Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 95 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 7549 Week
» 10131 Month
» 274764 Year
» 1496329 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Timelines

Toton depot visit during coal strike - Sunday 06/02/1972
Class Wheels Loco Code Allocation To Service Withdrawn Details Rep Num
44 1Co-Co1 D3 D16 Nottingham Division 18/09/1959 17/07/1976 On shed  
44 1Co-Co1 D10 D16 Nottingham Division 05/02/1960 12/05/1977 On shed  
45 1Co-Co1 D11 D16 Nottingham Division 01/10/1960 27/04/1987 On shed  
45 1Co-Co1 D37 D16 Nottingham Division 10/07/1961 13/09/1986 On shed  
45 1Co-Co1 D39 D16 Nottingham Division 20/07/1961 04/02/1988 On shed  
45 1Co-Co1 D44 D16 Nottingham Division 02/09/1961 31/05/1981 On shed  
45 1Co-Co1 D45 D16 Nottingham Division 08/09/1961 11/05/1986 On shed  
45 1Co-Co1 D48 D16 Nottingham Division 02/10/1961 05/06/1985 On shed  
45 1Co-Co1 D50 D16 Nottingham Division 22/05/1962 01/07/1987 On shed  
45 1Co-Co1 D51 D16 Nottingham Division 05/06/1962 09/09/1986 On shed  
45 1Co-Co1 D59 D16 Nottingham Division 06/02/1962 13/04/1988 On shed  
45 1Co-Co1 D83 D16 Nottingham Division 31/12/1960 18/06/1987 On shed  
45 1Co-Co1 D88 D16 Nottingham Division 02/03/1961 07/05/1987 On shed  
45 1Co-Co1 D90 D16 Nottingham Division 11/03/1961 14/12/1980 On shed  
45 1Co-Co1 D95 D16 Nottingham Division 15/04/1961 21/01/1985 On shed  
45 1Co-Co1 D96 D16 Nottingham Division 18/04/1961 13/11/1986 On shed  
45 1Co-Co1 D99 D16 Nottingham Division 03/05/1961 09/03/1987 On shed  
45 1Co-Co1 D103 D16 Nottingham Division 30/05/1961 02/07/1987 On shed  
45 1Co-Co1 D123 D16 Nottingham Division 28/10/1961 07/05/1987 On shed  
47 Co-Co D1624 D05 Stoke Division 04/10/1964 01/11/1996 On shed  
47 Co-Co D1696 D02 Birmingham Division 12/12/1963 17/03/1994 On shed  
47 Co-Co D1715 87A Landore 08/02/1964 On shed  
47 Co-Co D1733 D02 Birmingham Division 12/06/1964 On shed  
47 Co-Co D1763 D02 Birmingham Division 12/09/1964 01/06/1999 On shed  
47 Co-Co D1805 D16 Nottingham Division 21/01/1965 17/07/1992 On shed  
47 Co-Co D1808 D16 Nottingham Division 30/01/1965 19/02/1993 On shed  
47 Co-Co D1810 D16 Nottingham Division 09/02/1965 On shed  
47 Co-Co D1826 D16 Nottingham Division 11/03/1965 30/06/2006 On shed  
47 Co-Co D1829 D16 Nottingham Division 05/03/1965 30/11/2006 On shed  
47 Co-Co D1830 D16 Nottingham Division 18/03/1965 On shed  
47 Co-Co D1832 D16 Nottingham Division 07/04/1965 On shed  
47 Co-Co D1844 D05 Stoke Division 22/05/1965 On shed  
47 Co-Co D1855 D16 Nottingham Division 24/08/1965 30/09/2004 On shed  
47 Co-Co D1860 D01 London Division 28/08/1965 On shed  
47 Co-Co D1953 D05 Stoke Division 16/11/1966 27/11/1992 On shed  
08 0-6-0 D3021 16A Toton 16/05/1953 18/05/1980 On shed  
