Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 1024 Today
» 1075 Yesterday
» 3123 Week
» 14694 Month
» 262987 Year
» 1147368 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Timelines

Eastleigh Works visit. - Saturday 25/02/1961
Class Wheels Loco Code Allocation To Service Withdrawn Details Rep Num
    D6563     22/07/1961 30/10/1987 Around the works. - Erecting shop.  
04 0-6-0 11220 73F Ashford 10/04/1957 13/06/1968 Around the works. - Works yard.  
08 0-6-0 D3042 70B Feltham 03/02/1954 10/07/1982 Around the works. - Works yard.  
08 0-6-0 13271 73C Hither Green 29/09/1956 19/12/1982 Around the works. - Works yard.  
08 0-6-0 D3471 73C Hither Green 28/08/1957 06/01/1987 Around the works. - Erecting shop.  
24 Bo-Bo D5012 73C Hither Green 11/04/1959 16/08/1975 Around the works. - Erecting shop.  
24 Bo-Bo D5014 73C Hither Green 09/05/1959 05/10/1975 Around the works. - Erecting shop.  
33 Bo-Bo D6500 73C Hither Green 30/01/1960 17/03/1988 Around the works. - Works yard.  
33 Bo-Bo D6503 73C Hither Green 19/03/1960 05/08/1987 Around the works. - Works yard.  
33 Bo-Bo D6506 73C Hither Green 23/04/1960 06/08/1991 Around the works. - Erecting shop.  
33 Bo-Bo D6507 73C Hither Green 04/05/1960 10/12/1986 Around the works. - Erecting shop.  
33 Bo-Bo D6514 73C Hither Green 02/07/1960 Around the works. - Erecting shop.  
12 0-6-0 15212     09/04/1949 31/12/1971 Around the works. - Erecting shop.  
    E6002     12/03/1962 Around the works. - Erecting shop.  
BR5 4-6-0 73084 70A Nine Elms 07/1955 19/12/1965 Around the works. - Erecting shop.  
BR5 4-6-0 73119 70A Nine Elms 12/1956 19/03/1967 Around the works. - Erecting shop.  
BR4/2 2-6-0 76016 71A Eastleigh 05/1953 02/10/1966 Around the works. - Erecting shop.  
BR4/2 2-6-0 76025 71A Eastleigh 10/1953 31/10/1965 Around the works. - Works yard.  
BR4/2 2-6-0 76029 71A Eastleigh 11/1953 04/10/1964 Around the works. - Works yard.  
BR4/2 2-6-0 76063 71A Eastleigh 07/1956 09/04/1967 Around the works. - Erecting shop.  
BR4/3 2-6-4T 80010 75E Three Bridges 10/07/1951 14/06/1964 Around the works. - Erecting shop.  
BR4/3 2-6-4T 80064 73F Ashford 09/06/1953 25/08/1965 Around the works. - Behind erecting shop.  
BR4/3 2-6-4T 80141 75F Tunbridge Wells West 25/07/1956 09/01/1966 Around the works. - Erecting shop.  
BR4/3 2-6-4T 80151 75A Brighton 18/01/1957 07/05/1967 Around the works. - Erecting shop.  
BR9F 2-10-0 92239 81C Southall 30/09/1958 17/11/1966 Around the works. - Erecting shop.  
2MT 2-6-2T 41316 72D Plymouth Friary 06/1952 02/10/1966 Around the works. - Erecting shop.  
2MT 2-6-2T 41317 72D Plymouth Friary 06/1952 19/12/1964 Around the works. - Erecting shop.  
2MT 2-6-2T 41324 8G Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) 03/1952 03/10/1965 Around the works. - Works yard.  
M7 0-4-4T 30045 72A Exmouth Junction 05/1905 08/12/1962 Around the works. - Erecting shop.  
M7 0-4-4T 30059 Withdrawn 03/1906 25/02/1961 Around the works. - Behind erecting shop.  
T9 4-4-0 30120 71A Eastleigh 08/1899 07/1963 Around the works. - Erecting shop.  
H15 4-6-0 30475 SAL Salisbury 03/1924 09/12/1961 Around the works. - Behind erecting shop.  
H15 4-6-0 30476 71A Eastleigh 04/1924 09/12/1961 Around the works. - Behind erecting shop.  
S15 4-6-0 30515 FEL Feltham 04/1921 14/07/1963 Around the works. - Erecting shop.  
700 0-6-0 30692 72B Salisbury 03/1897 03/02/1962 Around the works. - Behind erecting shop.  
N15 4-6-0 30781 71B Bournemouth 07/1925 12/05/1962 Around the works. - Erecting shop.  
S15 4-6-0 30838 FEL Feltham 05/1936 19/09/1965 Around the works. - Erecting shop.  
S15 4-6-0 30843 EXJ Exmouth Junction 09/1936 20/09/1964 Around the works. - Erecting shop.  
LN 4-6-0 30864 71A Eastleigh 11/1929 27/01/1962 Around the works. - Behind erecting shop.  
Z 0-8-0T 30955 72A Exmouth Junction 07/1929 12/1962 Around the works. - Erecting shop.  
N 2-6-0 31413 73H Dover Marine 01/1934 14/06/1964 Around the works. - Erecting shop.  
U 2-6-0 31795 71A Eastleigh 06/1928 23/06/1963 Around the works. - Erecting shop.  
U 2-6-0 31798 72C Yeovil Town 08/1928 14/09/1964 Around the works. - Erecting shop.  
Q1 0-6-0 33020 ELH Eastleigh 05/1942 09/01/1966 Around the works. - Works yard.  
Q1 0-6-0 33039 73J Tonbridge 12/1942 14/06/1964 Around the works. - Erecting shop.  
MN 4-6-2 35025 72A Exmouth Junction 11/1948 14/09/1964 Around the works. - Erecting shop.  
A1X 0-6-0T 32636 75A Brighton 09/1872 04/11/1963 Around the works. - Erecting shop.  
A1X 0-6-0T 32646 71A Eastleigh 01/1877 04/11/1963 Around the works. - Erecting shop.  
Q 0-6-0 30542 71A Eastleigh 03/1939 20/12/1964 Around the works. - Erecting shop.  
Q 0-6-0 30545 75E Three Bridges 06/1939 18/04/1965 Around the works. - Erecting shop.  
WCBB 4-6-2 34002 EXJ Exmouth Junction 06/1945 02/04/1967 Around the works. - Erecting shop.  
WCBB 4-6-2 34011 72A Exmouth Junction 10/1945 30/11/1963 Around the works. - Erecting shop.  
WCBB 4-6-2 34018 70A Nine Elms 12/1945 09/07/1967 Around the works. - Erecting shop.  
WCBB 4-6-2 34024 EXJ Exmouth Junction 02/1946 09/07/1967 Around the works. - Erecting shop.  
WCBB 4-6-2 34066 72A Exmouth Junction 09/1947 04/09/1966 Around the works. - Erecting shop.