Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 940 Today
» 988 Yesterday
» 5071 Week
» 15241 Month
» 293037 Year
» 1177418 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Timelines

At Kings Cross terminus - Sunday 29/06/1969
Class Wheels Loco Code Allocation To Service Withdrawn Details Rep Num
47 Co-Co D1103 34G Finsbury Park 02/10/1966 25/08/1998 Around the terminus  
47 Co-Co D1552 40B Immingham 25/01/1964 09/12/1991 Around the terminus  
47 Co-Co D1871 34G Finsbury Park 18/06/1965 Around the terminus  
47 Co-Co D1969 52A Gateshead 22/10/1965 Around the terminus  
47 Co-Co D1971 52A Gateshead 30/10/1965 28/02/2007 Around the terminus  
47 Co-Co D1989 52A Gateshead 26/02/1966 30/09/2004 Around the terminus  
47 Co-Co D1998 34G Finsbury Park 14/06/1966 31/07/2003 Around the terminus  
31 A1A-A1A D5588 34G Finsbury Park 11/02/1960 08/01/1990 Around the terminus  
31 A1A-A1A D5593 34G Finsbury Park 25/02/1960 14/04/1989 Around the terminus  
31 A1A-A1A D5596 34G Finsbury Park 10/03/1960 04/02/2000 Around the terminus  
31 A1A-A1A D5608 34G Finsbury Park 21/04/1960 31/03/2000 Around the terminus  
31 A1A-A1A D5609 34G Finsbury Park 21/04/1960 Around the terminus  
31 A1A-A1A D5610 34G Finsbury Park 28/04/1960 03/03/2000 Around the terminus  
31 A1A-A1A D5611 34G Finsbury Park 28/04/1960 24/01/1999 Around the terminus  
31 A1A-A1A D5612 34G Finsbury Park 05/05/1960 26/05/1989 Around the terminus  
31 A1A-A1A D5629 31B March 30/06/1960 18/02/2000 Around the terminus  
55 Co-Co D9003 34G Finsbury Park 27/03/1961 31/12/1980 Around the terminus  
55 Co-Co D9017 52A Gateshead 09/11/1961 31/12/1981 Around the terminus - still in green livery