08 0-6-0 D3026 16A Toton 03/10/1953 12/11/1972 On shed  
08 0-6-0 D3037 16A Toton 28/11/1953 17/12/1972 On shed  
08 0-6-0 D3039 16A Toton 28/11/1953 02/11/1980 On shed  
08 0-6-0 D3044 16A Toton 17/03/1954 25/08/1974 On shed  
08 0-6-0 D3058 16A Toton 11/09/1954 04/07/1982 On shed  
08 0-6-0 D3340 16A Toton 30/03/1957 19/12/1982 On shed  
08 0-6-0 D3362 91M To London Midland Region 17/05/1957 01/05/1984 On shed  
08 0-6-0 D3402 16A Toton 29/11/1957 16/09/1984 On shed  
08 0-6-0 D3404 91M To London Midland Region 06/12/1957 03/09/1987 On shed  
08 0-6-0 D3505 91M To London Midland Region 18/04/1958 19/03/1993 On shed  
08 0-6-0 D3514 91M To London Midland Region 16/05/1958 13/11/1992 On shed  
08 0-6-0 D3777 16A Toton 25/07/1959 26/06/1998 On shed  
08 0-6-0 D3852 16A Toton 19/09/1959 On shed  
25 Bo-Bo D5234 D16 Nottingham Division 11/12/1963 18/12/1983 On shed  
25 Bo-Bo D5242 D16 Nottingham Division 30/12/1963 11/05/1980 On shed  
25 Bo-Bo D5246 D16 Nottingham Division 24/01/1964 31/12/1977 On shed  
25 Bo-Bo D7517 D16 Nottingham Division 09/12/1964 29/05/1983 On shed  
25 Bo-Bo D7521 D16 Nottingham Division 07/01/1965 15/10/1978 On shed  
25 Bo-Bo D7546 D10 Preston Division 07/05/1965 17/03/1986 On shed  
25 Bo-Bo D7559 D16 Nottingham Division 28/08/1965 17/12/1985 On shed  
25 Bo-Bo D7562 D16 Nottingham Division 03/12/1965 21/05/1985 On shed  
25 Bo-Bo D7563 D16 Nottingham Division 12/11/1965 19/03/1987 On shed  
25 Bo-Bo D7566 D16 Nottingham Division 19/01/1966 28/12/1980 On shed  
25 Bo-Bo D7611 D02 Birmingham Division 16/04/1966 04/01/1981 On shed  
25 Bo-Bo D7647 D16 Nottingham Division 30/03/1966 01/09/1986 On shed  
25 Bo-Bo D7649 D16 Nottingham Division 15/04/1966 04/10/1981 On shed  
20 Bo-Bo D8002 D16 Nottingham Division 25/07/1957 19/02/1988 On shed  
20 Bo-Bo D8006 D16 Nottingham Division 16/09/1957 02/10/1990 On shed  
20 Bo-Bo D8012 D16 Nottingham Division 11/11/1957 27/03/1976 On shed  
20 Bo-Bo D8014 D16 Nottingham Division 16/12/1957 27/03/1976 On shed  
20 Bo-Bo D8015 D16 Nottingham Division 20/12/1957 13/07/1987 On shed  
20 Bo-Bo D8035 D16 Nottingham Division 18/09/1959 01/05/1991 On shed  
20 Bo-Bo D8036 D16 Nottingham Division 03/10/1959 11/06/1984 On shed  
20 Bo-Bo D8037 D16 Nottingham Division 09/10/1959 21/01/1987 On shed  
20 Bo-Bo D8039 D16 Nottingham Division 24/10/1959 23/09/1986 On shed  
20 Bo-Bo D8040 D16 Nottingham Division 30/10/1959 13/09/1991 On shed  
20 Bo-Bo D8042 D16 Nottingham Division 11/11/1959 On shed  
20 Bo-Bo D8043 D16 Nottingham Division 14/11/1959 27/06/1991 On shed  
20 Bo-Bo D8044 D16 Nottingham Division 24/11/1959 11/09/1989 On shed  
20 Bo-Bo D8047 D16 Nottingham Division 18/12/1959 On shed  
20 Bo-Bo D8062 D16 Nottingham Division 29/05/1961 18/09/1976 On shed  
