1127 | 08/1895 | 01/1949 | |
SR | R1 | 0-6-0T | 1128 | 10/1892 | 08/1959 | |
SR | R1 | 0-6-0T | 1147 | 11/1890 | 09/1958 | |
SR | C | 0-6-0 | 1150 | 11/1902 | 10/1961 | |
SR | F1 | 4-4-0 | 1151 | 10/1899 | 03/1949 | |
SR | R1 | 0-6-0T | 1154 | 07/1892 | 09/1955 | |
SR | E | 4-4-0 | 1157 | 12/1907 | 03/1951 | |
SR | H | 0-4-4T | 1158 | 12/1909 | 04/1955 | |
SR | E | 4-4-0 | 1159 | 11/1908 | 12/1951 | |
SR | E1A | 4-4-0 | 1160 | 07/1907 | 02/1951 | |
SR | H | 0-4-4T | 1161 | 06/1909 | 11/1961 | |
SR | H | 0-4-4T | 1162 | 03/1909 | 07/1961 | |
SR | E1A | 4-4-0 | 1163 | 04/1909 | 05/1949 | |
SR | H | 0-4-4T | 1164 | 02/1909 | 10/1959 | |
SR | E1A | 4-4-0 | 1165 | 12/1907 | 05/1959 | |
SR | E | 4-4-0 | 1166 | 07/1907 | 05/1955 | |
SR | R1 | 0-6-0T | 1174 | 10/1892 | 08/1959 | |
SR | E | 4-4-0 | 1175 | 08/1908 | 10/1951 | |
SR | E | 4-4-0 | 1176 | 12/1907 | 10/1951 | |
SR | H | 0-4-4T | 1177 | 03/1909 | 10/1961 | |
SR | P | 0-6-0T | 1178 | 02/1910 | 06/1958 | |
SR | E1A | 4-4-0 | 1179 | 11/1908 | 10/1950 | |
SR | H | 0-4-4T | 1182 | 06/1909 | 07/1951 | |
SR | H | 0-4-4T | 1184 | 04/1915 | 03/1958 | |
SR | C | 0-6-0 | 1191 | 07/1900 | 09/1959 | |
SR | H | 0-4-4T | 1193 | 12/1909 | 03/1961 | |
SR | F1 | 4-4-0 | 1215 | 10/1891 | 08/05/1948 | |
SR | B1 | 4-4-0 | 1217 | 10/1898 | 06/1950 | |
SR | C | 0-6-0 | 1218 | 12/1900 | 05/05/1962 | |
SR | C | 0-6-0 | 1219 | 12/1900 | 10/1959 | |
SR | C | 0-6-0 | 1221 | 03/1901 | 08/1959 | |
SR | C | 0-6-0 | 1223 | 03/1901 | 05/1960 | |
SR | C | 0-6-0 | 1225 | 12/1900 | 06/1955 | |
SR | C | 0-6-0 | 1227 | 12/1900 | 10/1959 | |
SR | C | 0-6-0 | 1229 | 01/1900 | 10/1961 | |
SR | F1 | 4-4-0 | 1231 | 10/1893 | 03/1949 | |
SR | C | 0-6-0 | 1234 | 04/1901 | 08/1953 | |
SR | O1 | 0-6-0 | 1238 | 06/1893 | 07/1949 | |
SR | H | 0-4-4T | 1239 | 11/1909 | 01/1960 | |
SR | C | 0-6-0 | 1242 | 04/1902 | 09/1961 | |
SR | C | 0-6-0 | 1243 | 04/1902 | 10/1959 | |
SR | C | 0-6-0 | 1244 | 04/1902 | 10/1961 | |
SR | C | 0-6-0 | 1245 | 12/1902 | 1959 | |
SR | D1 | 4-4-0 | 1246 | 06/1902 | 03/1961 | |
SR | D1 | 4-4-0 | 1247 | 04/1903 | 07/1961 | |
SR | O1 | 0-6-0 | 1248 | 05/1896 | 06/1951 | |
SR | C | 0-6-0 | 1252 | 12/1902 | 07/1959 | |
SR | C | 0-6-0 | 1253 | 01/1903 | 10/1959 | |
SR | C | 0-6-0 | 1255 | 06/1900 | 09/1961 | |
SR | C | 0-6-0 | 1256 | 06/1900 | 07/1961 | |
