Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 131 Today
» 988 Yesterday
» 4262 Week
» 14432 Month
» 292228 Year
» 1176609 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Timelines

Swindon Works visit - Sunday 12/11/1961
Class Wheels Loco Code Allocation To Service Withdrawn Details Rep Num
    D856     16/11/1961 22/05/1971 Around the Works - "A" shop.  
    D1000     29/12/1961 11/02/1974 Around the Works - "A" shop.  
    D1001     12/02/1962 04/10/1976 Around the Works - "A" shop.  
    D1002     19/03/1962 29/01/1974 Around the Works - "A" shop.  
    D1003     14/04/1962 05/01/1975 Around the Works - "A" shop.  
    D1004     12/05/1962 01/08/1973 Around the Works - "A" shop.  
    D1005     18/06/1962 16/11/1976 Around the Works - "A" shop.  
    D1006     06/07/1962 06/04/1975 Around the Works - "A" shop.  
    D1007     01/08/1962 29/01/1974 Around the Works - "A" shop.  
    D1008     04/09/1962 21/10/1974 Around the Works - "A" shop.  
    D1009     24/09/1962 10/11/1976 Around the Works - "A" shop.  
    D1010     15/10/1962 28/02/1977 Around the Works - "A" shop.  
    D1011     27/10/1962 06/10/1975 Around the Works - "A" shop.  
    D1012     17/11/1962 02/11/1975 Around the Works - "A" shop.  
    D2175     06/12/1961 11/09/1983 Around the Works - "A" shop.  
    D2176     15/12/1961 11/05/1968 Around the Works - "A" shop.  
    D2177     27/12/1961 21/09/1968 Around the Works - "A" shop.  
    D2383     16/11/1961 18/04/1971 Around the Works - "A" shop.  
    D2384     27/11/1961 11/05/1968 Around the Works - "A" shop.  
    D7010     20/11/1961 01/01/1972 Around the Works - Outside weigh house.  
D20/2 A1A-A1A D603 83D Laira 21/11/1958 31/12/1967 Around the Works - "A" shop.  
42 B-B D825 83A Newton Abbot 24/08/1960 23/08/1972 Around the Works - "A" shop.  
42 B-B D831 83A Newton Abbot 11/01/1961 03/10/1971 Around the Works - Outside weigh house.  
42 B-B D832 83A Newton Abbot 08/02/1961 16/12/1972 Around the Works - "A" shop.  
43 B-B D853 83D Laira 30/08/1961 03/10/1971 Around the Works - Outside weigh house.  
08 0-6-0 D3032 81A Old Oak Common 31/10/1953 26/12/1982 Around the Works - "A" shop.  
08 0-6-0 13115 84F Stourbridge Junction 25/04/1955 27/11/1977 Around the Works - "A" shop.  
08 0-6-0 13353 87F Llanelly 11/06/1957 24/02/1986 Around the Works - "A" shop.  
08 0-6-0 13355 87F Llanelly 19/06/1957 12/09/1988 Around the Works - "A" shop.  
08 0-6-0 13362 88B Cardiff East Dock 17/05/1957 01/05/1984 Around the Works - "A" shop.  
22 B-B D6303 83D Laira 22/05/1959 26/05/1968 Around the Works - Outside weigh house.  
22 B-B D6320 83D Laira 23/03/1960 22/05/1971 Around the Works - "A" shop.  
D3/10 0-6-0 15100 82C Swindon 30/04/1936 21/04/1965 Around the Works - "A" shop.  
1000 4-6-0 1006 83D Laira 15/11/1945 09/1963 Around the Works - Works sidings.  
1000 4-6-0 1010 82C Swindon 22/01/1946 07/1964 Around the Works - "A" shop.  
1000 4-6-0 1015 81E Didcot 01/03/1946 13/11/1962 Around the Works - "A" shop.  
1000 4-6-0 1023 82C Swindon 01/01/1947 02/03/1963 Around the Works - Works sidings.  
1000 4-6-0 1024 82B St Philips Marsh 09/01/1947 04/1964 Around the Works - "A" shop.  
1600 0-6-0PT 1606 Withdrawn 03/11/1949 09/1961 Around the Works - Triangle.  
1600 0-6-0PT 1615 Withdrawn 12/12/1949 06/1961 Around the Works - Triangle.  
2251 0-6-0 2215 Withdrawn 05/1940 10/1961 Around the Works - Works sidings.  
2800 2-8-0 2832 Withdrawn 04/1911 11/1959 Around the Works - "A" shop.  
2800 2-8-0 3838     20/01/1942 11/1964 Around the Works - Works sidings.  
2800 2-8-0 3839 84E Tyseley 26/01/1942 12/1963 Around the Works - Works sidings.  
4000 4-6-0 4003 Withdrawn 02/1907 07/1951 Around the Works - "A" shop.  
4073 4-6-0 4075 Withdrawn 01/1924 03/11/1961 Around the Works - Works sidings.  
4073 4-6-0 7013 81A Old Oak Common 12/04/1924 09/1964 Around the Works - "A" shop.  
