Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 28 Online
» 585 Today
» 1269 Yesterday
» 8924 Week
» 6032 Month
» 112978 Year
» 1334543 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Timelines

Birds Scrapyard, Bridgend - Saturday 07/05/1966
Class Wheels Loco Code Allocation To Service Withdrawn Details Rep Num
5101 2-6-2T 4158 Withdrawn 25/08/1947 06/1965 Dumped  
5700 0-6-0PT 9642 Withdrawn 03/04/1946 11/1964 Dumped  
BR5 4-6-0 73168 Withdrawn 04/1957 19/12/1965 Dumped  
BR3/2 2-6-2T 82004 Withdrawn 14/05/1952 01/10/1965 Dumped  
3F 0-6-0T 47499 Withdrawn 04/1928 28/08/1965 Dumped  
WCBB 4-6-2 34014 Withdrawn 11/1945 21/03/1965 Dumped  
WCBB 4-6-2 34062 Withdrawn 05/1947 08/1964 Dumped  
WCBB 4-6-2 34063 Withdrawn 05/1947 15/08/1965 Dumped  
WCBB 4-6-2 34075 Withdrawn 06/1948 13/04/1964 Dumped  
Jubilee 4-6-0 45655 Withdrawn 13/12/1934 17/04/1965 Dumped