SR | C | 0-6-0 | 1257 | 06/1900 | 08/1949 | |
SR | O1 | 0-6-0 | 1258 | 11/1896 | 02/1961 | |
SR | H | 0-4-4T | 1259 | 11/1905 | 11/1959 | |
SR | C | 0-6-0 | 1260 | 08/1904 | 05/1953 | |
SR | H | 0-4-4T | 1261 | 11/1905 | 10/1961 | |
SR | H | 0-4-4T | 1263 | 05/1905 | 01/1964 | |
SR | H | 0-4-4T | 1265 | 05/1905 | 08/1960 | |
SR | H | 0-4-4T | 1266 | 05/1905 | 01/10/1960 | |
SR | C | 0-6-0 | 1267 | 01/1904 | 30/06/1962 | |
SR | C | 0-6-0 | 1268 | 02/1904 | 05/05/1962 | |
SR | H | 0-4-4T | 1269 | 11/1905 | 12/1959 | |
SR | C | 0-6-0 | 1270 | 06/1904 | 06/1959 | |
SR | C | 0-6-0 | 1271 | 12/1904 | 07/1963 | |
SR | C | 0-6-0 | 1272 | 02/1904 | 08/1959 | |
SR | E | 4-4-0 | 1273 | 02/1906 | 12/1951 | |
SR | H | 0-4-4T | 1274 | 06/1905 | 11/1957 | |
SR | E | 4-4-0 | 1275 | 02/1906 | 03/1951 | |
SR | H | 0-4-4T | 1276 | 06/1905 | 02/1961 | |
SR | C | 0-6-0 | 1277 | 02/1904 | 09/1955 | |
SR | H | 0-4-4T | 1278 | 07/1905 | 06/10/1962 | |
SR | H | 0-4-4T | 1279 | 11/1909 | 09/1959 | |
SR | C | 0-6-0 | 1280 | 02/1908 | 07/1963 | |
SR | C | 0-6-0 | 1287 | 05/1908 | 08/10/1960 | |
SR | C | 0-6-0 | 1291 | 02/1908 | 05/1953 | |
SR | C | 0-6-0 | 1293 | 06/1908 | 05/05/1962 | |
SR | C | 0-6-0 | 1294 | 06/1908 | 10/1955 | |
SR | H | 0-4-4T | 1295 | 12/1909 | 05/1959 | |
SR | C | 0-6-0 | 1297 | 06/1908 | 09/1959 | |
SR | C | 0-6-0 | 1298 | 03/1908 | 11/1960 | |
SR | H | 0-4-4T | 1305 | 05/1906 | 17/11/1962 | |
SR | H | 0-4-4T | 1306 | 05/1906 | 30/12/1961 | |
SR | H | 0-4-4T | 1307 | 12/1906 | 08/1961 | |
SR | H | 0-4-4T | 1308 | 06/1906 | 23/12/1962 | |
SR | H | 0-4-4T | 1309 | 06/1906 | 06/1955 | |
SR | H | 0-4-4T | 1310 | 06/1906 | 05/1960 | |
SR | H | 0-4-4T | 1311 | 05/1907 | 06/11/1954 | |
SR | E | 4-4-0 | 1315 | 04/1909 | 03/1954 | |
SR | O1 | 0-6-0 | 1316 | 05/1894 | 06/1949 | |
SR | C | 0-6-0 | 1317 | 03/1908 | 24/02/1962 | |
SR | H | 0-4-4T | 1319 | 12/1909 | 01/1960 | |
SR | H | 0-4-4T | 1320 | 05/1907 | 12/1955 | |
SR | H | 0-4-4T | 1321 | 12/1906 | 11/1957 | |
SR | H | 0-4-4T | 1322 | 06/1909 | 04/1961 | |
SR | P | 0-6-0T | 1323 | 07/1910 | 07/1960 | |
SR | H | 0-4-4T | 1324 | 05/1907 | 28/07/1962 | |
SR | P | 0-6-0T | 1325 | 07/1910 | 03/1960 | |
SR | H | 0-4-4T | 1326 | 12/1906 | 10/1961 | |
SR | H | 0-4-4T | 1327 | 06/1907 | 11/1959 | |
SR | H | 0-4-4T | 1328 | 12/1906 | 02/1961 | |
