Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 177 Today
» 908 Yesterday
» 1085 Week
» 22067 Month
» 164021 Year
» 1048402 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Timelines

At Cohen's scrapyard, Kettering - Monday 01/09/1969
Class Wheels Loco Code Allocation To Service Withdrawn Details Rep Num
03 0-6-0 D2176 Withdrawn 15/12/1961 11/05/1968 In scrapyard  
10 0-6-0 D3444 Withdrawn 17/10/1957 29/12/1968 In scrapyard  
10 0-6-0 D3488 Withdrawn 27/03/1958 08/12/1968 In scrapyard  
10 0-6-0 D3491 Withdrawn 16/04/1958 17/12/1968 In scrapyard  
23 Bo-Bo D5903 Withdrawn 17/04/1959 30/12/1968 In scrapyard  
15 Bo-Bo D8202 Withdrawn 03/02/1958 30/09/1968 In scrapyard  
15 Bo-Bo D8213 Withdrawn 09/12/1959 22/12/1968 In scrapyard  
15 Bo-Bo D8223 Withdrawn 08/04/1960 22/12/1968 In scrapyard  
15 Bo-Bo D8227 Withdrawn 27/05/1960 30/09/1968 In scrapyard  
16 Bo-Bo D8400 Withdrawn 30/05/1958 07/07/1968 In scrapyard  
16 Bo-Bo D8402 Withdrawn 16/07/1958 07/07/1968 In scrapyard  
16 Bo-Bo D8405 Withdrawn 04/09/1958 30/09/1968 In scrapyard  
16 Bo-Bo D8407 Withdrawn 19/09/1958 30/09/1968 In scrapyard