Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 104 Today
» 1086 Yesterday
» 104 Week
» 21006 Month
» 21006 Year
» 1242571 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Timelines

Gorton Works visit - Sunday 15/08/1954
Class Wheels Loco Code Allocation To Service Withdrawn Details Rep Num
    27006     31/12/1954 05/10/1968 Around the works. - Completed.  
76 Bo+Bo 26000     19/02/1941 22/03/1970 Around the works.  
76 Bo+Bo 26019     22/09/1951 09/10/1971 Around the works. - Collision damage.  
76 Bo+Bo 26025     19/01/1952 07/1981 Around the works. - Collision damage.  
WD/8 2-8-0 90075 38A Colwick 08/1944 17/04/1966 Around the works.  
WD/8 2-8-0 90031 36C Frodingham 01/1943 18/05/1963 Around the works.  
WD/8 2-8-0 90084     09/1944 06/06/1965 Around the works. - Awaiting works.  
WD/8 2-8-0 90499     09/1944 12/1963 Around the works.  
WD/8 2-8-0 90697 38E Woodford Halse 01/1945 14/11/1965 Around the works.  
A5 4-6-2T 69812 LNG Langwith Junction 30/11/1912 07/07/1959 Around the works.  
A5 4-6-2T 69820 40B Immingham 27/01/1923 14/11/1960 Around the works.  
A5 4-6-2T 69831 51A Darlington 03/10/1925 27/11/1958 Around the works.  
A5 4-6-2T 69834 51E Stockton 14/11/1925 11/11/1958 Around the works.  
B1 4-6-0 61056 38A Colwick 04/07/1946 19/04/1964 Around the works. - Awaiting works.  
B1 4-6-0 61066 ANN Annesley 19/08/1946 16/09/1962 Around the works.  
B1 4-6-0 61157 36A Doncaster 09/05/1947 01/08/1965 Around the works. - Awaiting works.  
B1 4-6-0 61162 37B Copley Hill (Leeds) 21/05/1947 08/12/1964 Around the works.  
B1 4-6-0 61201 38A Colwick 10/06/1947 01/01/1962 Around the works.  
B1 4-6-0 61386 37B Copley Hill (Leeds) 30/10/1951 31/12/1966 Around the works. - Awaiting works.  
B1 4-6-0 61406 40B Immingham 20/05/1950 17/04/1966 Around the works.  
C13 4-4-2T 67408 Withdrawn 06/1903 10/05/1954 Around the works. - Marked with an 'X' (condemned)  
J10 0-6-0 65132     03/1896 10/05/1958 Around the works. - Awaiting works.  
J11 0-6-0 64314     04/1902 23/09/1962 Around the works.  
J11 0-6-0 64354     11/1903 21/10/1962 Around the works. - Awaiting works.  
J11 0-6-0 64358     28/02/1904 24/10/1955 Around the works. - Awaiting works.  
J11 0-6-0 64361     03/1904 25/03/1959 Around the works.  
J11 0-6-0 64368     06/1904 28/05/1960 Around the works. - Awaiting works.  
J11 0-6-0 64380     08/1904 06/08/1956 Around the works. - Awaiting works.  
J11 0-6-0 64402     03/1907 25/07/1961 Around the works. - Awaiting works.  
J11 0-6-0 64423     10/1907 30/03/1962 Around the works. - Awaiting works.  
J11 0-6-0 64431     12/1907 24/10/1956 Around the works.  
J39 0-6-0 64709 53A Hull Dairycoates 09/11/1926 23/11/1962 Around the works.  
J39 0-6-0 64720 37A Ardsley 28/04/1927 08/09/1961 Around the works. - Awaiting works.  
J39 0-6-0 64732 37A Ardsley 30/05/1927 25/08/1961 Around the works.  
J39 0-6-0 64741 GOR Gorton 16/07/1927 11/07/1960 Around the works.  
J39 0-6-0 64810 GOR Gorton 26/11/1929 26/06/1961 Around the works. - Awaiting works.  
J39 0-6-0 64823 38A Colwick 18/09/1931 05/01/1961 Around the works.  
J39 0-6-0 64845 SBK Starbeck 09/11/1932 21/07/1961 Around the works.  
J39 0-6-0 64878 SHF Sheffield Neepsend 03/07/1935 18/02/1961 Around the works.  
J39 0-6-0 64983 CLK Colwick 05/06/1941 10/11/1959 Around the works. - Awaiting works.  
J39 0-6-0 64988 CLK Colwick 21/08/1941 30/12/1959 Around the works. - Awaiting works.  
J69 0-6-0T 68585 TFD Trafford Park (LNER) 03/1899 06/1958 Around the works. - Awaiting works.  
J94 0-6-0ST 68030 6F Bidston 05/1945 07/04/1962 Around the works.  
L3 2-6-4T 69052 Withdrawn 02/1915 09/08/1954 Around the works. - Marked with an 'X' (condemned)  
N4 0-6-2T 69235 Withdrawn 01/1891 08/1954 Around the works. - Marked with an 'X' (condemned)  
O4 2-8-0 63598 39A Gorton 11/1911 03/11/1962 Around the works.  
O4 2-8-0 63643 40E Langwith Junction 08/1912 30/11/1960 Around the works.  
O4 2-8-0 63684 38A Colwick 07/1912 12/12/1963 Around the works. - Awaiting works.  
O4 2-8-0 63719 39A Gorton 09/1912 01/08/1961 Around the works. - Awaiting works.  
O4 2-8-0 63722 39A Gorton 09/1912 24/09/1963 Around the works.  
O4 2-8-0 63761 36C Frodingham 08/1912 18/06/1959 Around the works. - Awaiting works.  
O1 2-8-0 63746 ANN Annesley 10/1917 27/02/1964 Around the works.  
O4 2-8-0 63756 CLK Colwick 01/1918 18/06/1959 Around the works. - Awaiting works.  
O1 2-8-0 63687 38B Annesley 02/1918 16/10/1963 Around the works.  
O4 2-8-0 63656 36D Barnsley 06/1918 19/11/1962 Around the works. - Awaiting works.  
O4 2-8-0 63695 39B Sheffield Darnall 05/1918 09/12/1962 Around the works. - Awaiting works.  
O4 2-8-0 63697 BRN Barnsley 06/1918 29/08/1965 Around the works.  
O4 2-8-0 63702 38D Staveley (G.C.) 07/1918 19/09/1964 Around the works.  
O4 2-8-0 63877 38A Colwick 06/1919 21/03/1965 Around the works.  
O1 2-8-0 63887 38B Annesley 09/1919 02/03/1963 Around the works. - Awaiting works.