SR | H | 0-4-4T | 1329 | 12/1906 | 11/1959 | |
SR | R1 | 0-6-0T | 1335 | 06/1888 | 07/1955 | |
SR | R1 | 0-6-0T | 1337 | 06/1888 | 02/1960 | |
SR | R1 | 0-6-0T | 1339 | 02/1889 | 06/1958 | |
SR | R1 | 0-6-0T | 1340 | 03/1889 | 02/1959 | |
SR | N | 2-6-0 | 1400 | 07/1932 | 06/1964 | |
SR | N | 2-6-0 | 1401 | 08/1932 | 07/1965 | |
SR | N | 2-6-0 | 1402 | 08/1932 | 08/1963 | |
SR | N | 2-6-0 | 1403 | 08/1932 | 06/1963 | |
SR | N | 2-6-0 | 1404 | 10/1932 | 12/1963 | |
SR | N | 2-6-0 | 1405 | 11/1932 | 06/1966 | |
SR | N | 2-6-0 | 1406 | 01/1933 | 09/1964 | |
SR | N | 2-6-0 | 1407 | 08/1932 | 07/1963 | |
SR | N | 2-6-0 | 1408 | 09/1933 | 06/1966 | |
SR | N | 2-6-0 | 1409 | 10/1933 | 17/11/1962 | |
SR | N | 2-6-0 | 1410 | 11/1933 | 11/1964 | |
SR | N | 2-6-0 | 1411 | 11/1933 | 04/1966 | |
SR | N | 2-6-0 | 1412 | 12/1933 | 08/1964 | |
SR | N | 2-6-0 | 1413 | 01/1934 | 06/1964 | |
SR | N | 2-6-0 | 1414 | 01/1934 | 24/11/1962 | |
SR | D1 | 4-4-0 | 1470 | 08/1906 | 06/1959 | |
SR | D | 4-4-0 | 1477 | 03/1907 | 02/1951 | |
SR | D1 | 4-4-0 | 1487 | 07/1902 | 02/1961 | |
SR | D | 4-4-0 | 1488 | 07/1902 | 02/1956 | |
SR | D | 4-4-0 | 1490 | 08/1902 | 09/1951 | |
SR | E | 4-4-0 | 1491 | 07/1907 | 02/1953 | |
SR | C | 0-6-0 | 1495 | 06/1904 | 03/1961 | |
SR | D | 4-4-0 | 1496 | 03/1907 | 09/1955 | |
SR | E1A | 4-4-0 | 1497 | 09/1907 | 22/10/1960 | |
SR | C | 0-6-0 | 1498 | 06/1904 | 07/1961 | |
SR | H | 0-4-4T | 1500 | 11/1905 | 06/1961 | |
SR | H | 0-4-4T | 1503 | 12/1905 | 08/1959 | |
SR | E1A | 4-4-0 | 1504 | 12/1905 | 02/1958 | |
SR | D1 | 4-4-0 | 1505 | 02/1907 | 09/1961 | |
SR | E1A | 4-4-0 | 1506 | 12/1905 | 09/1958 | |
SR | E1A | 4-4-0 | 1507 | 09/1908 | 07/1961 | |
SR | C | 0-6-0 | 1508 | 07/1904 | 09/1957 | |
SR | D1 | 4-4-0 | 1509 | 09/1908 | 05/1960 | |
SR | C | 0-6-0 | 1510 | 07/1904 | 30/06/1962 | |
SR | E1A | 4-4-0 | 1511 | 12/1905 | 12/1950 | |
SR | H | 0-4-4T | 1512 | 01/1909 | 06/1961 | |
SR | C | 0-6-0 | 1513 | 06/1908 | 03/1955 | |
SR | E | 4-4-0 | 1514 | 12/1907 | 12/1951 | |
SR | E | 4-4-0 | 1515 | 09/1907 | 07/1951 | |
SR | E | 4-4-0 | 1516 | 04/1908 | 10/1951 | |
SR | H | 0-4-4T | 1517 | 01/1909 | 05/1961 | |
SR | H | 0-4-4T | 1518 | 07/1909 | 01/1964 | |
SR | H | 0-4-4T | 1519 | 07/1909 | 02/1961 | |
SR | H | 0-4-4T | 1520 | 06/1909 | 08/1960 | |
