Works: Cowlairs Works
Company | Class | Wheels | Number as Built | Works Number | Date Built | Date Withdrawn |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NBR | D29 | 4-4-0 | 243 | 09/1911 | 10/1949 | |
NBR | D29 | 4-4-0 | 338 | 10/1911 | 29/10/1948 | |
NBR | D29 | 4-4-0 | 339 | 10/1911 | 01/1952 | |
NBR | D29 | 4-4-0 | 340 | 11/1911 | 11/1952 | |
NBR | D29 | 4-4-0 | 359 | 12/1911 | 09/1950 | |
NBR | D29 | 4-4-0 | 360 | 12/1911 | 08/1950 | |
NBR | 633 | 4-4-0 | 635 | 05/1890 | 12/1952 | |
NBR | 633 | 4-4-0 | 642 | 09/1890 | 02/1950 | |
NBR | 633 | 4-4-0 | 404 | 01/1895 | 05/03/1948 | |
NBR | 729 | 4-4-0 | 731 | 04/1898 | 06/08/1948 | |
NBR | 729 | 4-4-0 | 732 | 05/1898 | 04/1949 | |
NBR | 729 | 4-4-0 | 733 | 05/1898 | 10/05/1948 | |
NBR | 729 | 4-4-0 | 768 | 11/1899 | 02/1951 | |
NBR | D30 | 4-4-0 | 363 | 10/1912 | 02/01/1951 | |
NBR | D30 | 4-4-0 | 409 | 04/1914 | 08/1959 | |
NBR | D30 | 4-4-0 | 410 | 04/1914 | 09/1957 | |
NBR | D30 | 4-4-0 | 411 | 04/1914 | 06/1957 | |
NBR | D30 | 4-4-0 | 412 | 04/1914 | 25/06/1960 | |
NBR | D30 | 4-4-0 | 413 | 05/1914 | 12/1958 | |
NBR | D30 | 4-4-0 | 414 | 06/1914 | 12/1957 | |
NBR | D30 | 4-4-0 | 415 | 06/1914 | 08/1957 | |
NBR | D30 | 4-4-0 | 416 | 06/1914 | 08/1958 | |
NBR | D30 | 4-4-0 | 417 | 07/1914 | 25/06/1960 | |
NBR | D30 | 4-4-0 | 418 | 07/1914 | 04/1959 | |
NBR | D30 | 4-4-0 | 419 | 09/1914 | 12/1958 | |
NBR | D30 | 4-4-0 | 420 | 10/1914 | 08/1957 | |
NBR | D30 | 4-4-0 | 421 | 10/1914 | 07/01/1957 | |
NBR | D30 | 4-4-0 | 422 | 10/1914 | 10/1958 | |
NBR | D30 | 4-4-0 | 423 | 10/1914 | 12/1958 | |
NBR | D30 | 4-4-0 | 425 | 07/1915 | 05/1958 | |
NBR | D30 | 4-4-0 | 426 | 07/1915 | 12/1957 | |
NBR | D30 | 4-4-0 | 427 | 08/1915 | 06/1959 | |
NBR | D30 | 4-4-0 | 428 | 08/1915 | 07/1958 | |
NBR | D30 | 4-4-0 | 497 | 12/1920 | 10/1957 | |
NBR | D30 | 4-4-0 | 498 | 11/1920 | 10/1959 | |
NBR | D30 | 4-4-0 | 499 | 11/1920 | 08/1958 | |
NBR | D30 | 4-4-0 | 500 | 11/1920 | 09/1958 | |
NBR | D30 | 4-4-0 | 501 | 12/1920 | 07/1958 | |
NBR | D32 | 4-4-0 | 882 | 10/1906 | 02/03/1948 | |
NBR | D32 | 4-4-0 | 883 | 11/1906 | 02/09/1948 | |
NBR | D32 | 4-4-0 | 884 | 11/1906 | 12/1949 | |
NBR | D32 | 4-4-0 | 885 | 12/1906 | 30/09/1948 | |
NBR | D32 | 4-4-0 | 887 | 12/1906 | 02/09/1948 | |
NBR | D32 | 4-4-0 | 888 | 12/1906 | 13/11/1948 | |
NBR | D32 | 4-4-0 | 889 | 12/1906 | 26/02/1948 | |
NBR | D32 | 4-4-0 | 890 | 01/1907 | 29/03/1951 | |
NBR | D32 | 4-4-0 | 892 | 01/1907 | 29/05/1948 | |
NBR | D32 | 4-4-0 | 893 | 01/1907 | 30/09/1948 | |
NBR | D33 | 4-4-0 | 10/1909 | 22/12/1949 | ||
NBR | D33 | 4-4-0 | 11/1909 | 06/1952 | ||
NBR | D33 | 4-4-0 | 11/1909 | 09/1949 | ||
NBR | D33 | 4-4-0 | 11/1909 | 09/1951 | ||
NBR | D33 | 4-4-0 | 10/1909 | 08/1951 | ||
NBR | D33 | 4-4-0 | 12/1909 | 06/1951 | ||
NBR | D33 | 4-4-0 | 12/1909 | 11/1952 | ||
NBR | D33 | 4-4-0 | 12/1909 | 05/03/1948 | ||
NBR | D33 | 4-4-0 | 01/1910 | 09/1953 | ||
NBR | D33 | 4-4-0 | 02/1910 | 10/1951 | ||
NBR | D34 | 4-4-0 | 09/1913 | 08/1960 | ||
NBR | D34 | 4-4-0 | 09/1913 | 09/1958 | ||
NBR | D34 | 4-4-0 | 09/1913 | 17/12/1962 | ||
NBR | D34 | 4-4-0 | 09/1913 | 05/1959 | ||
NBR | D34 | 4-4-0 | 10/1913 | 03/1960 | ||
NBR | D34 | 4-4-0 | 12/1913 | 09/1959 | ||
NBR | D34 | 4-4-0 | 12/1913 | 05/1949 | ||
NBR | D34 | 4-4-0 | 12/1913 | 05/1961 | ||
NBR | D34 | 4-4-0 | 12/1913 | 06/1959 | ||
NBR | D34 | 4-4-0 | 12/1913 | 02/1950 | ||
NBR | D34 | 4-4-0 | 05/1917 | 10/1959 | ||
NBR | D34 | 4-4-0 | 05/1917 | 12/1959 | ||
NBR | D34 | 4-4-0 | 05/1917 | 05/1961 | ||
NBR | D34 | 4-4-0 | 06/1917 | 09/1959 | ||
NBR | D34 | 4-4-0 | 07/1917 | 09/1949 | ||
NBR | D34 | 4-4-0 | 03/1919 | 03/1960 | ||
NBR | D34 | 4-4-0 | 03/1919 | 04/1959 | ||
NBR | D34 | 4-4-0 | 04/1919 | 06/11/1961 | ||
NBR | D34 | 4-4-0 | 04/1919 | 03/1960 | ||
NBR | D34 | 4-4-0 | 05/1920 | 09/1959 | ||
NBR | D34 | 4-4-0 | 04/1920 | 10/1960 | ||
NBR | D34 | 4-4-0 | 05/1920 | 12/1959 | ||
NBR | D34 | 4-4-0 | 05/1920 | 02/1959 | ||
