Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 4124 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17530 Week
» 70546 Month
» 190073 Year
» 3216926 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Timelines
Horwich Works visit - Sunday 19/11/1961
Class |
Wheels |
Loco |
Code |
Allocation |
To Service |
Withdrawn |
Details |
Rep Num |
|
|
D4108 |
|
|
23/11/1961 |
|
Around the Works - Paint shop - painted. |
|
|
|
D4109 |
|
|
29/11/1961 |
31/12/2007 |
Around the Works - Erecting shop - under construction - nearly complete. |
|
|
|
D4110 |
|
|
08/12/1961 |
|
Around the Works - Erecting shop - under construction - nearly complete. |
|
|
|
D4111 |
|
|
15/12/1961 |
|
Around the Works - Erecting shop - under construction - motor fitted to bodyshell. |
|
|
|
D4112 |
|
|
22/12/1961 |
|
Around the Works - Erecting shop - under construction - motor fitted to bodyshell. |
|
|
|
D4113 |
|
|
04/01/1962 |
31/08/2005 |
Around the Works - Erecting shop - under construction - body shell. |
|
|
|
D4114 |
|
|
21/01/1962 |
01/10/2005 |
Around the Works - Erecting shop - under construction - body shell. |
|