Timelines
Class | Wheels | Loco | Code | Allocation | To Service | Withdrawn | Details | Rep Num |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
08 | 0-6-0 | D3552 | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | 10/10/1958 | 01/12/1984 | On shed | |
08 | 0-6-0 | D3920 | 30A | Stratford | 30/12/1960 | On shed - Shunter at work | ||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3922 | 64H | Leith Central | 12/01/1961 | On shed - Shunter at work | ||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3925 | 67A | Corkerhill | 01/02/1961 | On shed - Shunter at work | ||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3933 | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | 23/03/1961 | On shed | ||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3934 | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | 28/03/1961 | On shed |