NBR | D34 | 4-4-0 | 06/1920 | 06/1959 | ||
NBR | D34 | 4-4-0 | 06/1920 | 06/1960 | ||
NBR | D34 | 4-4-0 | 07/1920 | 04/1959 | ||
NBR | D34 | 4-4-0 | 07/1920 | 04/1961 | ||
NBR | D34 | 4-4-0 | 08/1920 | 20/11/1961 | ||
NBR | D34 | 4-4-0 | 08/1920 | 02/1960 | ||
NBR | D34 | 4-4-0 | 09/1920 | 03/1960 | ||
NBR | J35 | 0-6-0 | 329 | 07/1906 | 26/02/1962 | |
NBR | J35 | 0-6-0 | 330 | 07/1906 | 06/1961 | |
NBR | J35 | 0-6-0 | 185 | 07/1908 | 26/03/1962 | |
NBR | J35 | 0-6-0 | 186 | 07/1908 | 12/1959 | |
NBR | J35 | 0-6-0 | 187 | 07/1908 | 10/1961 | |
NBR | J35 | 0-6-0 | 188 | 07/1908 | 04/1959 | |
NBR | J35 | 0-6-0 | 189 | 08/1908 | 05/1961 | |
NBR | J35 | 0-6-0 | 190 | 08/1908 | 23/11/1961 | |
NBR | J35 | 0-6-0 | 191 | 12/1908 | 08/1962 | |
NBR | J35 | 0-6-0 | 192 | 12/1908 | 14/12/1961 | |
NBR | J35 | 0-6-0 | 193 | 12/1908 | 09/1962 | |
NBR | J35 | 0-6-0 | 195 | 12/1908 | 06/1961 | |
NBR | J35 | 0-6-0 | 196 | 01/1909 | 06/1960 | |
NBR | J35 | 0-6-0 | 38 | 09/1910 | 26/02/1962 | |
NBR | J35 | 0-6-0 | 56 | 09/1910 | 27/11/1961 | |
NBR | J35 | 0-6-0 | 57 | 10/1910 | 06/1959 | |
NBR | J35 | 0-6-0 | 58 | 10/1910 | 10/1958 | |
NBR | J35 | 0-6-0 | 59 | 10/1910 | 20/11/1961 | |
NBR | J35 | 0-6-0 | 115 | 10/1910 | 09/04/1962 | |
NBR | J35 | 0-6-0 | 120 | 11/1910 | 09/1959 | |
NBR | J35 | 0-6-0 | 335 | 12/1910 | 04/1959 | |
NBR | J35 | 0-6-0 | 336 | 12/1910 | 01/1959 | |
NBR | J35 | 0-6-0 | 337 | 12/1910 | 02/1961 | |
NBR | J35 | 0-6-0 | 347 | 12/1910 | 03/1961 | |
NBR | J35 | 0-6-0 | 348 | 01/1911 | 16/07/1962 | |
NBR | J35 | 0-6-0 | 226 | 11/1912 | 03/1958 | |
NBR | J35 | 0-6-0 | 228 | 12/1912 | 11/06/1962 | |
NBR | J35 | 0-6-0 | 220 | 11/1912 | 09/1958 | |
NBR | J35 | 0-6-0 | 253 | 12/1912 | 09/1960 | |
NBR | J35 | 0-6-0 | 254 | 12/1912 | 10/1959 | |
NBR | J35 | 0-6-0 | 86 | 02/1913 | 07/1961 | |
NBR | J35 | 0-6-0 | 124 | 02/1913 | 20/11/1961 | |
NBR | J35 | 0-6-0 | 126 | 03/1913 | 11/01/1962 | |
NBR | J35 | 0-6-0 | 127 | 03/1913 | 05/1961 | |
NBR | J35 | 0-6-0 | 129 | 03/1913 | 27/11/1961 | |
NBR | J37 | 0-6-0 | 8 | 12/1914 | 05/1959 | |
NBR | J37 | 0-6-0 | 13 | 12/1914 | 06/1964 | |
NBR | J37 | 0-6-0 | 44 | 12/1914 | 12/1959 | |
NBR | J37 | 0-6-0 | 62 | 01/1915 | 09/1961 | |
NBR | J37 | 0-6-0 | 113 | 01/1915 | 29/12/1962 | |
NBR | J37 | 0-6-0 | 136 | 04/1915 | 07/1964 | |
NBR | J37 | 0-6-0 | 222 | 04/1915 | 10/1961 | |
NBR | J37 | 0-6-0 | 255 | 04/1915 | 10/12/1962 | |
NBR | J37 | 0-6-0 | 260 | 04/1915 | 29/12/1962 | |
NBR | J37 | 0-6-0 | 261 | 05/1915 | 25/06/1962 | |
NBR | J37 | 0-6-0 | 263 | 11/1915 | 05/1964 | |
NBR | J37 | 0-6-0 | 429 | 11/1915 | 31/12/1966 | |
NBR | J37 | 0-6-0 | 430 | 11/1915 | 11/1963 | |
NBR | J37 | 0-6-0 | 431 | 11/1915 | 07/1964 | |
NBR | J37 | 0-6-0 | 432 | 12/1915 | 12/1963 | |
NBR | J37 | 0-6-0 | 433 | 06/1916 | 09/1963 | |
NBR | J37 | 0-6-0 | 434 | 06/1916 | 10/1964 | |
NBR | J37 | 0-6-0 | 435 | 06/1916 | 08/03/1962 | |
NBR | J37 | 0-6-0 | 436 | 06/1916 | 01/1964 | |
NBR | J37 | 0-6-0 | 437 | 06/1916 | 10/1964 | |
NBR | J37 | 0-6-0 | 292 | 08/1918 | 03/1960 | |
NBR | J37 | 0-6-0 | 297 | 08/1918 | 10/12/1966 | |
NBR | J37 | 0-6-0 | 304 | 08/1918 | 19/11/1966 | |
NBR | J37 | 0-6-0 | 454 | 08/1918 | 29/12/1962 | |
NBR | J37 | 0-6-0 | 455 | 09/1918 | 12/1963 | |
NBR | J37 | 0-6-0 | 517 | 06/1921 | 09/1962 | |
NBR | J37 | 0-6-0 | 98 | 06/1921 | 29/12/1962 | |
NBR | J37 | 0-6-0 | 101 | 06/1921 | 12/1965 | |
NBR | J37 | 0-6-0 | 103 | 06/1921 | 06/1964 | |
NBR | J37 | 0-6-0 | 33 | 07/1921 | 01/1964 | |
NBR | J37 | 0-6-0 | 104 | 08/1921 | 29/12/1962 | |
NBR | J37 | 0-6-0 | 128 | 08/1921 | 10/1964 | |
NBR | J37 | 0-6-0 | 105 | 09/1921 | 08/1962 | |
NBR | J37 | 0-6-0 | 143 | 09/1921 | 29/12/1962 | |
