Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 990 Today
» 1016 Yesterday
» 6137 Week
» 16307 Month
» 294103 Year
» 1178484 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Timelines

Hornsey depot - Saturday 21/06/1969
Class Wheels Loco Code Allocation To Service Withdrawn Details Rep Num
40 1Co-Co1 D239 55C Healey Mills 19/10/1959 24/01/1976 On shed  
40 1Co-Co1 D285 52A Gateshead 18/07/1960 30/03/1984 On shed  
47 Co-Co D1840 D05 Stoke Division 29/06/1965 11/11/1994 On shed  
08 0-6-0 D3705 34G Finsbury Park 08/06/1959 31/08/2005 On shed  
31 A1A-A1A D5587 34G Finsbury Park 04/02/1960 01/02/1994 On shed  
31 A1A-A1A D5596 34G Finsbury Park 10/03/1960 04/02/2000 On shed  
31 A1A-A1A D5605 34G Finsbury Park 07/04/1960 21/02/1991 On shed  
31 A1A-A1A D5610 34G Finsbury Park 28/04/1960 03/03/2000 On shed  
31 A1A-A1A D5645 34G Finsbury Park 01/09/1960 01/03/1996 On shed  
31 A1A-A1A D5649 34G Finsbury Park 08/09/1960 16/12/1991 On shed  
15 Bo-Bo D8231 34G Finsbury Park 18/07/1960 27/03/1971 On shed