Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 102 Today
» 1086 Yesterday
» 102 Week
» 21004 Month
» 21004 Year
» 1242569 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Timelines

A visit to Frodingham shed - Sunday 08/11/1964
Class Wheels Loco Code Allocation To Service Withdrawn Details Rep Num
47 Co-Co D1536 41A Tinsley 22/08/1963 25/01/1989 On shed  
47 Co-Co D1557 41A Tinsley 29/02/1964 15/12/1992 On shed  
10 0-6-0 D3639 36C Frodingham 25/11/1958 07/1969 On shed  
8F 2-8-0 48205 9K Bolton 07/1942 23/12/1967 On shed  
WD/8 2-8-0 90315 36C Frodingham 08/1944 21/11/1965 On shed  
WD/8 2-8-0 90053 36C Frodingham 04/1944 04/07/1965 On shed  
WD/8 2-8-0 90059 36C Frodingham 05/1944 04/04/1965 On shed  
WD/8 2-8-0 90073 36A Doncaster 08/1944 27/02/1966 On shed  
WD/8 2-8-0 90000 36C Frodingham 02/1943 06/06/1965 On shed  
WD/8 2-8-0 90115 36C Frodingham 03/1943 09/05/1965 On shed  
WD/8 2-8-0 90119 36C Frodingham 03/1943 17/01/1965 On shed  
WD/8 2-8-0 90120 36C Frodingham 03/1943 04/04/1965 On shed  
WD/8 2-8-0 90124 56A Wakefield 04/1943 21/06/1965 On shed  
WD/8 2-8-0 90133 36C Frodingham 04/1943 17/10/1965 On shed  
WD/8 2-8-0 90139 41D Canklow 05/1943 02/05/1965 On shed  
WD/8 2-8-0 90537 36C Frodingham 06/1943 27/02/1966 On shed  
WD/8 2-8-0 90422 36C Frodingham 08/1943 06/06/1965 On shed  
WD/8 2-8-0 90573 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill) 10/1943 15/08/1965 On shed  
WD/8 2-8-0 90154 36A Doncaster 06/1943 17/04/1966 On shed  
WD/8 2-8-0 90013 36C Frodingham 09/1943 17/04/1966 On shed  
WD/8 2-8-0 90070 36C Frodingham 06/1944 21/02/1965 On shed  
WD/8 2-8-0 90007 36C Frodingham 05/1943 11/07/1965 On shed  
WD/8 2-8-0 90232 36C Frodingham 05/1943 02/01/1966 On shed  
WD/8 2-8-0 90236 56B Ardsley 06/1943 09/09/1967 On shed  
WD/8 2-8-0 90242 40B Immingham 06/1943 19/09/1965 On shed  
WD/8 2-8-0 90024 36C Frodingham 10/1943 27/02/1966 On shed  
WD/8 2-8-0 90025 36C Frodingham 10/1943 01/08/1965 On shed  
WD/8 2-8-0 90032 36C Frodingham 01/1943 27/02/1966 On shed  
WD/8 2-8-0 90279 36A Doncaster 02/1943 27/06/1965 On shed  
WD/8 2-8-0 90601 36C Frodingham 02/1943 06/06/1965 On shed  
WD/8 2-8-0 90613 36C Frodingham 01/1944 30/05/1965 On shed  
WD/8 2-8-0 90439 36C Frodingham 03/1944 07/11/1965 On shed  
WD/8 2-8-0 90372 36A Doncaster 09/1944 19/12/1965 On shed  
WD/8 2-8-0 90456 36C Frodingham 04/1944 27/02/1966 On shed  
WD/8 2-8-0 90471 41D Canklow 06/1944 17/04/1966 On shed  
WD/8 2-8-0 90647 36C Frodingham 07/1944 07/03/1965 On shed  
WD/8 2-8-0 90665 36C Frodingham 10/1944 19/12/1965 On shed  
WD/8 2-8-0 90714 36C Frodingham 02/1945 13/12/1964 On shed  
B1 4-6-0 61013 56B Ardsley 14/12/1946 06/12/1966 On shed  
B1 4-6-0 61158 36A Doncaster 14/05/1947 17/04/1966 On shed  
B1 4-6-0 61289 53A Hull Dairycoates 18/02/1948 24/06/1967 On shed  
B1 4-6-0 61329 36A Doncaster 18/06/1948 17/04/1966 On shed  
K1 2-6-0 62017 36C Frodingham 12/07/1949 20/02/1967 On shed  
K1 2-6-0 62035 36C Frodingham 07/09/1949 18/07/1965 On shed  
O4 2-8-0 63586 36C Frodingham 10/1911 03/10/1965 On shed  
O4 2-8-0 63671 FRO Frodingham 05/1912 13/06/1965 On shed  
O4 2-8-0 63741 36C Frodingham 10/1917 04/04/1965 On shed  
O4 2-8-0 63688 RET Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 02/1918 26/09/1965 On shed  
O4 2-8-0 63653 36C Frodingham 04/1918 17/04/1966 On shed  
O4 2-8-0 63781 36C Frodingham 05/1918 17/04/1966 On shed  
O4 2-8-0 63788 FRO Frodingham 06/1918 02/01/1966 On shed  
O4 2-8-0 63793 FRO Frodingham 02/1918 09/05/1965 On shed  
O4 2-8-0 63802 Withdrawn 04/1918 23/06/1964 On shed  
O4 2-8-0 63807 Withdrawn 05/1918 25/09/1964 On shed  
O4 2-8-0 63813 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 06/1918 07/03/1965 On shed  
O4 2-8-0 63628 36C Frodingham 03/1919 05/09/1965 On shed  
O4 2-8-0 63884 Withdrawn 08/1919 09/06/1964 On shed  
O4 2-8-0 63728 FRO Frodingham 10/1919 20/12/1964 On shed  
O4 2-8-0 63906 FRO Frodingham 06/1918 03/01/1965 On shed