20 Bo-Bo D8063 D16 Nottingham Division 05/06/1961 01/05/1991 On shed  
20 Bo-Bo D8064 D16 Nottingham Division 12/06/1961 14/09/1990 On shed  
20 Bo-Bo D8066 D16 Nottingham Division 19/06/1961 On shed  
20 Bo-Bo D8069 D16 Nottingham Division 30/06/1961 20/05/1991 On shed  
20 Bo-Bo D8071 D16 Nottingham Division 10/07/1961 23/07/1993 On shed  
20 Bo-Bo D8073 D16 Nottingham Division 19/07/1961 23/12/1993 On shed  
20 Bo-Bo D8074 D16 Nottingham Division 19/07/1961 31/01/1976 On shed  
20 Bo-Bo D8076 D16 Nottingham Division 26/07/1961 04/05/1988 On shed  
20 Bo-Bo D8081 D16 Nottingham Division 31/08/1961 On shed  
20 Bo-Bo D8083 D16 Nottingham Division 12/09/1961 On shed  
20 Bo-Bo D8087 D16 Nottingham Division 26/09/1961 04/1995 On shed  
20 Bo-Bo D8088 D16 Nottingham Division 26/09/1961 On shed  
20 Bo-Bo D8136 D16 Nottingham Division 31/03/1966 02/10/1990 On shed  
20 Bo-Bo D8139 D16 Nottingham Division 26/04/1966 01/05/1991 On shed  
20 Bo-Bo D8141 D16 Nottingham Division 21/05/1966 15/11/1991 On shed  
20 Bo-Bo D8145 D16 Nottingham Division 10/06/1966 19/05/1991 On shed  
20 Bo-Bo D8148 D16 Nottingham Division 27/06/1966 15/11/1991 On shed  
20 Bo-Bo D8149 D16 Nottingham Division 05/07/1966 09/11/1987 On shed  
20 Bo-Bo D8153 D16 Nottingham Division 15/08/1966 09/11/1987 On shed  
20 Bo-Bo D8157 D16 Nottingham Division 02/09/1966 10/10/1990 On shed  
20 Bo-Bo D8158 D16 Nottingham Division 02/09/1966 18/05/1989 On shed  
20 Bo-Bo D8159 D16 Nottingham Division 09/09/1966 13/09/1991 On shed  
20 Bo-Bo D8162 D16 Nottingham Division 19/09/1966 09/11/1987 On shed  
20 Bo-Bo D8165 D16 Nottingham Division 05/10/1966 On shed  
20 Bo-Bo D8166 D16 Nottingham Division 10/10/1966 On shed  
20 Bo-Bo D8167 D16 Nottingham Division 17/10/1966 09/11/1987 On shed  
20 Bo-Bo D8170 D16 Nottingham Division 25/10/1966 15/11/1991 On shed  
20 Bo-Bo D8172 D16 Nottingham Division 28/10/1966 11/10/1990 On shed  
20 Bo-Bo D8173 D16 Nottingham Division 08/12/1966 04/02/1991 On shed  
20 Bo-Bo D8176 D16 Nottingham Division 16/11/1966 21/10/1991 On shed  
20 Bo-Bo D8177 D16 Nottingham Division 18/11/1966 23/07/1993 On shed  
20 Bo-Bo D8178 D16 Nottingham Division 16/12/1966 18/12/1989 On shed  
20 Bo-Bo D8180 D16 Nottingham Division 16/12/1966 28/02/1989 On shed  
20 Bo-Bo D8183 D16 Nottingham Division 16/12/1966 26/01/1990 On shed  
20 Bo-Bo D8184 D16 Nottingham Division 19/12/1966 26/10/1986 On shed  
20 Bo-Bo D8187 D16 Nottingham Division 21/01/1967 On shed  
20 Bo-Bo D8188 D16 Nottingham Division 21/01/1967 01/01/1990 On shed  
20 Bo-Bo D8190 D16 Nottingham Division 28/01/1967 On shed  
20 Bo-Bo D8196 D16 Nottingham Division 25/02/1967 28/04/1993 On shed  
20 Bo-Bo D8197 D16 Nottingham Division 25/02/1967 On shed  
20 Bo-Bo D8199 D16 Nottingham Division 22/04/1967 18/06/1990 On shed