Timelines
Class | Wheels | Loco | Code | Allocation | To Service | Withdrawn | Details | Rep Num |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 1Co-Co1 | D238 | 52A | Gateshead | 12/10/1959 | 28/12/1980 | On shed | |
40 | 1Co-Co1 | D256 | 50A | York (North) | 29/01/1960 | 06/09/1984 | On shed | |
47 | Co-Co | D1105 | 34G | Finsbury Park | 09/11/1966 | 12/12/1998 | On shed | |
47 | Co-Co | D1522 | 41A | Tinsley | 14/06/1963 | 24/06/1991 | On shed | |
31 | A1A-A1A | D5609 | 34G | Finsbury Park | 21/04/1960 | On shed |