4073 4-6-0 4083 88A Cardiff Canton 09/05/1925 19/12/1961 Around the Works - Works sidings.  
4073 4-6-0 4092 81F Oxford 06/08/1925 19/12/1961 Around the Works - "A" shop.  
4073 4-6-0 4095 83D Laira 16/06/1926 12/12/1962 Around the Works - "A" shop.  
4500 2-6-2T 4563 Withdrawn 10/1924 10/1961 Around the Works - Triangle.  
4500 2-6-2T 4565 Withdrawn 10/1924 10/1961 Around the Works - Triangle.  
4700 2-8-0 4706 82B St Philips Marsh 03/1923 02/1964 Around the Works - "A" shop.  
1400 0-4-2T 1433 Withdrawn 07/1934 01/1961 Around the Works - Dump.  
4900 4-6-0 4903 81D Reading (W.R.) 12/1928 10/1964 Around the Works - "A" shop.  
4900 4-6-0 4918 84A Stafford Road 03/1929 06/1963 Around the Works - "A" shop.  
4900 4-6-0 4932 83B Taunton 06/1929 11/1964 Around the Works - "A" shop.  
4900 4-6-0 4945 Withdrawn 08/1929 11/1961 Around the Works - Works sidings.  
4900 4-6-0 4976 81E Didcot 01/1930 05/1964 Around the Works - "A" shop.  
4900 4-6-0 4989 85B Gloucester Horton Road 02/1931 11/1964 Around the Works - "A" shop.  
4073 4-6-0 5039 87G Carmarthen 25/06/1935 15/06/1964 Around the Works - Triangle.  
4073 4-6-0 5071 85B Gloucester Horton Road 07/07/1938 22/10/1963 Around the Works - Works sidings.  
4073 4-6-0 5073 88A Cardiff Canton 13/07/1938 26/02/1964 Around the Works - "A" shop.  
4073 4-6-0 5078 87A Neath (Court Sart) 15/05/1939 20/11/1962 Around the Works - "A" shop.  
4073 4-6-0 5087 PDN Old Oak Common 01/1923 01/08/1963 Around the Works - "A" shop.  
4073 4-6-0 5096 88A Cardiff Canton 08/07/1939 15/06/1964 Around the Works - "A" shop.  
4073 4-6-0 5098 LA Laira 05/1946 15/06/1964 Around the Works - "A" shop.  
4300 2-6-0 5332 Withdrawn 11/1917 10/1961 Around the Works - Dump.  
4575 2-6-2T 5538 Withdrawn 07/1928 10/1961 Around the Works - Triangle.  
5700 0-6-0PT 5756 Withdrawn 05/1929 09/1961 Around the Works - Works shunter.  
5700 0-6-0PT 5780 Withdrawn 12/1929 10/1961 Around the Works - Works shunter.  
5800 0-4-2T 5815 Withdrawn 08/1933 04/1961 Around the Works - Outside stock shed.  
4900 4-6-0 5938 87G Carmarthen 07/1933 05/1963 Around the Works - Weigh house.  
4900 4-6-0 5950 Withdrawn 04/1935 11/1961 Around the Works - Works sidings.  
4900 4-6-0 5955 81F Oxford 12/1935 04/1965 Around the Works - Weigh house.  
4900 4-6-0 5974     04/1937 12/1964 Around the Works - "A" shop.  
4900 4-6-0 5976 81A Old Oak Common 09/1938 07/1964 Around the Works - "A" shop.  
4900 4-6-0 5998 84G Shrewsbury 06/1940 03/1964 Around the Works - Works sidings.  
6000 4-6-0 6014 84A Stafford Road 05/1928 09/1962 Around the Works - "A" shop.  
6000 4-6-0 6019 88A Cardiff Canton 07/1928 09/1962 Around the Works - Works sidings.  
6000 4-6-0 6026 81A Old Oak Common 07/1930 09/1962 Around the Works - "A" shop.  
6000 4-6-0 6028     07/1930 20/11/1962 Around the Works - "A" shop.  
4300 2-6-0 6309 82C Swindon 01/1921 09/1964 Around the Works - Works sidings.  
4300 2-6-0 6329 Withdrawn 04/1921 10/1961 Around the Works - Works sidings.  
4300 2-6-0 6338 86E Severn Tunnel Junction 06/1921 06/1964 Around the Works - Works sidings.  
4300 2-6-0 6345 86C Cardiff Canton 04/1923 09/1964 Around the Works - "A" shop.  
4300 2-6-0 6357 84J Croes Newydd 11/1923 07/1964 Around the Works - Outside stock shed.  
4300 2-6-0 6392 Withdrawn 11/1921 10/1961 Around the Works - "C" shop - intact  
6400 0-6-0PT 6415 Withdrawn 11/1934 11/1961 Around the Works - Triangle.  
5700 0-6-0PT 6700 Withdrawn 02/1930 06/1961 Around the Works - Dump.  
6800 4-6-0 6820 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 01/1937 07/1965 Around the Works - Works sidings.  
6800 4-6-0 6826 PZ Penzance 02/1937 05/1965 Around the Works - "A" shop.  