SR | H | 0-4-4T | 1521 | 08/1909 | 19/05/1962 | |
SR | H | 0-4-4T | 1522 | 08/1909 | 01/1963 | |
SR | H | 0-4-4T | 1523 | 09/1909 | 01/1959 | |
SR | H | 0-4-4T | 1530 | 07/1905 | 24/03/1962 | |
SR | H | 0-4-4T | 1531 | 07/1905 | 04/1955 | |
SR | H | 0-4-4T | 1532 | 07/1905 | 03/1951 | |
SR | H | 0-4-4T | 1533 | 07/1905 | 15/09/1962 | |
SR | H | 0-4-4T | 1540 | 11/1904 | 02/1960 | |
SR | H | 0-4-4T | 1541 | 11/1904 | 04/1951 | |
SR | H | 0-4-4T | 1542 | 11/1904 | 17/11/1962 | |
SR | H | 0-4-4T | 1543 | 01/1909 | 07/1963 | |
SR | H | 0-4-4T | 1544 | 11/1904 | 09/1963 | |
SR | D1 | 4-4-0 | 1545 | 09/1906 | 03/1961 | |
SR | H | 0-4-4T | 1546 | 11/1904 | 02/1951 | |
SR | E | 4-4-0 | 1547 | 09/1908 | 02/1951 | |
SR | H | 0-4-4T | 1548 | 12/1904 | 08/1959 | |
SR | D | 4-4-0 | 1549 | 09/1906 | 10/1956 | |
SR | H | 0-4-4T | 1550 | 11/1904 | 02/1961 | |
SR | H | 0-4-4T | 1551 | 01/1905 | 01/1964 | |
SR | H | 0-4-4T | 1552 | 01/1905 | 11/1961 | |
SR | H | 0-4-4T | 1553 | 02/1905 | 06/1961 | |
SR | H | 0-4-4T | 1554 | 12/1909 | 05/1959 | |
SR | P | 0-6-0T | 1555 | 06/1910 | 02/1955 | |
SR | P | 0-6-0T | 1556 | 02/1909 | 06/1961 | |
SR | P | 0-6-0T | 1557 | 02/1909 | 09/1957 | |
SR | P | 0-6-0T | 1558 | 06/1910 | 02/1960 | |
SR | C | 0-6-0 | 1572 | 09/1903 | 03/1954 | |
SR | C | 0-6-0 | 1573 | 09/1903 | 18/11/1961 | |
SR | D | 4-4-0 | 1574 | 02/1907 | 10/1956 | |
SR | C | 0-6-0 | 1575 | 09/1903 | 07/1961 | |
SR | C | 0-6-0 | 1576 | 05/1903 | 11/1959 | |
SR | D | 4-4-0 | 1577 | 09/1906 | 12/1956 | |
SR | C | 0-6-0 | 1578 | 10/1903 | 06/1961 | |
SR | C | 0-6-0 | 1579 | 10/1903 | 10/1961 | |
SR | C | 0-6-0 | 1581 | 05/1903 | 03/1960 | |
SR | C | 0-6-0 | 1582 | 06/1903 | 06/1958 | |
SR | C | 0-6-0 | 1584 | 06/1903 | 17/02/1962 | |
SR | C | 0-6-0 | 1585 | 06/1903 | 02/1959 | |
SR | D | 4-4-0 | 1586 | 02/1907 | 09/1955 | |
SR | E | 4-4-0 | 1587 | 02/1907 | 07/1951 | |
SR | C | 0-6-0 | 1588 | 03/1908 | 23/06/1962 | |
SR | C | 0-6-0 | 1589 | 03/1908 | 11/1961 | |
SR | C | 0-6-0 | 1590 | 07/1908 | 02/1961 | |
SR | D | 4-4-0 | 1591 | 03/1907 | 06/1955 | |
SR | J | 0-6-4T | 1595 | 10/1913 | 05/1951 | |
SR | J | 0-6-4T | 1596 | 10/1913 | 10/1951 | |
SR | J | 0-6-4T | 1597 | 11/1913 | 11/1950 | |
SR | J | 0-6-4T | 1598 | 11/1913 | 12/1950 | |
SR | J | 0-6-4T | 1599 | 12/1913 | 29/10/1949 | |
