Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 102 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 7556 Week
» 10138 Month
» 274771 Year
» 1496336 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Timelines

Swindon Works visit - Sunday 03/12/1961
Class Wheels Loco Code Allocation To Service Withdrawn Details Rep Num
    D857     11/12/1961 03/10/1971 Around the Works - Just delivered from NBL.  
    D858     15/12/1961 03/10/1971 Around the Works - Just delivered from NBL.  
    D7011     04/12/1961 02/03/1975 Around the Works - Just delivered from Beyer Peacock  
    D7013     14/12/1961 01/01/1972 Around the Works - Just delivered from Beyer Peacock  
    D1000     29/12/1961 11/02/1974 Around the Works - "A" shop - under construction - in undercoat.  
    D1001     12/02/1962 04/10/1976 Around the Works - "A" shop - under construction - in undercoat.  
    D1002     19/03/1962 29/01/1974 Around the Works - "A" shop - under construction - motors fitted to bodyshell.  
    D1003     14/04/1962 05/01/1975 Around the Works - "A" shop - under construction - motors fitted to bodyshell.  
    D1004     12/05/1962 01/08/1973 Around the Works - "A" shop - under construction - body shell.  
    D1005     18/06/1962 16/11/1976 Around the Works - "A" shop - under construction - body shell.  
    D1006     06/07/1962 06/04/1975 Around the Works - "A" shop - under construction - body shell.  
    D1007     01/08/1962 29/01/1974 Around the Works - "A" shop - under construction - body shell.  
    D1008     04/09/1962 21/10/1974 Around the Works - "A" shop - under construction - body shell.  
    D1009     24/09/1962 10/11/1976 Around the Works - "A" shop - under construction - body shell.  
    D1010     15/10/1962 28/02/1977 Around the Works - "A" shop - under construction - body shell.  
    D1011     27/10/1962 06/10/1975 Around the Works - "A" shop - under construction - frames laid.  
    D1012     17/11/1962 02/11/1975 Around the Works - "A" shop - under construction - frames laid.  
    D1013     13/12/1962 28/02/1977 Around the Works - "A" shop - under construction - frames laid.  
    D2175     06/12/1961 11/09/1983 Around the Works - "A" shop - under construction - in undercoat.  
    D2176     15/12/1961 11/05/1968 Around the Works - "A" shop - under construction - nearly complete.  
    D2177     27/12/1961 21/09/1968 Around the Works - "A" shop - under construction - motor fitted to bodyshell.  
    D2178     09/01/1962 30/09/1969 Around the Works - "A" shop - under construction - motor fitted to bodyshell.  
35 B-B D7012 82A Bristol Bath Road 01/12/1961 01/01/1972 Around the Works - Just delivered from Beyer Peacock