6800 4-6-0 6845 84B Oxley 10/1937 09/1964 Around the Works - "A" shop.  
4900 4-6-0 6900 82B St Philips Marsh 06/1943 10/1964 Around the Works - Outside stock shed.  
4900 4-6-0 6909 86C Cardiff Canton 11/1940 06/1964 Around the Works - "A" shop.  
4900 4-6-0 6915 89A Shrewsbury 02/1941 02/1965 Around the Works - Works sidings.  
4900 4-6-0 6933 84B Oxley 12/1941 11/1964 Around the Works - "A" shop.  
4900 4-6-0 6955     14/03/1943 02/1965 Around the Works - "A" shop.  
6959 4-6-0 6964 84G Shrewsbury 31/05/1944 09/1965 Around the Works - Works sidings.  
6959 4-6-0 6981 82B St Philips Marsh 30/01/1948 03/1964 Around the Works - "A" shop.  
6959 4-6-0 6993 85B Gloucester Horton Road 06/12/1948 12/1965 Around the Works - Triangle.  
4073 4-6-0 7002 85A Worcester 06/06/1946 10/03/1964 Around the Works - Works sidings.  
4073 4-6-0 7015 84G Shrewsbury 09/1948 05/04/1963 Around the Works - "A" shop.  
4073 4-6-0 7021 87F Llanelly 06/1949 09/09/1963 Around the Works - "A" shop.  
4073 4-6-0 7022 83D Laira 07/1949 25/06/1965 Around the Works - "A" shop.  
4073 4-6-0 7034 82B St Philips Marsh 08/1950 06/1965 Around the Works - "A" shop.  
7400 0-6-0PT 7417 Withdrawn 01/1937 09/1961 Around the Works - Triangle.  
5700 0-6-0PT 7756 Withdrawn 12/1930 06/1961 Around the Works - Works shunter.  
5700 0-6-0PT 7775 Withdrawn 11/1930 09/11/1960 Around the Works - "C" shop - intact  
5700 0-6-0PT 7787 Withdrawn 12/1930 06/1961 Around the Works - Triangle.  
7800 4-6-0 7805 86C Cardiff Canton 03/1938 12/1964 Around the Works - "A" shop.  
6959 4-6-0 7901 82B St Philips Marsh 22/03/1949 28/02/1964 Around the Works - Works sidings.  
6959 4-6-0 7915 84B Oxley 30/03/1950 10/1965 Around the Works - "A" shop.  
6959 4-6-0 7917 82D Westbury 21/04/1950 08/1965 Around the Works - Works sidings.  
5700 0-6-0PT 8706 Withdrawn 03/1931 07/1960 Around the Works - Dump.  
5700 0-6-0PT 8721 Withdrawn 03/1931 07/1961 Around the Works - Works shunter.  
5700 0-6-0PT 8762 Withdrawn 10/1933 08/1961 Around the Works - Works shunter.  
5700 0-6-0PT 8772 Withdrawn 01/1934 08/1961 Around the Works - Triangle.  
5700 0-6-0PT 8787 Withdrawn 01/1934 08/1961 Around the Works - Works sidings.  
4300 2-6-0 7322 Withdrawn 02/1932 11/1961 Around the Works - "A" shop - being cut up.  
9400 0-6-0PT 9400 Withdrawn 02/1947 12/1959 Around the Works - "A" shop.  
5700 0-6-0PT 9705 Withdrawn 10/1933 10/1961 Around the Works - Works sidings.  
5700 0-6-0PT 9739 Withdrawn 01/1935 07/1961 Around the Works - Triangle.  
5700 0-6-0PT 9745 Withdrawn 02/1935 06/1961 Around the Works - Dump.  
5700 0-6-0PT 9749 Withdrawn 02/1935 09/11/1960 Around the Works - Dump.  
BR5 4-6-0 73027 82C Swindon 12/1951 07/02/1964 Around the Works - "A" shop.  
BR4/1 4-6-0 75005 85A Worcester 09/1951 18/11/1965 Around the Works - Works sidings.  
BR2/1 2-6-0 78008 85A Worcester 03/1953 22/10/1966 Around the Works - Works sidings.  
BR3/2 2-6-2T 82004 82F Bath Green Park (S&D) 14/05/1952 01/10/1965 Around the Works - "A" shop.  
BR3/2 2-6-2T 82035 82E Bristol Barrow Road 03/03/1955 06/08/1965 Around the Works - "A" shop.  
BR9F 2-10-0 92212 82F Bath Green Park (S&D) 30/09/1959 30/01/1968 Around the Works - Works sidings.  
BR9F 2-10-0 92233 88A Cardiff Canton 31/08/1958 03/02/1968 Around the Works - "A" shop.  
BR9F 2-10-0 92241 88A Cardiff Canton 31/10/1958 02/07/1965 Around the Works - "A" shop.  
BR9F 2-10-0 92245 88A Cardiff Canton 30/11/1958 12/1964 Around the Works - "A" shop.  
VR 2-6-2T 8     07/1923 Around the Works - Works sidings.