NBR | J37 | 0-6-0 | 518 | 10/1921 | 29/12/1962 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 183 | 12/1891 | 05/1956 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 68 | 12/1891 | 07/1959 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 45 | 12/1891 | 11/01/1962 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 179 | 11/1891 | 12/1937 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 662 | 11/1891 | 04/1937 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 661 | 11/1891 | 01/1939 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 660 | 08/1891 | 04/1956 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 659 | 08/1891 | 10/1961 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 658 | 07/1891 | 22/04/1967 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 657 | 07/1891 | 12/1960 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 656 | 07/1891 | 10/1961 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 655 | 07/1891 | 04/1952 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 654 | 05/1891 | 08/10/1962 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 653 | 05/1891 | 05/1960 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 652 | 05/1891 | 29/12/1962 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 651 | 05/1891 | 08/1961 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 650 | 04/1891 | 04/1951 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 649 | 04/1891 | 10/1957 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 648 | 02/1891 | 05/1963 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 647 | 02/1891 | 09/1947 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 646 | 02/1891 | 11/1963 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 645 | 02/1891 | 07/1959 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 644 | 02/1891 | 23/03/1948 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 643 | 02/1891 | 07/1947 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 176 | 04/1890 | 08/10/1962 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 173 | 04/1890 | 04/1936 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 632 | 04/1890 | 08/10/1962 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 631 | 03/1890 | 03/1939 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 630 | 03/1890 | 03/1936 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 629 | 03/1890 | 08/1937 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 628 | 01/1890 | 30/04/1962 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 627 | 01/1890 | 04/1936 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 626 | 01/1890 | 12/1935 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 625 | 01/1890 | 04/1950 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 624 | 01/1890 | 08/1937 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 623 | 01/1890 | 11/1963 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 172 | 11/1889 | 07/1947 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 145 | 11/1889 | 08/1935 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 622 | 11/1889 | 04/1957 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 621 | 10/1889 | 04/1937 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 620 | 10/1889 | 06/1937 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 619 | 10/1889 | 10/1935 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 618 | 09/1889 | 02/1936 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 617 | 09/1889 | 16/07/1962 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 616 | 09/1889 | 09/1937 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 615 | 07/1889 | 04/1935 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 614 | 07/1889 | 12/1937 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 613 | 07/1889 | 02/1936 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 609 | 08/1888 | 05/1934 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 608 | 08/1888 | 06/1937 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 607 | 08/1888 | 08/1934 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 606 | 08/1888 | 06/1933 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 605 | 08/1888 | 06/1934 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 604 | 08/1888 | 08/10/1962 | |
