Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 165 Today
» 866 Yesterday
» 1031 Week
» 25693 Month
» 284552 Year
» 795654 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Timelines

Old Oak Common shed - Sunday 22/06/1975
Class Wheels Loco Code Allocation To Service Withdrawn Details Rep Num
52 C-C D1010 84A Laira 15/10/1962 28/02/1977 On shed - Engines idling  
52 C-C D1036 84A Laira 29/08/1962 01/11/1976 On shed - Stabled  
52 C-C D1063 84A Laira 17/05/1963 04/04/1976 On shed - Stabled  
47 Co-Co 47078 87E Landore 20/02/1965 01/05/1997 On shed - With nameplate  
35 B-B D7017 Withdrawn 08/01/1962 13/03/1975 On shed - Covered in notices advising new owners are the D&EG and not to rob the loco