SR | U | 2-6-0 | 1620 | 11/1928 | 04/1965 | |
SR | U | 2-6-0 | 1621 | 12/1928 | 06/1964 | |
SR | U | 2-6-0 | 1622 | 01/1929 | 01/1964 | |
SR | U | 2-6-0 | 1623 | 01/1929 | 12/1963 | |
SR | U | 2-6-0 | 1624 | 02/1929 | 06/1964 | |
SR | U | 2-6-0 | 1625 | 03/1929 | 01/1964 | |
SR | U | 2-6-0 | 1626 | 03/1929 | 01/1964 | |
SR | U | 2-6-0 | 1627 | 04/1929 | 10/1965 | |
SR | U | 2-6-0 | 1628 | 04/1929 | 06/1964 | |
SR | U | 2-6-0 | 1629 | 12/1929 | 01/1964 | |
SR | U | 2-6-0 | 1630 | 02/1931 | 17/11/1962 | |
SR | U | 2-6-0 | 1631 | 03/1931 | 09/1963 | |
SR | U | 2-6-0 | 1632 | 03/1931 | 09/1964 | |
SR | U | 2-6-0 | 1633 | 03/1931 | 12/1963 | |
SR | U | 2-6-0 | 1634 | 04/1931 | 12/1963 | |
SR | U | 2-6-0 | 1635 | 04/1931 | 12/1963 | |
SR | U | 2-6-0 | 1636 | 04/1931 | 06/1963 | |
SR | U | 2-6-0 | 1637 | 05/1931 | 09/1963 | |
SR | U | 2-6-0 | 1638 | 05/1931 | 01/1964 | |
SR | U | 2-6-0 | 1639 | 05/1931 | 06/1966 | |
SR | R1 | 0-4-4T | 1696 | 11/1900 | 03/1951 | |
SR | R1 | 0-4-4T | 1697 | 11/1900 | 03/1953 | |
SR | R1 | 0-4-4T | 1698 | 11/1900 | 10/1955 | |
SR | R1 | 0-4-4T | 1699 | 11/1900 | 01/1950 | |
SR | R1 | 0-4-4T | 1700 | 11/1900 | 10/1952 | |
SR | R1 | 0-4-4T | 1703 | 11/1900 | 03/1954 | |
SR | R1 | 0-4-4T | 1704 | 11/1900 | 04/1956 | |
SR | R1 | 0-4-4T | 1705 | 11/1900 | 06/1951 | |
SR | R1 | 0-4-4T | 1706 | 12/1900 | 12/1952 | |
SR | R1 | 0-4-4T | 1707 | 12/1900 | 02/1949 | |
SR | R1 | 0-4-4T | 1708 | 12/1900 | 10/1952 | |
SR | R1 | 0-4-4T | 1709 | 12/1900 | 22/10/1949 | |
SR | R1 | 0-4-4T | 1710 | 12/1900 | 06/1951 | |
SR | D1 | 4-4-0 | 1736 | 12/1901 | 12/1950 | |
SR | D | 4-4-0 | 1737 | 11/1901 | 10/1956 | |
SR | D | 4-4-0 | 1738 | 12/1901 | 10/1950 | |
SR | D1 | 4-4-0 | 1739 | 02/1901 | 11/1961 | |
SR | D | 4-4-0 | 1740 | 12/1901 | 03/1951 | |
SR | U | 2-6-0 | 1797 | 07/1928 | 01/1964 | |
SR | U | 2-6-0 | 1798 | 08/1928 | 09/1964 | |
SR | U | 2-6-0 | 1799 | 07/1928 | 02/1965 | |
SR | U | 2-6-0 | 1800 | 12/1928 | 10/1965 | |
SR | U | 2-6-0 | 1801 | 07/1928 | 06/1964 | |
SR | U | 2-6-0 | 1802 | 07/1928 | 09/1964 | |
SR | U | 2-6-0 | 1805 | 03/1928 | 08/1963 | |
SR | N | 2-6-0 | 1810 | 06/1917 | 03/1964 | |
SR | N | 2-6-0 | 1811 | 06/1920 | 07/1965 | |
SR | N | 2-6-0 | 1812 | 08/1920 | 07/1964 | |
SR | N | 2-6-0 | 1813 | 09/1920 | 10/1963 | |
SR | N | 2-6-0 | 1814 | 11/1920 | 07/1964 | |