NBR | J88 | 0-6-0T | 836 | 12/1904 | 06/1960 | |
NBR | J88 | 0-6-0T | 837 | 12/1904 | 06/1958 | |
NBR | J88 | 0-6-0T | 838 | 12/1904 | 12/1958 | |
NBR | J88 | 0-6-0T | 839 | 12/1904 | 10/1956 | |
NBR | J88 | 0-6-0T | 840 | 01/1905 | 07/1958 | |
NBR | J88 | 0-6-0T | 841 | 01/1905 | 03/1961 | |
NBR | J88 | 0-6-0T | 842 | 09/1905 | 10/1959 | |
NBR | J88 | 0-6-0T | 843 | 09/1905 | 07/1958 | |
NBR | J88 | 0-6-0T | 844 | 09/1905 | 03/1958 | |
NBR | J88 | 0-6-0T | 845 | 10/1905 | 02/1959 | |
NBR | J88 | 0-6-0T | 846 | 10/1905 | 08/1958 | |
NBR | J88 | 0-6-0T | 847 | 10/1905 | 03/1959 | |
NBR | J88 | 0-6-0T | 233 | 03/1909 | 08/1960 | |
NBR | J88 | 0-6-0T | 234 | 03/1909 | 03/1958 | |
NBR | J88 | 0-6-0T | 235 | 03/1909 | 06/1959 | |
NBR | J88 | 0-6-0T | 236 | 03/1909 | 08/10/1962 | |
NBR | J88 | 0-6-0T | 237 | 04/1909 | 28/05/1962 | |
NBR | J88 | 0-6-0T | 238 | 04/1909 | 11/1955 | |
NBR | J88 | 0-6-0T | 66 | 04/1912 | 09/1961 | |
NBR | J88 | 0-6-0T | 114 | 04/1912 | 10/1958 | |
NBR | J88 | 0-6-0T | 116 | 05/1912 | 02/1958 | |
NBR | J88 | 0-6-0T | 117 | 05/1912 | 19/11/1954 | |
NBR | J88 | 0-6-0T | 118 | 05/1912 | 12/02/1962 | |
NBR | J88 | 0-6-0T | 119 | 06/1912 | 10/1960 | |
NBR | J88 | 0-6-0T | 121 | 06/1912 | 01/1961 | |
NBR | J88 | 0-6-0T | 130 | 07/1912 | 29/12/1962 | |
NBR | J88 | 0-6-0T | 132 | 07/1912 | 08/10/1962 | |
NBR | J88 | 0-6-0T | 152 | 07/1912 | 08/1958 | |
NBR | J88 | 0-6-0T | 277 | 09/1919 | 08/1958 | |
NBR | J88 | 0-6-0T | 290 | 09/1919 | 08/1960 | |
NBR | J88 | 0-6-0T | 288 | 10/1919 | 16/07/1962 | |
NBR | J88 | 0-6-0T | 289 | 10/1919 | 09/1960 | |
NBR | J88 | 0-6-0T | 87 | 11/1919 | 07/1962 | |
NBR | J88 | 0-6-0T | 271 | 11/1919 | 12/02/1962 | |
NBR | J88 | 0-6-0T | 279 | 11/1919 | 06/1960 | |
NBR | D26 | 4-4-0 | 322 | 07/1903 | 02/1925 | |
NBR | D26 | 4-4-0 | 320 | 06/1903 | 01/1925 | |
NBR | D26 | 4-4-0 | 321 | 07/1903 | 11/1922 | |
NBR | D26 | 4-4-0 | 319 | 06/1903 | 09/1922 | |
NBR | D26 | 4-4-0 | 318 | 06/1903 | 07/1925 | |
NBR | D26 | 4-4-0 | 317 | 05/1903 | 08/1924 | |
NBR | D26 | 4-4-0 | 328 | 11/1903 | 07/1922 | |
NBR | D26 | 4-4-0 | 327 | 10/1903 | 11/1925 | |
NBR | D26 | 4-4-0 | 326 | 10/1903 | 08/1925 | |
NBR | D26 | 4-4-0 | 325 | 10/1903 | 07/1926 | |
NBR | D26 | 4-4-0 | 324 | 09/1903 | 12/1924 | |
NBR | D26 | 4-4-0 | 323 | 09/1903 | 02/1923 | |
NBR | J35 | 0-6-0 | 194 | 12/1908 | 02/1947 | |
NBR | 574 | 4-4-0 | 574 | 06/1884 | 06/1934 | |
NBR | 574 | 4-4-0 | 575 | 06/1884 | 02/1937 | |
NBR | 574 | 4-4-0 | 576 | 07/1884 | 06/1933 | |
NBR | 574 | 4-4-0 | 577 | 07/1884 | 05/1934 | |
NBR | 574 | 4-4-0 | 578 | 07/1884 | 07/1933 | |
NBR | 574 | 4-4-0 | 579 | 07/1884 | 08/1933 | |
NBR | 633 | 4-4-0 | 633 | 05/1890 | 01/1939 | |
NBR | 633 | 4-4-0 | 634 | 05/1890 | 11/1935 | |
NBR | 633 | 4-4-0 | 636 | 06/1890 | 11/1937 | |
NBR | 633 | 4-4-0 | 637 | 06/1890 | 04/1936 | |
NBR | 633 | 4-4-0 | 638 | 06/1890 | 05/1937 | |
NBR | 633 | 4-4-0 | 639 | 08/1890 | 10/1935 | |
NBR | 633 | 4-4-0 | 640 | 08/1890 | 10/1936 | |
NBR | 633 | 4-4-0 | 641 | 08/1890 | 05/1937 | |
NBR | 633 | 4-4-0 | 36 | 09/1890 | 06/1935 | |
NBR | 633 | 4-4-0 | 37 | 09/1890 | 05/1935 | |
NBR | 633 | 4-4-0 | 262 | 11/1894 | 08/1937 | |
NBR | 633 | 4-4-0 | 293 | 12/1894 | 01/1938 | |
NBR | 633 | 4-4-0 | 312 | 01/1895 | 12/1938 | |
NBR | 633 | 4-4-0 | 211 | 01/1895 | 09/1937 | |
NBR | 633 | 4-4-0 | 212 | 01/1895 | 04/1937 | |
NBR | 633 | 4-4-0 | 213 | 06/1895 | 03/1939 | |
NBR | 633 | 4-4-0 | 214 | 06/1895 | 05/1939 | |
NBR | 633 | 4-4-0 | 215 | 06/1895 | 09/1946 | |
NBR | 633 | 4-4-0 | 216 | 06/1895 | 11/1937 | |
NBR | 633 | 4-4-0 | 217 | 07/1895 | 10/1939 | |
NBR | 633 | 4-4-0 | 218 | 07/1895 | 07/1937 | |
NBR | 729 | 4-4-0 | 729 | 03/1898 | 03/1946 | |
NBR | 729 | 4-4-0 | 730 | 04/1898 | 12/1937 | |
NBR | 729 | 4-4-0 | 734 | 05/1898 | 26/10/1946 | |
