Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 226 Today
» 1354 Yesterday
» 4472 Week
» 1580 Month
» 108526 Year
» 1330091 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Timelines

Salisbury depot - Sunday 23/10/1966
Class Wheels Loco Code Allocation To Service Withdrawn Details Rep Num
42 B-B D825 84A Laira 24/08/1960 23/08/1972 On shed  
42 B-B D829 83A Newton Abbot 23/11/1960 26/08/1972 On shed  
08 0-6-0 D3010 71A Eastleigh 17/12/1952 24/02/1980 On shed  
08 0-6-0 D3014 71A Eastleigh 24/12/1952 01/10/1972 On shed  
33 Bo-Bo D6506 71A Eastleigh 23/04/1960 06/08/1991 On shed  
33 Bo-Bo D6518 70D Eastleigh 19/08/1960 14/03/1989 On shed  
33 Bo-Bo D6575 73C Hither Green 04/11/1961 31/08/2005 On shed  
BR4/1 4-6-0 75059 10G Skipton 04/1957 22/07/1967 On shed  
BR4/2 2-6-0 76061 71A Eastleigh 07/1955 08/01/1967 On shed  
BR4/2 2-6-0 76067 72B Salisbury 08/1956 09/07/1967 On shed  
BR4/3 2-6-4T 80152 70D Eastleigh 06/02/1957 09/07/1967 On shed  
WCBB 4-6-2 34006 70E Salisbury 08/1945 19/03/1967 On shed  
WCBB 4-6-2 34015 70E Salisbury 11/1945 16/04/1967 On shed  
WCBB 4-6-2 34025 70F Bournemouth 03/1946 09/07/1967 On shed  
WCBB 4-6-2 34032 Withdrawn 06/1946 02/10/1966 On shed  
WCBB 4-6-2 34060 70D Eastleigh 04/1947 06/1967 On shed  
WCBB 4-6-2 34104 71A Eastleigh 04/1950 25/06/1967 On shed  
WCBB 4-6-2 34108 70E Salisbury 04/1950 25/06/1967 On shed