Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 434 Today
» 1031 Yesterday
» 7441 Week
» 13575 Month
» 241459 Year
» 1463024 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Timelines

Doncaster Works visit. - Sunday 26/02/1961
Class Wheels Loco Code Allocation To Service Withdrawn Details Rep Num
    D380     05/03/1962 01/06/1983 Around the works. - Paint shop.  
    D5376     21/02/1962 09/01/1986 Around the works. - Paint shop.  
05 0-6-0 D2408 40A Lincoln 11/02/1957 07/05/1967 Around the works. - Paint shop.  
08 0-6-0 D3129 41B Sheffield Grimesthorpe 31/08/1954 19/06/1983 Around the works. - Erecting shop.  
10 0-6-0 D3440 34E New England 27/09/1957 28/12/1968 Around the works. - Erecting shop.  
10 0-6-0 D3480 36A Doncaster 28/01/1958 18/08/1968 Around the works. - Erecting shop.  
10 0-6-0 D3482 36A Doncaster 28/02/1958 22/06/1968 Around the works. - Erecting shop.  
30 A1A-A1A D5525 31B March 09/04/1959 31/10/2008 Around the works. - Outside erecting shop.  
30 A1A-A1A D5605 30A Stratford 07/04/1960 21/02/1991 Around the works. - Outside erecting shop.  
30 A1A-A1A D5643 34G Finsbury Park 25/08/1960 20/04/1988 Around the works. - Outside erecting shop.  
30 A1A-A1A D5655 31B March 29/09/1960 10/08/2001 Around the works. - Erecting shop.  
30 A1A-A1A D5663 31B March 03/11/1960 01/07/1995 Around the works. - Erecting shop.  
30 A1A-A1A D5670 31B March 05/01/1961 14/12/1998 Around the works. - Outside erecting shop.  
37 Co-Co D6700 30A Stratford 02/12/1960 01/12/1999 Around the works. - New erecting shop.  
37 Co-Co D6707 31B March 03/02/1961 Around the works. - Erecting shop.  
37 Co-Co D6709 30A Stratford 17/02/1961 01/03/1995 Around the works. - Erecting shop.  
    37341     19/05/1961 01/09/1994 Around the works. - Erecting shop.  
20 Bo-Bo D8027 34G Finsbury Park 11/12/1959 19/12/1982 Around the works. - New erecting shop.  
15 Bo-Bo D8210 34G Finsbury Park 05/11/1959 27/03/1971 Around the works. - Erecting shop.  
11 0-6-0 12126 40B Immingham 15/11/1952 25/11/1968 Around the works. - Paint shop.  
    E3071     27/10/1962 01/07/1991 Around the works. - Paint shop.  
    E3072     06/07/1962 04/08/1987 Around the works. - Paint shop.  
    E3073     31/01/1963 15/10/1991 Around the works. - New erecting shop.  
    E3074     05/12/1962 01/12/1989 Around the works. - New erecting shop.  
    E3075     19/01/1963 17/10/1990 Around the works. - New erecting shop.  
    E3076     19/04/1963 01/10/1990 Around the works. - New erecting shop.  
    E3077     02/03/1963 19/02/1989 Around the works. - New erecting shop.  
    E3078     19/03/1963 02/04/1990 Around the works. - New erecting shop.  
    E3079     10/10/1963 01/05/1990 Around the works. - Boiler shop.  
    E3080     30/03/1963 08/01/1990 Around the works. - Boiler shop.  
BRIT 4-6-2 70036 31B March 23/12/1952 15/10/1966 Around the works. - Outside stripping shop.  
BRIT 4-6-2 70038 31B March 29/01/1953 12/08/1967 Around the works. - Erecting shop.  
BR5 4-6-0 73016 19B Sheffield Millhouses 09/1951 04/12/1966 Around the works. - Outside stripping shop.  
BR5 4-6-0 73036 84G Shrewsbury 08/1953 25/09/1965 Around the works. - Erecting shop.  
4MT 2-6-0 43080 40F Boston 26/10/1950 20/06/1965 Around the works. - Erecting shop.  
4MT 2-6-0 43158 40A Lincoln 16/07/1952 03/01/1965 Around the works. - Works yard.  
A1 4-6-2 60119 36A Doncaster 26/11/1948 31/05/1964 Around the works. - Weigh house.  
A1 4-6-2 60129 52B Heaton 15/06/1949 11/10/1965 Around the works. - Erecting shop.  
A1 4-6-2 60139 36A Doncaster 23/12/1948 07/06/1964 Around the works. - Erecting shop.  
A1 4-6-2 60153 YK York (North) 26/08/1949 02/11/1962 Around the works. - Works yard.  
A1 4-6-2 60162 64B Haymarket 23/12/1949 28/10/1963 Around the works. - Outside stripping shop.  
A3 4-6-2 60039 34A Kings Cross 09/09/1934 14/03/1963 Around the works. - Works yard.  