NBR | 729 | 4-4-0 | 735 | 07/1898 | 03/1939 | |
NBR | 729 | 4-4-0 | 736 | 07/1898 | 07/1931 | |
NBR | 729 | 4-4-0 | 737 | 07/1898 | 05/1939 | |
NBR | 729 | 4-4-0 | 738 | 07/1898 | 06/1939 | |
NBR | 729 | 4-4-0 | 739 | 07/1898 | 07/1947 | |
NBR | 729 | 4-4-0 | 740 | 07/1898 | 06/11/1947 | |
NBR | 729 | 4-4-0 | 765 | 09/1899 | 11/1946 | |
NBR | 729 | 4-4-0 | 766 | 09/1899 | 06/1937 | |
NBR | 729 | 4-4-0 | 767 | 09/1899 | 10/1946 | |
NBR | 729 | 4-4-0 | 769 | 11/1899 | 05/12/1947 | |
NBR | 729 | 4-4-0 | 770 | 11/1899 | 03/1946 | |
NBR | D25 | 4-4-0 | 603 | 03/1888 | 03/1928 | |
NBR | D25 | 4-4-0 | 602 | 03/1888 | 04/1926 | |
NBR | D25 | 4-4-0 | 601 | 03/1888 | 04/1926 | |
NBR | D25 | 4-4-0 | 600 | 02/1888 | 09/1928 | |
NBR | D25 | 4-4-0 | 599 | 02/1888 | 02/1930 | |
NBR | D25 | 4-4-0 | 598 | 02/1888 | 10/1930 | |
NBR | D25 | 4-4-0 | 597 | 03/1887 | 10/1926 | |
NBR | D25 | 4-4-0 | 596 | 04/1887 | 07/1933 | |
NBR | D25 | 4-4-0 | 595 | 04/1887 | 03/1932 | |
NBR | D25 | 4-4-0 | 594 | 10/1886 | 11/1926 | |
NBR | D25 | 4-4-0 | 593 | 09/1886 | 10/1926 | |
NBR | D25 | 4-4-0 | 592 | 04/1886 | 09/1932 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 247 | 07/1892 | 07/1952 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 248 | 07/1892 | 12/1963 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 357 | 07/1892 | 21/05/1962 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 358 | 07/1892 | 19/11/1966 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 611 | 08/1892 | 01/11/1962 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 612 | 08/1892 | 07/1947 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 177 | 01/1893 | 12/1950 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 180 | 01/1893 | 29/12/1962 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 181 | 03/1893 | 02/1958 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 182 | 03/1893 | 08/1952 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 250 | 03/1893 | 08/1947 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 280 | 03/1893 | 11/1963 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 705 | 06/1896 | 03/1961 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 706 | 06/1896 | 06/1963 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 707 | 06/1896 | 01/1952 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 708 | 06/1896 | 03/1951 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 709 | 06/1896 | 21/05/1962 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 710 | 06/1896 | 07/1961 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 711 | 11/1896 | 01/1966 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 712 | 11/1896 | 12/1952 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 713 | 11/1896 | 07/1947 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 714 | 11/1896 | 11/1963 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 715 | 12/1896 | 02/1952 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 716 | 12/1896 | 06/1963 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 717 | 04/1897 | 05/06/1967 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 718 | 04/1897 | 23/03/1948 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 719 | 04/1897 | 08/1963 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 720 | 05/1897 | 11/1950 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 721 | 05/1897 | 02/1951 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 722 | 06/1897 | 10/11/1962 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 723 | 07/1897 | 03/1950 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 724 | 07/1897 | 04/1961 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 725 | 07/1897 | 26/02/1962 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 726 | 07/1897 | 01/1966 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 727 | 07/1897 | 03/1951 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 728 | 07/1897 | 10/1947 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 741 | 10/1898 | 05/1943 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 742 | 10/1898 | 16/07/1962 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 743 | 10/1898 | 02/1947 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 744 | 10/1898 | 07/1947 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 745 | 10/1898 | 29/12/1962 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 746 | 10/1898 | 08/10/1962 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 747 | 12/1898 | 26/02/1962 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 748 | 01/1899 | 16/07/1962 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 749 | 01/1899 | 12/1963 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 750 | 01/1899 | 06/1951 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 751 | 01/1899 | 06/1964 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 752 | 01/1899 | 16/07/1962 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 753 | 03/1899 | 11/1963 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 754 | 03/1899 | 10/11/1962 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 755 | 03/1899 | 30/07/1962 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 756 | 04/1899 | 08/1955 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 757 | 04/1899 | 30/04/1962 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 758 | 04/1899 | 29/12/1962 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 759 | 05/1899 | 07/1960 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 760 | 05/1899 | 31/05/1962 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 761 | 05/1899 | 09/1966 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 762 | 05/1899 | 30/04/1962 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 763 | 05/1899 | 10/11/1962 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 764 | 06/1899 | 07/1951 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 771 | 01/1900 | 12/1963 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 772 | 01/1900 | 02/1957 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 773 | 01/1900 | 11/1963 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 774 | 01/1900 | 10/1946 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 775 | 01/1900 | 13/11/1965 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 776 | 01/1900 | 23/03/1948 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 777 | 03/1900 | 12/1963 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 778 | 03/1900 | 18/06/1962 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 779 | 03/1900 | 08/1963 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 780 | 03/1900 | 08/1947 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 781 | 05/1900 | 09/1959 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 782 | 05/1900 | 08/10/1962 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 783 | 07/1900 | 11/1963 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 784 | 07/1900 | 10/1947 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 785 | 07/1900 | 04/1948 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 786 | 07/1900 | 12/1963 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 787 | 07/1900 | 03/1961 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 788 | 07/1900 | 01/1952 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 789 | 12/1900 | 07/1963 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 790 | 12/1900 | 02/1960 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 791 | 12/1900 | 02/1960 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 792 | 12/1900 | 25/10/1962 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 793 | 12/1900 | 05/06/1967 | |
NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 794 | 12/1900 | 06/1964 | |
NBR | J34 | 0-6-0 | 87 | 1879 | 07/1925 | |
NBR | J34 | 0-6-0 | 271 | 1879 | 06/1925 | |
