Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 231 Today
» 1015 Yesterday
» 4399 Week
» 19513 Month
» 322703 Year
» 1544268 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Timelines

Derby Works visit - Sunday 06/02/1972
Class Wheels Loco Code Allocation To Service Withdrawn Details Rep Num
44 1Co-Co1 D9 D16 Nottingham Division 24/12/1959 01/03/1979 Around the works - Erecting shop.  
45 1Co-Co1 D19 55A Holbeck (MR) 31/12/1960 10/05/1981 Around the works - Sidings.  
45 1Co-Co1 D25 55A Holbeck (MR) 15/04/1961 05/10/1980 Around the works - Erecting shop.  
45 1Co-Co1 D53 55A Holbeck (MR) 25/06/1962 08/06/1988 Around the works - Erecting shop.  
45 1Co-Co1 D54 D16 Nottingham Division 08/08/1962 12/09/1984 Around the works - Erecting shop.  
45 1Co-Co1 D66 D16 Nottingham Division 17/04/1962 07/04/1987 Around the works - Erecting shop.  
45 1Co-Co1 D123 D16 Nottingham Division 28/10/1961 07/05/1987 Around the works - Erecting shop.  
45 1Co-Co1 D127 D16 Nottingham Division 15/11/1961 26/04/1985 Around the works - Sidings.  
45 1Co-Co1 D135 D16 Nottingham Division 30/12/1961 14/09/1987 Around the works - Erecting shop.  
46 1Co-Co1 D142 82A Bristol Bath Road 05/12/1961 04/12/1977 Around the works - Erecting shop.  
46 1Co-Co1 D149 82A Bristol Bath Road 30/12/1961 27/07/1980 Around the works - Erecting shop.  
46 1Co-Co1 D151 82A Bristol Bath Road 17/01/1962 06/05/1984 Around the works - Erecting shop.  
46 1Co-Co1 D159 82A Bristol Bath Road 23/03/1962 28/03/1982 Around the works - Erecting shop.  
46 1Co-Co1 D162 82A Bristol Bath Road 09/04/1962 25/11/1984 Around the works - Erecting shop.  
46 1Co-Co1 D178 52A Gateshead 14/09/1962 01/11/1981 Around the works - Erecting shop.  
46 1Co-Co1 D182 52A Gateshead 27/09/1962 01/11/1984 Around the works - Sidings.  
46 1Co-Co1 D186 82A Bristol Bath Road 09/11/1962 12/12/1982 Around the works - Erecting shop.  
46 1Co-Co1 D187 55A Holbeck (MR) 23/11/1962 26/10/1982 Around the works - Erecting shop.  
03 0-6-0 D2383 Withdrawn 16/11/1961 18/04/1971 Around the works - Sidings.  
08 0-6-0 D3004 6J Holyhead 14/11/1952 30/06/1978 Around the works - Erecting shop.  
08 0-6-0 D3068 5A Crewe Diesel 21/11/1953 02/11/1980 Around the works - Erecting shop.  
08 0-6-0 D3174 6J Holyhead 23/09/1955 08/07/1984 Around the works - Erecting shop.  
08 0-6-0 D3175 6J Holyhead 29/09/1955 05/04/1981 Around the works - Erecting shop.  
08 0-6-0 D3305 14A Cricklewood East 08/05/1956 10/07/1983 Around the works - Erecting shop.  
08 0-6-0 D3518 14A Cricklewood East 30/05/1958 18/10/1981 Around the works - Sidings.  
08 0-6-0 D3768 12A Carlisle Kingmoor 16/05/1959 31/05/2004 Around the works - Erecting shop.  
08 0-6-0 D3792 16C Derby 31/10/1959 31/01/2004 Around the works - Paint shop.  
08 0-6-0 D3925 2F Bescot 01/02/1961 Around the works - Sidings.  
08 0-6-0 D3933 15A Leicester Midland 23/03/1961 Around the works - Sidings.  
08 0-6-0 D3978 2F Bescot 09/07/1960 Around the works - Sidings.  
24 Bo-Bo D5058 D05 Stoke Division 01/01/1960 04/10/1975 Around the works - Erecting shop.  
24 Bo-Bo D5074 D05 Stoke Division 14/03/1960 04/10/1975 Around the works - Erecting shop.  
24 Bo-Bo D5083 D05 Stoke Division 08/04/1960 27/03/1976 Around the works - Erecting shop.  
25 Bo-Bo D5250 D16 Nottingham Division 14/02/1964 01/02/1981 Around the works - Erecting shop.  
27 Bo-Bo D5391 64B Haymarket 04/06/1962 01/01/1979 Around the works - Sidings.  
25 Bo-Bo D7534 D02 Birmingham Division 03/03/1965 28/08/1983 Around the works - Erecting shop.  
25 Bo-Bo D7569 82A Bristol Bath Road 08/10/1963 03/04/1983 Around the works - Erecting shop.  
25 Bo-Bo D7588 82A Bristol Bath Road 10/03/1964 13/10/1980 Around the works - Erecting shop.  
25 Bo-Bo D7589 D09 Manchester Division 13/04/1964 05/11/1984 Around the works - Erecting shop.  
25 Bo-Bo D7605 D16 Nottingham Division 12/03/1966 31/03/1972 Around the works - Sidings. Severe collision damage.  
25 Bo-Bo D7646 D09 Manchester Division 25/03/1966 01/10/1986 Around the works - Fuelling point.  
20 Bo-Bo D8155 D16 Nottingham Division 23/08/1966 09/11/1987 Around the works - Wagon repair shop.