A3 4-6-2 60040 52A Gateshead 27/10/1934 06/07/1964 Around the works. - Outside stripping shop.  
A4 4-6-2 60026 34A Kings Cross 20/02/1937 21/12/1965 Around the works. - Weigh house.  
A4 4-6-2 60028 KX Kings Cross 20/03/1937 29/12/1962 Around the works. - Outside erecting shop.  
A4 4-6-2 60030 34A Kings Cross 30/08/1937 29/12/1962 Around the works. - Erecting shop.  
A4 4-6-2 60032 34A Kings Cross 17/05/1938 20/10/1963 Around the works. - Erecting shop.  
A3 4-6-2 60108 34A Kings Cross 16/06/1923 19/10/1963 Around the works. - Stripping shop.  
A3 4-6-2 60051 52A Gateshead 12/11/1924 23/11/1964 Around the works. - Erecting shop.  
A3 4-6-2 60067 34A Kings Cross 14/08/1924 29/12/1962 Around the works. - Works yard.  
A3 4-6-2 60078 52A Gateshead 24/10/1924 22/10/1962 Around the works. - Paint shop.  
A2 4-6-2 60500 35A New England 24/05/1946 16/06/1963 Around the works. - Stripping shop.  
A2 4-6-2 60517 HTN Heaton 28/11/1946 12/11/1962 Around the works. - Works yard.  
B1 4-6-0 61000 40E Colwick 12/12/1942 05/03/1962 Around the works. - Works yard.  
B1 4-6-0 61058 40A Lincoln 10/07/1946 10/02/1966 Around the works. - Works yard.  
B1 4-6-0 61234 41A Sheffield Darnall 16/09/1947 13/08/1962 Around the works. - Works yard.  
B1 4-6-0 61281 38A Colwick 27/01/1948 19/02/1966 Around the works. - Erecting shop.  
B1 4-6-0 61285 40E Colwick 09/02/1948 19/12/1965 Around the works. - Ex-Works.  
B1 4-6-0 61315 SHF Sheffield Darnall 30/04/1948 10/02/1966 Around the works. - Paint shop.  
J6 0-6-0 64177 NWE New England 11/1911 21/02/1962 Around the works. - Scrap road.  
J6 0-6-0 64191 40F Boston 11/1912 21/02/1962 Around the works. - Scrap road.  
J6 0-6-0 64245 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 10/1917 20/02/1962 Around the works. - Scrap road.  
J50 0-6-0T 68928 34B Hornsey 12/1922 09/1962 Around the works. - Works shunter.  
K1 2-6-0 62014 36C Frodingham 05/07/1949 06/06/1965 Around the works. - Works yard.  
K1 2-6-0 62034 63D Fort William 01/09/1949 29/12/1962 Around the works. - Outside stripping shop.  
K3 2-6-0 61818 51L Thornaby 10/1924 05/03/1962 Around the works. - Scrap road.  
K3 2-6-0 61945 HLD Hull Dairycoates 09/1935 26/02/1962 Around the works. - Scrap road.  
K3 2-6-0 61966 40B Immingham 06/1936 19/02/1962 Around the works. - Scrap road.  
O2 2-8-0 63932 GRA Grantham 01/11/1923 22/09/1963 Around the works. - Stripping shop.  
O2 2-8-0 63942 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 22/03/1924 08/09/1963 Around the works. - Works yard.  
O2 2-8-0 63945 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 22/05/1924 22/09/1963 Around the works. - Erecting shop.  
O2 2-8-0 63984 36A Doncaster 31/12/1942 03/11/1963 Around the works. - Erecting shop.  
O1 2-8-0 63571 41H Staveley (G.C.) 10/1912 13/12/1964 Around the works. - Paint shop.  
O1 2-8-0 63630 41H Staveley (G.C.) 02/1918 11/07/1965 Around the works. - Erecting shop.  
O1 2-8-0 63652 41H Staveley (G.C.) 03/1918 11/11/1963 Around the works. - Outside stripping shop.  
O4 2-8-0 63858 36A Doncaster 07/1919 17/04/1966 Around the works. - Works shunter.  
O1 2-8-0 63872 31B March 05/1919 30/01/1964 Around the works. - Erecting shop.  
V2 2-6-2 60850 36A Doncaster 17/03/1939 26/02/1962 Around the works. - Outside stripping shop.  
V2 2-6-2 60870 DON Doncaster 12/08/1939 16/07/1963 Around the works. - Paint shop.  
V2 2-6-2 60871 34A Kings Cross 01/09/1939 22/09/1963 Around the works. - Erecting shop.  
V2 2-6-2 60875 36A Doncaster 28/07/1939 05/03/1962 Around the works. - Outside stripping shop.  
V2 2-6-2 60905 36A Doncaster 10/04/1940 22/09/1963 Around the works. - Works yard.  
V2 2-6-2 60928 36A Doncaster 24/06/1941 05/03/1962 Around the works. - Works yard.