NBR | J34 | 0-6-0 | 277 | 1879 | 10/1924 | |
NBR | J34 | 0-6-0 | 279 | 1879 | 03/1923 | |
NBR | J34 | 0-6-0 | 288 | 1879 | 01/1924 | |
NBR | J34 | 0-6-0 | 289 | 1879 | 05/1925 | |
NBR | J34 | 0-6-0 | 290 | 05/1879 | 01/1926 | |
NBR | J34 | 0-6-0 | 35 | 1879 | 10/1924 | |
NBR | J34 | 0-6-0 | 301 | 1879 | 10/1925 | |
NBR | J34 | 0-6-0 | 302 | 1879 | 05/1923 | |
NBR | J34 | 0-6-0 | 306 | 1879 | 06/1923 | |
NBR | J34 | 0-6-0 | 403 | 1879 | 08/1924 | |
NBR | J34 | 0-6-0 | 34 | 1879 | 11/1922 | |
NBR | J34 | 0-6-0 | 296 | 1879 | 07/1921 | |
NBR | J34 | 0-6-0 | 300 | 1879 | 04/1921 | |
NBR | J34 | 0-6-0 | 303 | 1879 | 09/1921 | |
NBR | J34 | 0-6-0 | 401 | 1879 | 02/1922 | |
NBR | J34 | 0-6-0 | 402 | 1879 | 06/1922 | |
NBR | J34 | 0-6-0 | 84 | 1880 | 08/1922 | |
NBR | J34 | 0-6-0 | 175 | 1880 | 02/1922 | |
NBR | J34 | 0-6-0 | 46 | 1880 | 08/1925 | |
NBR | J34 | 0-6-0 | 171 | 1880 | 07/1923 | |
NBR | J34 | 0-6-0 | 272 | 07/1880 | 03/1926 | |
NBR | J34 | 0-6-0 | 273 | 1880 | 10/1925 | |
NBR | J34 | 0-6-0 | 506 | 1880 | 06/1923 | |
NBR | J34 | 0-6-0 | 507 | 1880 | 10/1925 | |
NBR | J34 | 0-6-0 | 508 | 1880 | 06/1923 | |
NBR | J34 | 0-6-0 | 509 | 1880 | 03/1926 | |
NBR | J34 | 0-6-0 | 510 | 1880 | 09/1923 | |
NBR | J34 | 0-6-0 | 511 | 1880 | 02/1925 | |
NBR | J34 | 0-6-0 | 512 | 1880 | 08/1924 | |
NBR | J34 | 0-6-0 | 513 | 1880 | 01/1926 | |
NBR | J34 | 0-6-0 | 514 | 1880 | 06/1925 | |
NBR | J34 | 0-6-0 | 515 | 1880 | 03/1925 | |
NBR | J34 | 0-6-0 | 516 | 1880 | 11/1925 | |
NBR | J34 | 0-6-0 | 517 | 1880 | 02/1923 | |
NBR | J34 | 0-6-0 | 128 | 1881 | 10/1924 | |
NBR | J34 | 0-6-0 | 143 | 03/1881 | 09/1923 | |
NBR | J34 | 0-6-0 | 518 | 1881 | 01/1925 | |
NBR | J34 | 0-6-0 | 519 | 1881 | 09/1924 | |
NBR | J34 | 0-6-0 | 520 | 04/1881 | 06/1923 | |
NBR | J34 | 0-6-0 | 521 | 1881 | 08/1924 | |
NBR | J34 | 0-6-0 | 522 | 1881 | 03/1925 | |
NBR | J34 | 0-6-0 | 523 | 1881 | 12/1926 | |
NBR | J34 | 0-6-0 | 524 | 1881 | 12/1924 | |
NBR | J34 | 0-6-0 | 525 | 1881 | 09/1923 | |
NBR | J34 | 0-6-0 | 526 | 1881 | 03/1924 | |
NBR | J34 | 0-6-0 | 527 | 1881 | 02/1923 | |
NBR | J34 | 0-6-0 | 528 | 1881 | 07/1923 | |
NBR | J34 | 0-6-0 | 529 | 1881 | 07/1923 | |
NBR | J34 | 0-6-0 | 530 | 11/1881 | 05/1923 | |
NBR | J34 | 0-6-0 | 531 | 11/1881 | 01/1925 | |
NBR | J34 | 0-6-0 | 532 | 11/1881 | 10/1924 | |
NBR | J34 | 0-6-0 | 533 | 12/1881 | 10/1925 | |
NBR | J34 | 0-6-0 | 534 | 01/1882 | 10/1927 | |
NBR | J34 | 0-6-0 | 535 | 01/1882 | 07/1925 | |
NBR | J34 | 0-6-0 | 536 | 01/1882 | 11/1924 | |
NBR | J34 | 0-6-0 | 537 | 01/1882 | 11/1925 | |
NBR | J34 | 0-6-0 | 538 | 01/1882 | 05/1923 | |
NBR | J34 | 0-6-0 | 539 | 01/1882 | 10/1924 | |
NBR | J34 | 0-6-0 | 540 | 03/1882 | 11/1925 | |
NBR | J34 | 0-6-0 | 541 | 1882 | 02/1925 | |
NBR | J34 | 0-6-0 | 542 | 04/1882 | 04/1926 | |
NBR | J34 | 0-6-0 | 543 | 1882 | 09/1925 | |
NBR | J34 | 0-6-0 | 544 | 04/1882 | 04/1923 | |
NBR | J34 | 0-6-0 | 545 | 04/1882 | 08/1923 | |
NBR | J34 | 0-6-0 | 27 | 07/1882 | 01/1926 | |
NBR | J34 | 0-6-0 | 28 | 07/1882 | 10/1924 | |
NBR | J34 | 0-6-0 | 30 | 07/1882 | 03/1924 | |
NBR | J34 | 0-6-0 | 125 | 07/1882 | 05/1923 | |
NBR | J34 | 0-6-0 | 163 | 07/1882 | 04/1926 | |
NBR | J34 | 0-6-0 | 184 | 07/1882 | 09/1924 | |
NBR | J34 | 0-6-0 | 548 | 10/1882 | 04/1925 | |
NBR | J34 | 0-6-0 | 549 | 10/1882 | 07/1923 | |
NBR | J34 | 0-6-0 | 550 | 10/1882 | 11/01/1928 | |
NBR | J34 | 0-6-0 | 551 | 1882 | 06/1925 | |
NBR | J34 | 0-6-0 | 552 | 11/1882 | 11/1924 | |
NBR | J34 | 0-6-0 | 553 | 11/1882 | 11/1925 | |
NBR | J34 | 0-6-0 | 554 | 02/1883 | 07/1925 | |
NBR | J34 | 0-6-0 | 555 | 03/1883 | 10/1925 | |
NBR | J34 | 0-6-0 | 556 | 03/1883 | 12/1924 | |
NBR | J34 | 0-6-0 | 557 | 04/1883 | 10/1924 | |
NBR | J34 | 0-6-0 | 558 | 04/1883 | 10/1925 | |
NBR | J34 | 0-6-0 | 559 | 05/1883 | 08/1923 | |
NBR | J34 | 0-6-0 | 560 | 05/1883 | 07/1923 | |
NBR | J34 | 0-6-0 | 561 | 06/1883 | 12/1924 | |
NBR | J34 | 0-6-0 | 562 | 06/1883 | 04/1925 | |
