Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 990 Today
» 1016 Yesterday
» 6137 Week
» 16307 Month
» 294103 Year
» 1178484 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Timelines

Old Oak Common depot - Sunday 29/06/1969
Class Wheels Loco Code Allocation To Service Withdrawn Details Rep Num
43 B-B D840 Withdrawn 03/02/1961 26/04/1969 End of the Canal side line, without nameplates  
43 B-B D846 81A Old Oak Common 12/04/1961 22/05/1971 On shed  
43 B-B D848 Withdrawn 27/04/1961 26/03/1969 Without nameplates  
43 B-B D850 81A Old Oak Common 08/06/1961 22/05/1971 On shed  
43 B-B D853 81A Old Oak Common 30/08/1961 03/10/1971 On shed  
43 B-B D861 83A Newton Abbot 14/02/1962 03/10/1971 In the lifting shop, still in maroon.  
52 C-C D1019 84A Laira 02/05/1963 06/05/1973 On shed  
52 C-C D1034 82A Bristol Bath Road 15/04/1964 06/10/1975 On shed  
52 C-C D1044 84A Laira 12/11/1962 01/02/1975 On shed  
52 C-C D1060 84A Laira 11/04/1963 18/11/1973 On shed  
47 Co-Co D1609 82A Bristol Bath Road 11/08/1964 01/04/2003 On shed  
47 Co-Co D1611 87E Landore 18/08/1964 On shed  
47 Co-Co D1613 87E Landore 25/08/1964 31/12/2007 On shed  
47 Co-Co D1641 81A Old Oak Common 17/12/1964 01/11/1996 On shed  
47 Co-Co D1661 87E Landore 13/02/1965 01/05/2007 On shed  
47 Co-Co D1679 81A Old Oak Common 01/05/1965 05/01/1988 On shed  
47 Co-Co D1687 D02 Birmingham Division 16/11/1963 17/07/1991 On shed  
47 Co-Co D1716 D02 Birmingham Division 18/02/1964 31/10/2007 On shed  
47 Co-Co D1911 86A Cardiff Canton 26/10/1965 On shed  
47 Co-Co D1913 86A Cardiff Canton 28/10/1965 31/05/2006 On shed  
47 Co-Co D1928 82A Bristol Bath Road 21/01/1966 On shed  
08 0-6-0 D3600 81A Old Oak Common 20/10/1958 On shed  
08 0-6-0 D3601 81A Old Oak Common 24/10/1958 27/11/1986 On shed  
08 0-6-0 D3605 81A Old Oak Common 14/11/1958 18/12/1985 On shed  
08 0-6-0 D3754 81A Old Oak Common 14/09/1959 30/09/2008 On shed  
08 0-6-0 D3761 81A Old Oak Common 13/11/1959 20/07/2001 On shed  
08 0-6-0 D3762 81A Old Oak Common 25/11/1959 23/07/1993 On shed  
08 0-6-0 D3954 81A Old Oak Common 29/04/1960 On shed  
08 0-6-0 D3961 81A Old Oak Common 21/05/1960 23/07/1993 On shed  
08 0-6-0 D3962 81A Old Oak Common 21/05/1960 13/11/1992 On shed  
08 0-6-0 D3963 81A Old Oak Common 21/05/1960 On shed  
08 0-6-0 D3965 81A Old Oak Common 28/05/1960 12/11/1990 On shed  
08 0-6-0 D3972 81A Old Oak Common 18/06/1960 On shed  
08 0-6-0 D3999 81A Old Oak Common 22/10/1960 07/04/1993 On shed  
08 0-6-0 D4000 81A Old Oak Common 29/10/1960 On shed  
31 A1A-A1A D5528 81A Old Oak Common 30/04/1959 31/05/2006 On shed  
31 A1A-A1A D5536 81A Old Oak Common 18/06/1959 20/02/1989 On shed  
31 A1A-A1A D5539 81A Old Oak Common 09/07/1959 01/09/1988 On shed  
22 B-B D6326 81A Old Oak Common 16/05/1960 03/10/1971 On shed  
22 B-B D6332 81A Old Oak Common 28/07/1960 22/05/1971 On shed  
22 B-B D6336 81A Old Oak Common 03/07/1961 01/01/1972 On shed  
22 B-B D6340 81A Old Oak Common 03/04/1962 22/05/1971 On shed  
22 B-B D6345 Withdrawn 19/05/1962 14/09/1968 On shed  
22 B-B D6346 Withdrawn 08/06/1962 03/05/1969 On shed  
35 B-B D7027 81A Old Oak Common 07/04/1962 29/11/1971 On shed  
35 B-B D7035 81A Old Oak Common 04/06/1962 01/01/1972 On shed  
35 B-B D7045 81A Old Oak Common 10/08/1962 11/11/1972 On shed  
35 B-B D7062 81A Old Oak Common 31/01/1963 03/10/1971 On shed  
35 B-B D7065 81A Old Oak Common 28/01/1963 01/01/1972 On shed  
35 B-B D7066 81A Old Oak Common 31/01/1963 29/11/1971 On shed