Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 328 Today
» 1031 Yesterday
» 7335 Week
» 13469 Month
» 241353 Year
» 1462918 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Timelines

A visit to Retford (G.C.) shed (Thrumpton) - Sunday 08/11/1964
Class Wheels Loco Code Allocation To Service Withdrawn Details Rep Num
WD/8 2-8-0 90528 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 06/1943 26/09/1965 Dead on shed  
WD/8 2-8-0 90146 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 06/1943 13/06/1965 Dead on shed  
WD/8 2-8-0 90285 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 02/1943 13/06/1965 Dead on shed  
WD/8 2-8-0 90042 36A Doncaster 02/1944 10/01/1965 Dead on shed  
WD/8 2-8-0 90460 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 05/1944 13/06/1965 Dead on shed  
WD/8 2-8-0 90501 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 09/1944 07/11/1965 Dead on shed  
B1 4-6-0 61348 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 09/06/1949 26/12/1965 Dead on shed  
O4 2-8-0 63692 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 07/1912 14/02/1965 Dead on shed  
O4 2-8-0 63738 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 08/1912 09/12/1962 Dead on shed  
O4 2-8-0 63702 Withdrawn 07/1918 19/09/1964 Dead on shed  
O4 2-8-0 63878 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 06/1919 14/03/1965 Dead on shed  
O4 2-8-0 63734 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 04/1920 08/08/1965 Dead on shed