Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 165 Today
» 866 Yesterday
» 1031 Week
» 25693 Month
» 284552 Year
» 795654 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Timelines

Duport Steel Works Ltd., Albion works at Briton Ferry visit. - Saturday 13/11/1971
Class Wheels Loco Code Allocation To Service Withdrawn Details Rep Num
04 0-6-0 D2204 Withdrawn 14/03/1953 31/12/1969 Around the works - On shed. In yellow livery. Numbered D5 (ex-D11)  
04 0-6-0 D2247 Withdrawn 14/12/1956 31/12/1969 Around the works - In yard. In yellow livery. Numbered D16 (ex-D12)  
04 0-6-0 D2270 Withdrawn 04/03/1958 13/02/1968 Around the works - On shed. In yellow livery. Numbered D9.  
04 0-6-0 D2308 Withdrawn 06/12/1960 13/02/1968 Around the works - Cannibalised in the yard. Still in BR livery.  
04 0-6-0 D2340 Withdrawn 09/03/1962 13/10/1968 Around the works - Working. In yellow livery. Numbered D1 (ex-D10)