Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 3083 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16489 Week
» 69505 Month
» 189032 Year
» 3215885 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Timelines
Swindon Works visit - Sunday 22/08/1954
Class |
Wheels |
Loco |
Code |
Allocation |
To Service |
Withdrawn |
Details |
Rep Num |
|
|
77018 |
|
|
26/08/1954 |
29/11/1966 |
Around the works. - Complete |
|
|
|
77019 |
|
|
03/09/1954 |
29/11/1966 |
Around the works. - Complete |
|
|
|
82020 |
|
|
29/09/1954 |
19/09/1965 |
Around the works. - Under construction - frames and cylinders |
|
|
|
82022 |
|
|
15/10/1954 |
17/10/1965 |
Around the works. - Under construction - frames cut |
|
6000 |
4-6-0 |
6013 |
PDN |
Old Oak Common |
05/1928 |
19/06/1962 |
Around the works. - New front end and and frames between middle & rear driving boxes |
|
Std 3MT |
2-6-0 |
77017 |
67B |
Hurlford |
20/08/1954 |
29/11/1966 |
Around the works. - On shed. |
|
Std 9F |
2-10-0 |
92002 |
86A |
Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
16/01/1954 |
11/11/1967 |
Around the works. - In "A" shop. |
|