SR | N | 2-6-0 | 1815 | 12/1920 | 05/1963 | |
SR | N | 2-6-0 | 1816 | 01/1922 | 01/1966 | |
SR | N | 2-6-0 | 1817 | 01/1922 | 01/1964 | |
SR | N | 2-6-0 | 1818 | 03/1922 | 09/1963 | |
SR | N | 2-6-0 | 1819 | 05/1922 | 01/1964 | |
SR | N | 2-6-0 | 1820 | 08/1922 | 09/1963 | |
SR | N | 2-6-0 | 1821 | 10/1922 | 05/1964 | |
SR | N1 | 2-6-0 | 1822 | 05/1923 | 17/11/1962 | |
SR | N | 2-6-0 | 1823 | 08/1923 | 09/1963 | |
SR | N | 2-6-0 | 1824 | 12/1923 | 10/1963 | |
SR | N | 2-6-0 | 1825 | 06/1924 | 09/1963 | |
SR | N | 2-6-0 | 1826 | 05/1924 | 09/1963 | |
SR | N | 2-6-0 | 1827 | 06/1924 | 06/1964 | |
SR | N | 2-6-0 | 1828 | 07/1924 | 09/1964 | |
SR | N | 2-6-0 | 1829 | 06/1924 | 01/1964 | |
SR | N | 2-6-0 | 1830 | 06/1924 | 01/1964 | |
SR | N | 2-6-0 | 1831 | 07/1924 | 04/1965 | |
SR | N | 2-6-0 | 1832 | 07/1924 | 01/1964 | |
SR | N | 2-6-0 | 1833 | 07/1924 | 02/1964 | |
SR | N | 2-6-0 | 1834 | 07/1924 | 09/1964 | |
SR | N | 2-6-0 | 1835 | 07/1924 | 09/1964 | |
SR | N | 2-6-0 | 1836 | 07/1924 | 12/1963 | |
SR | N | 2-6-0 | 1837 | 07/1924 | 09/1964 | |
SR | N | 2-6-0 | 1838 | 07/1924 | 02/1964 | |
SR | N | 2-6-0 | 1839 | 08/1924 | 12/1963 | |
SR | N | 2-6-0 | 1840 | 08/1924 | 09/1964 | |
SR | N | 2-6-0 | 1841 | 08/1924 | 03/1964 | |
SR | N | 2-6-0 | 1842 | 08/1924 | 09/1965 | |
SR | N | 2-6-0 | 1843 | 08/1924 | 09/1964 | |
SR | N | 2-6-0 | 1844 | 08/1924 | 12/1963 | |
SR | N | 2-6-0 | 1845 | 09/1924 | 09/1964 | |
SR | N | 2-6-0 | 1846 | 09/1924 | 09/1964 | |
SR | N | 2-6-0 | 1847 | 01/1925 | 10/1963 | |
SR | N | 2-6-0 | 1848 | 02/1925 | 02/1964 | |
SR | N | 2-6-0 | 1849 | 02/1925 | 07/1964 | |
SR | N | 2-6-0 | 1850 | 02/1925 | 01/1964 | |
SR | N | 2-6-0 | 1851 | 02/1925 | 09/1963 | |
SR | N | 2-6-0 | 1852 | 03/1925 | 09/1963 | |
SR | N | 2-6-0 | 1853 | 04/1925 | 09/1964 | |
SR | N | 2-6-0 | 1854 | 03/1925 | 06/1964 | |
SR | N | 2-6-0 | 1855 | 03/1925 | 09/1964 | |
SR | N | 2-6-0 | 1856 | 03/1925 | 07/1964 | |
SR | N | 2-6-0 | 1857 | 04/1925 | 01/1964 | |
SR | N | 2-6-0 | 1858 | 05/1925 | 12/1965 | |
SR | N | 2-6-0 | 1859 | 04/1925 | 09/1964 | |
SR | N | 2-6-0 | 1860 | 04/1925 | 11/1963 | |
SR | N | 2-6-0 | 1861 | 06/1925 | 05/1963 | |
SR | N | 2-6-0 | 1862 | 05/1925 | 04/1965 | |
SR | N | 2-6-0 | 1863 | 05/1925 | 07/1963 | |
SR | N | 2-6-0 | 1864 | 06/1925 | 01/1964 | |
