Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 549 Today
» 1099 Yesterday
» 1648 Week
» 7782 Month
» 235666 Year
» 1457231 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Timelines

A visit to Retford (G.N.) shed - Saturday 24/10/1964
Class Wheels Loco Code Allocation To Service Withdrawn Details Rep Num
10 0-6-0 D3612 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 27/06/1958 15/03/1969 On shed  
WD/8 2-8-0 90522 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 05/1943 02/05/1965 On shed  
B1 4-6-0 61055 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 04/07/1946 27/02/1966 On shed  
B1 4-6-0 61107 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 13/12/1946 15/08/1965 On shed  
B1 4-6-0 61127 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 12/02/1947 15/08/1965 On shed - In steam  
K1 2-6-0 62019 Withdrawn 15/07/1949 02/07/1964 On shed - On the scrap line  
O4 2-8-0 63692 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 07/1912 14/02/1965 On shed - Dead