Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 705 Today
» 947 Yesterday
» 1652 Week
» 20434 Month
» 268727 Year
» 1153108 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Timelines

A visit to Wigan Springs Branch shed - Saturday 29/04/1967
Class Wheels Loco Code Allocation To Service Withdrawn Details Rep Num
05 0-6-0 D2565 Withdrawn 15/06/1957 25/03/1967 On shed  
05 0-6-0 D2568 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 20/09/1957 26/08/1967 On shed  
05 0-6-0 11172 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 20/09/1957 26/08/1967 On shed  
D3/7 0-6-0 12020 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 30/06/1940 18/11/1967 On shed  
D3/7 0-6-0 12031 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 31/07/1942 30/12/1967 On shed  
BR4/1 4-6-0 75029 6C Croes Newydd 05/1954 12/08/1967 On shed - Dead  
BR4/2 2-6-0 76077 10D Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) 12/1956 02/12/1967 On shed  
BR9F 2-10-0 92153 8C Speke Junction 31/10/1957 30/01/1968 On shed  
8F 2-8-0 48082 Withdrawn 01/1937 15/04/1967 On shed  
8F 2-8-0 48114 Withdrawn 03/1939 01/04/1967 On shed  
8F 2-8-0 48117 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 04/1939 23/03/1968 On shed  
8F 2-8-0 48165 Withdrawn 03/1943 18/03/1967 On shed  
8F 2-8-0 48193 8G Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) 05/1942 06/01/1968 On shed  
8F 2-8-0 48221 Withdrawn 09/1942 04/02/1967 On shed  
8F 2-8-0 48261 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 02/1942 19/08/1967 On shed  
8F 2-8-0 48275 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 06/1942 24/06/1967 On shed  
8F 2-8-0 48363 8L Aintree 08/1944 18/11/1967 On shed  
8F 2-8-0 48379 Withdrawn 12/1944 18/03/1967 On shed  
8F 2-8-0 48410 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 22/09/1943 03/08/1968 On shed  
8F 2-8-0 48494 Withdrawn 08/1945 01/04/1967 On shed  
8F 2-8-0 48636 26F Patricroft 08/1943 02/09/1967 On shed  
8F 2-8-0 48678 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 06/1944 29/06/1968 On shed  
8F 2-8-0 48715 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 07/1944 03/08/1968 On shed  
8F 2-8-0 48724 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 09/1944 28/10/1967 On shed  
LOBST 2-6-0 42954 Withdrawn 06/12/1933 11/02/1967 On shed  
2MT 2-6-0 46432 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 25/12/1948 06/05/1967 On shed  
2MT 2-6-0 46515 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 06/01/1953 06/05/1967 On shed  
5MT 4-6-0 44710 Withdrawn 16/10/1948 24/12/1966 On shed  
5MT 4-6-0 44717 8A Edge Hill 04/12/1948 26/08/1967 On shed  
5MT 4-6-0 44732 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 28/02/1949 15/07/1967 On shed  
5MT 4-6-0 44737 Withdrawn 31/03/1949 14/01/1967 On shed  
5MT 4-6-0 44962 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 15/06/1946 30/12/1967 On shed  
5MT 4-6-0 45019 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 05/1935 13/05/1967 On shed  
5MT 4-6-0 45089 5B Crewe South 04/1935 26/08/1967 On shed  
5MT 4-6-0 45267 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 10/1936 14/10/1967 On shed  
5MT 4-6-0 45312 8B Warrington Dallam 02/1937 29/06/1968 On shed  
5MT 4-6-0 45331 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 03/1937 11/1967 On shed  
5MT 4-6-0 45368 9J Agecroft 06/1937 11/11/1967 On shed  
5MT 4-6-0 45372 Withdrawn 06/1937 26/11/1966 On shed  
5MT 4-6-0 45408 Withdrawn 09/1937 26/11/1966 On shed  
5MT 4-6-0 45425 10A Springs Branch (Wigan) 10/1937 21/10/1967 On shed  
5MT 4-6-0 45431 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 11/1937 02/12/1967 On shed