SR | N | 2-6-0 | 1865 | 06/1925 | 09/1963 | |
SR | N | 2-6-0 | 1866 | 05/1925 | 01/1966 | |
SR | N | 2-6-0 | 1867 | 06/1925 | 07/1963 | |
SR | N | 2-6-0 | 1868 | 07/1925 | 01/1964 | |
SR | N | 2-6-0 | 1869 | 07/1925 | 08/1964 | |
SR | N | 2-6-0 | 1870 | 07/1925 | 04/1964 | |
SR | N | 2-6-0 | 1871 | 07/1925 | 11/1963 | |
SR | N | 2-6-0 | 1872 | 08/1925 | 05/1963 | |
SR | N | 2-6-0 | 1873 | 09/1925 | 01/1966 | |
SR | N | 2-6-0 | 1874 | 09/1925 | 03/1964 | |
SR | N | 2-6-0 | 1875 | 08/1925 | 08/1964 | |
SR | N1 | 2-6-0 | 1876 | 03/1923 | 17/11/1962 | |
SR | N1 | 2-6-0 | 1877 | 04/1930 | 17/11/1962 | |
SR | N1 | 2-6-0 | 1878 | 04/1930 | 17/11/1962 | |
SR | N1 | 2-6-0 | 1879 | 04/1930 | 17/11/1962 | |
SR | N1 | 2-6-0 | 1880 | 11/1930 | 17/11/1962 | |
SR | U1 | 2-6-0 | 1890 | 06/1928 | 06/1963 | |
SR | W | 2-6-4T | 1916 | 04/1935 | 07/1963 | |
SR | W | 2-6-4T | 1917 | 04/1935 | 01/1964 | |
SR | W | 2-6-4T | 1918 | 06/1935 | 08/1963 | |
SR | W | 2-6-4T | 1919 | 07/1935 | 11/1963 | |
SR | W | 2-6-4T | 1920 | 08/1935 | 07/1963 | |
SR | W | 2-6-4T | 1921 | 10/1935 | 06/1963 | |
SR | W | 2-6-4T | 1922 | 11/1935 | 08/1963 | |
SR | W | 2-6-4T | 1923 | 01/1936 | 09/02/1963 | |
SR | W | 2-6-4T | 1924 | 02/1936 | 07/1964 | |
SR | W | 2-6-4T | 1925 | 04/1936 | 11/1963 | |
SR | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 17 | 05/1942 | 01/1964 | |
SR | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 18 | 04/1942 | 07/1965 | |
SR | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 19 | 05/1942 | 12/1963 | |
SR | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 20 | 05/1942 | 01/1966 | |
SR | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 21 | 05/1942 | 08/1963 | |
SR | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 22 | 06/1942 | 01/1964 | |
SR | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 23 | 06/1942 | 06/1964 | |
SR | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 24 | 06/1942 | 08/1963 | |
SR | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 25 | 07/1942 | 07/1963 | |
SR | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 26 | 07/1942 | 09/1965 | |
SR | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 27 | 07/1942 | 01/1966 | |
SR | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 28 | 08/1942 | 03/02/1963 | |
