Timelines
Class | Wheels | Loco | Code | Allocation | To Service | Withdrawn | Details | Rep Num |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1000 | 4-6-0 | 1013 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 11/02/1946 | 24/07/1964 | Around the works. | |
2800 | 2-8-0 | 2812 | 84C | Banbury | 11/1905 | 01/01/1959 | Around the works. | |
2251 | 0-6-0 | 3200 | MCH | Machynlleth | 21/09/1946 | 15/01/1965 | Around the works. | |
2251 | 0-6-0 | 3205 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 18/10/1946 | 21/05/1965 | Around the works. | |
5101 | 2-6-2T | 4103 | 84A | Stafford Road | 29/08/1935 | 07/09/1964 | Around the works. | |
5101 | 2-6-2T | 4125 | BHD | Birkenhead Mollington Street | 02/05/1938 | 19/06/1965 | Around the works. | |
1400 | 0-4-2T | 1418 | WOS | Worcester | 26/04/1933 | 10/1958 | Around the works. | |
5101 | 2-6-2T | 5151 | 84A | Stafford Road | 22/02/1930 | 17/08/1962 | Around the works. | |
5101 | 2-6-2T | 5166 | TYS | Tyseley | 11/1930 | 30/05/1961 | Around the works. | |
5101 | 2-6-2T | 5184 | 84D | Leamington | 03/1931 | 23/10/1964 | Around the works. | |
4300 | 2-6-0 | 5316 | BHD | Birkenhead Mollington Street | 07/1917 | 21/06/1956 | Around the works. | |
4575 | 2-6-2T | 5517 | MCH | Machynlleth | 12/1927 | 01/12/1958 | Around the works. | |
5700 | 0-6-0PT | 5758 | WLN | Wellington | 05/1929 | 15/05/1962 | Around the works. | |
6100 | 2-6-2T | 6114 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 09/1931 | 23/10/1964 | Around the works. | |
4300 | 2-6-0 | 6316 | CNYD | Croes Newydd | 01/1921 | 25/07/1962 | Around the works. | |
6800 | 4-6-0 | 6865 | RDG | Reading (W.R.) | 01/03/1939 | 08/05/1962 | Around the works. | |
4300 | 2-6-0 | 7309 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 11/1921 | 27/09/1962 | Around the works. | |
7400 | 0-6-0PT | 7448 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | 12/04/1950 | 19/04/1963 | Around the works. | |
5700 | 0-6-0PT | 7763 | BAN | Banbury | 01/1931 | 16/11/1959 | Around the works. | |
Earl | 4-4-0 | 9013 | MCH | Machynlleth | 28/07/1937 | 01/12/1958 | Around the works. | |
Earl | 4-4-0 | 9021 | MCH | Machynlleth | 30/11/1938 | 01/12/1958 | Around the works. | |
9400 | 0-6-0PT | 9421 | 07/07/1950 | 12/02/1962 | Around the works. | |||
5700 | 0-6-0PT | 9785 | DYD | Duffryn Yard | 07/05/1936 | 01/09/1962 | Around the works. | |
WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90149 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 06/1943 | 23/01/1966 | Around the works. |