Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 863 Today
» 879 Yesterday
» 1742 Week
» 10484 Month
» 354663 Year
» 865765 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Timelines

Inverurie Works visit - Tuesday 15/07/1969
Class Wheels Loco Code Allocation To Service Withdrawn Details Rep Num
29 Bo-Bo D6108 Withdrawn 14/04/1959 01/05/1969 On works - Dumped outside the Works  
29 Bo-Bo D6114 65A Eastfield 27/05/1959 05/10/1971 On works  
20 Bo-Bo D8089 66A Polmadie 03/10/1961 27/04/1987 On works  
20 Bo-Bo D8101 66A Polmadie 22/11/1961 On works  
20 Bo-Bo D8112 65A Eastfield 26/01/1962 21/01/1991 On works