SR | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 29 | 09/1942 | 01/1964 | |
SR | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 30 | 09/1942 | 06/1964 | |
SR | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 31 | 10/1942 | 09/1963 | |
SR | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 32 | 10/1942 | 01/1964 | |
SR | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 33 | 11/1942 | 06/1964 | |
SR | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 34 | 11/1942 | 01/1964 | |
SR | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 35 | 11/1942 | 06/1964 | |
SR | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 36 | 12/1942 | 06/1964 | |
D16/2 | 1Co-Co1 | 10201 | 30/12/1950 | 07/12/1963 | ||
D16/2 | 1Co-Co1 | 10202 | 15/09/1951 | 07/12/1963 | ||
BULL1 | 0-6-0 | 11001 | 01/02/1950 | 08/08/1959 | ||
D3/12 | 0-6-0 | 1 | 30/09/1937 | 29/11/1964 | ||
D3/12 | 0-6-0 | 2 | 30/09/1937 | 13/12/1964 | ||
D3/12 | 0-6-0 | 3 | 31/10/1937 | 29/11/1964 | ||
12 | 0-6-0 | 15211 | 30/04/1949 | 31/12/1971 | ||
12 | 0-6-0 | 15212 | 30/04/1949 | 31/12/1971 | ||
12 | 0-6-0 | 15213 | 30/04/1949 | 03/11/1968 | ||
12 | 0-6-0 | 15214 | 05/1949 | 10/1971 | ||
12 | 0-6-0 | 15215 | 05/1949 | 31/03/1968 | ||
12 | 0-6-0 | 15216 | 06/1949 | 28/04/1969 | ||
12 | 0-6-0 | 15217 | 06/1949 | 08/1970 | ||
12 | 0-6-0 | 15218 | 30/06/1949 | 31/01/1970 | ||
12 | 0-6-0 | 15219 | 31/07/1949 | 31/10/1971 | ||
12 | 0-6-0 | 15220 | 31/07/1949 | 31/10/1971 | ||
12 | 0-6-0 | 15221 | 31/08/1949 | 31/10/1971 | ||
12 | 0-6-0 | 15222 | 30/09/1949 | 31/10/1971 | ||
12 | 0-6-0 | 15223 | 31/10/1949 | 09/06/1969 | ||
12 | 0-6-0 | 15224 | 31/10/1949 | 31/10/1971 | ||
12 | 0-6-0 | 15225 | 30/11/1949 | 31/10/1971 | ||
12 | 0-6-0 | 15226 | 31/12/1950 | 28/04/1969 | ||
12 | 0-6-0 | 15227 | 12/05/1951 | 30/04/1970 | ||
12 | 0-6-0 | 15228 | 12/05/1951 | 06/01/1969 | ||
12 | 0-6-0 | 15229 | 27/07/1951 | 31/10/1971 | ||
12 | 0-6-0 | 15230 | 06/10/1951 | 31/10/1971 | ||
12 | 0-6-0 | 15231 | 06/12/1951 | 31/10/1971 | ||
12 | 0-6-0 | 15232 | 06/12/1951 | 30/04/1971 | ||
12 | 0-6-0 | 15233 | 06/12/1951 | 07/05/1969 | ||
12 | 0-6-0 | 15234 | 21/01/1952 | 22/12/1968 | ||
12 | 0-6-0 | 15235 | 21/01/1952 | 31/05/1971 | ||
12 | 0-6-0 | 15236 | 21/01/1952 | 22/12/1968 | ||
70 | C-C | CC1 | 26/07/1941 | 01/1969 | ||
70 | C-C | CC2 | 09/1945 | 12/1968 |