Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 63 Today
» 1154 Yesterday
» 4585 Week
» 25487 Month
» 25487 Year
» 1247052 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Timelines

Ashford Works visit. - Saturday 25/02/1961
Class Wheels Loco Code Allocation To Service Withdrawn Details Rep Num
N15 4-6-0 30804 71A Eastleigh 12/1926 17/02/1962 Around the works. - Works yard.  
LN 4-6-0 30852 BM Bournemouth 07/1928 17/02/1962 Around the works. - Works yard.  
V 4-4-0 30900 75A Brighton 03/1930 10/02/1962 Around the works. - Works yard.  
V 4-4-0 30909 70C Guildford 07/1930 17/02/1962 Around the works. - Works yard.  
V 4-4-0 30915 75B Redhill 05/1933 23/12/1962 Around the works. - Works yard.  
C 0-6-0 31317 73A Stewarts Lane 03/1908 24/02/1962 Around the works. - Works yard.  
C 0-6-0 31584 73A Stewarts Lane 06/1903 17/02/1962 Around the works. - Works yard.  
U 2-6-0 31638 70C Guildford 05/1931 12/01/1964 Around the works. - Erecting shop.  
C 0-6-0 31717 73B Bricklayers Arms 01/1901 24/02/1962 Around the works. - Works yard.  
N 2-6-0 31828 73B Bricklayers Arms 07/1924 06/09/1964 Around the works. - Erecting shop.  
N 2-6-0 31830 72A Exmouth Junction 06/1924 05/01/1964 Around the works. - Works yard.  
N 2-6-0 31842 72A Exmouth Junction 08/1924 05/09/1965 Around the works. - Works yard.  
N 2-6-0 31851 75B Redhill 02/1925 09/1963 Around the works. - Erecting shop.  
N 2-6-0 31862 75B Redhill 05/1925 11/04/1965 Around the works. - Erecting shop.  
N 2-6-0 31866 75B Redhill 05/1925 09/01/1966 Around the works. - Works yard.  
N 2-6-0 31875 72A Exmouth Junction 08/1925 10/08/1964 Around the works. - Works yard.  
U1 2-6-0 31895 73A Stewarts Lane 03/1931 23/12/1962 Around the works. - Erecting shop.  
E6 0-6-2T 32416 70B Feltham 11/1905 10/02/1962 Around the works. - Works yard.