NBR | J34 | 0-6-0 | 563 | 06/1883 | 04/1925 | |
NBR | J34 | 0-6-0 | 564 | 06/1883 | 01/1925 | |
NBR | J34 | 0-6-0 | 565 | 06/1883 | 06/1923 | |
NBR | J34 | 0-6-0 | 18 | 07/1883 | 12/1923 | |
NBR | J34 | 0-6-0 | 138 | 07/1883 | 11/01/1928 | |
NBR | J34 | 0-6-0 | 286 | 07/1883 | 10/1925 | |
NBR | J34 | 0-6-0 | 311 | 07/1883 | 11/1924 | |
NBR | J34 | 0-6-0 | 481 | 07/1883 | 09/1923 | |
NBR | J34 | 0-6-0 | 482 | 07/1883 | 11/1923 | |
NBR | N15 | 0-6-2T | 71 | 12/1923 | 29/12/1962 | |
NBR | N15 | 0-6-2T | 19 | 10/1923 | 05/1960 | |
NBR | N15 | 0-6-2T | 23 | 11/1923 | 02/1960 | |
NBR | N15 | 0-6-2T | 31 | 11/1923 | 11/1959 | |
NBR | N15 | 0-6-2T | 52 | 11/1923 | 10/1960 | |
NBR | N15 | 0-6-2T | 55 | 11/1923 | 10/1957 | |
NBR | N15 | 0-6-2T | 60 | 11/1923 | 01/10/1962 | |
NBR | N15 | 0-6-2T | 67 | 12/1923 | 01/10/1962 | |
NBR | N15 | 0-6-2T | 74 | 12/1923 | 10/1959 | |
NBR | N15 | 0-6-2T | 75 | 12/1923 | 05/1959 | |
NBR | N15 | 0-6-2T | 76 | 12/1923 | 11/1959 | |
NBR | N15 | 0-6-2T | 77 | 12/1923 | 12/02/1962 | |
NBR | N15 | 0-6-2T | 78 | 02/1924 | 10/1959 | |
NBR | N15 | 0-6-2T | 79 | 02/1924 | 01/10/1962 | |
NBR | N15 | 0-6-2T | 99 | 02/1924 | 05/12/1961 | |
NBR | N15 | 0-6-2T | 125 | 03/1924 | 11/1958 | |
NBR | N15 | 0-6-2T | 9147 | 03/1924 | 07/1961 | |
NBR | N15 | 0-6-2T | 9174 | 03/1924 | 05/1959 | |
NBR | N15 | 0-6-2T | 9225 | 03/1924 | 08/1960 | |
NBR | N15 | 0-6-2T | 9227 | 04/1924 | 01/10/1962 | |
NBR | D32 | 4-4-0 | 886 | 12/1906 | 16/12/1947 | |
NBR | D32 | 4-4-0 | 891 | 01/1907 | 06/11/1947 | |
NBR | D30 | 4-4-0 | 400 | 09/1912 | 06/1945 | |
NBR | D30 | 4-4-0 | 424 | 06/1915 | 28/11/1947 | |
NBR | D51 | 4-4-0T | 483 | 10/1884 | 08/1927 | |
NBR | D51 | 4-4-0T | 316 | 10/1884 | 06/1925 | |
NBR | D51 | 4-4-0T | 79 | 10/1884 | 01/1927 | |
NBR | D51 | 4-4-0T | 78 | 09/1884 | 09/1924 | |
NBR | D51 | 4-4-0T | 77 | 09/1884 | 08/1929 | |
NBR | D51 | 4-4-0T | 76 | 09/1884 | 11/1924 | |
NBR | D51 | 4-4-0T | 67 | 01/1883 | 10/1923 | |
NBR | D51 | 4-4-0T | 174 | 02/1883 | 05/1929 | |
NBR | D51 | 4-4-0T | 268 | 01/1883 | 07/1928 | |
NBR | D51 | 4-4-0T | 52 | 01/1883 | 08/1933 | |
NBR | D51 | 4-4-0T | 294 | 06/1882 | 10/1932 | |
NBR | D51 | 4-4-0T | 225 | 06/1882 | 03/1926 | |
NBR | D51 | 4-4-0T | 147 | 06/1882 | 04/1929 | |
NBR | D51 | 4-4-0T | 99 | 06/1882 | 05/1933 | |
NBR | D51 | 4-4-0T | 75 | 06/1882 | 09/1924 | |
NBR | D51 | 4-4-0T | 74 | 05/1882 | 09/1931 | |
NBR | D51 | 4-4-0T | 60 | 06/1882 | 10/1924 | |
NBR | D51 | 4-4-0T | 19 | 06/1882 | 12/1923 | |
NBR | D51 | 4-4-0T | 105 | 05/1881 | 08/1931 | |
NBR | D51 | 4-4-0T | 104 | 05/1881 | 08/1931 | |
NBR | D51 | 4-4-0T | 103 | 06/1881 | 03/1928 | |
NBR | D51 | 4-4-0T | 101 | 05/1881 | 10/1929 | |
NBR | D51 | 4-4-0T | 98 | 05/1881 | 10/1931 | |
NBR | D51 | 4-4-0T | 33 | 05/1881 | 10/1923 | |
NBR | D51 | 4-4-0T | 299 | 08/1880 | 10/1930 | |
NBR | D51 | 4-4-0T | 111 | 09/1880 | 04/1933 | |
NBR | D51 | 4-4-0T | 110 | 08/1880 | 12/1923 | |
NBR | D51 | 4-4-0T | 109 | 09/1880 | 10/1924 | |
NBR | D51 | 4-4-0T | 73 | 08/1880 | 09/1925 | |
NBR | D51 | 4-4-0T | 72 | 08/1880 | 10/1924 | |
LNER | G7 | 0-4-4T | 90 | 01/1889 | 09/1926 | |
LNER | G7 | 0-4-4T | 91 | 01/1889 | 05/1932 | |
LNER | G7 | 0-4-4T | 92 | 01/1889 | 09/1930 | |
LNER | G7 | 0-4-4T | 93 | 01/1889 | 01/1927 | |
LNER | G7 | 0-4-4T | 94 | 02/1889 | 02/1927 | |
LNER | G7 | 0-4-4T | 95 | 02/1889 | 04/1931 | |
NBR | G8 | 0-4-4T | 157 | 06/1877 | 09/1925 | |
NBR | G8 | 0-4-4T | 480 | 06/1877 | 10/1924 | |
NBR | G8 | 0-4-4T | 88 | 07/1877 | 01/1925 | |
NBR | G8 | 0-4-4T | 89 | 07/1877 | 05/1925 | |
NBR | G8 | 0-4-4T | 167 | 06/1877 | 05/1925 | |
NBR | G8 | 0-4-4T | 314 | 06/1877 | 05/1925 | |
LNER | G7 | 0-4-4T | 591 | 09/1886 | 02/1927 | |
LNER | G7 | 0-4-4T | 590 | 08/1886 | 06/1930 | |
LNER | G7 | 0-4-4T | 589 | 08/1886 | 07/1930 | |
LNER | G7 | 0-4-4T | 588 | 07/1886 | 04/1931 | |
LNER | G7 | 0-4-4T | 587 | 05/1886 | 08/1926 | |
LNER | G7 | 0-4-4T | 586 | 04/1886 | 11/1926 |