Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 863 Today
» 879 Yesterday
» 1742 Week
» 10484 Month
» 354663 Year
» 865765 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Timelines

Stabled at Birkenhead depot - Tuesday 28/12/1971
Class Wheels Loco Code Allocation To Service Withdrawn Details Rep Num
47 Co-Co D1830 D16 Nottingham Division 18/03/1965 Stabled on Birkenhead depot  
47 Co-Co D1838 D05 Stoke Division 10/05/1965 31/08/2005 Stabled on Birkenhead depot  
47 Co-Co D1849 D05 Stoke Division 12/06/1965 20/07/1987 Stabled on Birkenhead depot  
47 Co-Co D1853 D05 Stoke Division 26/07/1965 27/03/1989 Stabled on Birkenhead depot  
47 Co-Co D1944 D05 Stoke Division 29/06/1966 Stabled on Birkenhead depot  
08 0-6-0 D3103 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street 16/02/1955 14/08/1983 Stabled on Birkenhead depot  
08 0-6-0 D3104 5A Crewe Diesel 23/02/1955 04/12/1983 Stabled on Birkenhead depot  
08 0-6-0 D3176 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street 30/09/1955 21/10/1979 Stabled on Birkenhead depot  
08 0-6-0 D3343 8J Allerton 12/04/1957 19/12/1982 Stabled on Birkenhead depot  
08 0-6-0 D3425 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street 20/02/1958 09/05/1983 Stabled on Birkenhead depot  
08 0-6-0 D3605 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street 14/11/1958 18/12/1985 Stabled on Birkenhead depot  
08 0-6-0 D3833 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street 01/01/1960 16/01/1995 Stabled on Birkenhead depot  
24 Bo-Bo D5024 D05 Stoke Division 02/10/1959 10/08/1975 Stabled on Birkenhead depot  
24 Bo-Bo D5029 D05 Stoke Division 28/11/1959 10/08/1975 Stabled on Birkenhead depot  
24 Bo-Bo D5037 D05 Stoke Division 07/09/1959 17/07/1976 Stabled on Birkenhead depot  
24 Bo-Bo D5049 D05 Stoke Division 04/04/1960 31/01/1976 Stabled on Birkenhead depot  
24 Bo-Bo D5054 D05 Stoke Division 18/12/1959 01/07/1976 Stabled on Birkenhead depot  
24 Bo-Bo D5079 D05 Stoke Division 25/02/1960 17/07/1976 Stabled on Birkenhead depot  
24 Bo-Bo D5089 D05 Stoke Division 20/06/1960 04/01/1976 Stabled on Birkenhead depot  
24 Bo-Bo D5140 D05 Stoke Division 05/11/1960 31/01/1976 Stabled on Birkenhead depot  
25 Bo-Bo D5255 D08 Liverpool Division 06/03/1964 04/04/1982 Stabled on Birkenhead depot  
25 Bo-Bo D7653 D08 Liverpool Division 24/06/1966 19/02/1986 Stabled on Birkenhead depot