Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 1208 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19011 Week
» 72027 Month
» 191554 Year
» 3218407 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Timelines
Derby Works visit - Sunday 19/11/1961
Class |
Wheels |
Loco |
Code |
Allocation |
To Service |
Withdrawn |
Details |
Rep Num |
|
|
D142 |
|
|
05/12/1961 |
04/12/1977 |
Around the Works - Outside diesel test house - undercoat. |
|
|
|
D156 |
|
|
23/02/1962 |
14/12/1980 |
Around the Works - New erecting shop - under construction - body shell. |
|
|
|
D155 |
|
|
16/02/1962 |
18/12/1983 |
Around the Works - New erecting shop - under construction - body shell. |
|
|
|
D154 |
|
|
16/02/1962 |
22/04/1984 |
Around the Works - New erecting shop - under construction - body shell. |
|
|
|
D153 |
|
|
25/01/1962 |
31/12/1983 |
Around the Works - New erecting shop - under construction - body shell. |
|
|
|
D152 |
|
|
01/02/1962 |
14/12/1980 |
Around the Works - New erecting shop - under construction - motor fitted to body shell. |
|
|
|
D151 |
|
|
17/01/1962 |
06/05/1984 |
Around the Works - New erecting shop - under construction - motor fitted to body shell. |
|
|
|
D150 |
|
|
30/12/1961 |
01/11/1981 |
Around the Works - New erecting shop - under construction - motor fitted to body shell. |
|
|
|
D149 |
|
|
30/12/1961 |
27/07/1980 |
Around the Works - New erecting shop - under construction - nearly complete. |
|
|
|
D148 |
|
|
22/12/1961 |
25/11/1984 |
Around the Works - New erecting shop - under construction - nearly complete. |
|
|
|
D147 |
|
|
16/12/1961 |
04/11/1984 |
Around the Works - New erecting shop - under construction - nearly complete. |
|
|
|
D146 |
|
|
15/12/1961 |
01/10/1983 |
Around the Works - Diesel finishing shop - undercoat. |
|
|
|
D145 |
|
|
09/12/1961 |
11/10/1981 |
Around the Works - Diesel finishing shop - undercoat. |
|
|
|
D144 |
|
|
09/12/1961 |
07/02/1982 |
Around the Works - Diesel finishing shop - undercoat. |
|
|
|
D143 |
|
|
01/12/1961 |
31/01/1982 |
Around the Works - Outside diesel test house - undercoat. |
|
|
|
D140 |
|
|
25/11/1961 |
05/10/1978 |
Around the Works - Paint shop - painted. |
|
46 |
1Co-Co1 |
D138 |
17A |
Derby |
21/10/1961 |
20/12/1981 |
Around the Works - Returned for minor adjustments. |
|
46 |
1Co-Co1 |
D141 |
17A |
Derby |
17/11/1961 |
26/06/1983 |
Around the Works - Ex-Works on Derby shed. |
|