07/02/2013 16:50:32 |
Added new page to some steam classes - take a snapshot of the class on a particluar date |
Link |
|
06/02/2013 16:52:22 |
Detailed update for LNER Class A4 4-6-2 |
Link |
Yeadon |
04/02/2013 16:54:12 |
Updated LNER Class B1 4-6-0 |
Link |
Yeadon |
23/01/2013 16:23:54 |
Updated LNER Class B5 4-6-0 |
Link |
Yeadon |
22/01/2013 17:58:19 |
Updated LNER Class B9 4-6-0 |
Link |
Yeadon |
22/01/2013 14:58:11 |
Updated LNER Class B8 4-6-0 |
Link |
Yeadon |
22/01/2013 10:49:38 |
Updated LNER Class B7 4-6-0 |
Link |
Yeadon |
22/01/2013 10:16:23 |
Updated LNER Class B4 4-6-0 |
Link |
Yeadon |
20/01/2013 23:33:58 |
Updated LNER Class B6 4-6-0 |
Link |
Yeadon |
20/01/2013 09:13:45 |
Updated LNER Class B3 4-6-0 |
Link |
Yeadon |
19/01/2013 12:06:04 |
Updated LNER Class U1 2-8-8-2T |
Link |
Yeadon |
19/01/2013 00:54:45 |
Updated LNER Class P1 2-8-2 |
Link |
Yeadon |
18/01/2013 22:37:48 |
Updated LNER Class O2 2-8-0 |
Link |
Yeadon |
18/01/2013 22:37:09 |
Updated LNER Class O3 2-8-0 (GNR Class O1) |
Link |
Yeadon |
02/01/2013 23:41:30 |
Updated LNER Class J26 |
Link |
RCTS |
01/01/2013 23:41:10 |
Updated LNER Class J25 |
Link |
RCTS |
25/08/2012 13:07:34 |
Detailed information for LNER Class B16 4-6-0's |
Link |
Yeadon |
25/08/2012 13:07:05 |
Detailed information for LMS Princess Royals |
Link |
The Book of The Princess Royals |
11/08/2012 19:35:40 |
Detailed update for Robinson GCR Class 9N (LNER Class A5) |
Link |
Yeadon |
10/08/2012 15:57:12 |
Detailed update for GNR/LNER Class A1 (Gresley) |
Link |
Yeadon |
10/08/2012 15:57:12 |
Detailed update for LNER Class A3 (Gresley) |
Link |
Yeadon |
01/08/2012 22:30:21 |
Update for HR/LMS Highland Castle |
Link |
RCTS |
01/08/2012 20:46:47 |
Update for HR/LMS Highland Clan |
Link |
RCTS |
01/08/2012 17:11:25 |
Detailed update for GER/LNER Class Y5 |
Link |
Yeadon |
01/08/2012 13:50:09 |
Detailed update for GER/LNER Class Y4 |
Link |
Yeadon |
01/08/2012 13:38:01 |
Detailed update for HBR/NER/LNER Class Q10 |
Link |
Yeadon |
31/07/2012 16:35:32 |
Detailed update for NER/LNER Class Q7 (Raven) |
Link |
Yeadon |
31/07/2012 12:46:36 |
Detailed update for NER/LNER Class Q6 (Raven) |
Link |
Yeadon |
10/07/2012 12:50:00 |
Detailed update for NER/LNER Class A2 (Raven) |
Link |
Yeadon |
10/07/2012 12:49:00 |
Detailed update for LNER Class A2 (Peppercorn) |
Link |
Yeadon |
09/07/2012 00:21:44 |
Detailed update for LNER Class A1 (Peppercorn) |
Link |
Yeadon |
09/07/2012 00:21:25 |
Updated LNER Class B14 |
Link |
Yeadon |
06/07/2012 21:08:20 |
Details added for LNER Class B13 (NER Class S) |
Link |
Yeadon |
13/04/2012 12:45:21 |
Added improved Locomotive allocation Snapshot page |
Link |
|
13/04/2012 12:44:49 |
Added improved Regional Snapshot page |
Link |
|
12/04/2012 12:43:51 |
Added spotter log: A visit to Sheffield Midland station, 1965 |
Link |
John Thickett |
12/04/2012 12:41:59 |
Added spotter log: Visit to Kirkby in Ashfield shed, 1965 |
Link |
John Thickett |
09/04/2012 12:40:00 |
Added loads of detail to GWR Castle class |
Link |
The Book of the Castles - Ian Sixsmith |
09/04/2012 12:00:00 |
Loads of changes, mainly error fixing |
|
|
27/02/2012 11:38:33 |
Updated Reid NBR Class F/LNER Class J88 |
Link |
|
26/02/2012 12:43:25 |
Added renumbering dates for Class 45 diesels |
Link |
|
23/02/2012 23:43:29 |
Added renumbering dates for Class 24 diesels |
Link |
|
23/02/2012 18:05:22 |
Added allocations and mods for the whole of 1975 and 1976 |
|
|
23/02/2012 18:04:58 |
Added renumbering details for all LMS classes whose BR number begins 4* |
|
|
23/02/2012 18:04:58 |
Added details for Webb Class 2-4-2T Precursor tanks |
Link |
|
15/02/2012 14:50:57 |
Updated details for LSWR Class O2 |
Link |
|
14/02/2012 11:50:27 |
Updated details for LSWR Class T1 |
Link |
|
13/02/2012 22:31:10 |
Added details for Adams Class 415 4-4-2T Radials (LSWR) |
Link |
|
13/02/2012 18:57:31 |
Added Eight classes of Adams LSWR 4-4-0's |
Link |
Bradley |
08/02/2012 15:08:55 |
Added details for all 100 LNER class E4 2-4-0's |
Link |
|
08/02/2012 11:32:55 |
Added details for NER Classs E5 2-4-0's |
Link |
|
07/02/2012 23:55:51 |
Added details for LDECR Class J60 |
Link |
|
07/02/2012 23:16:57 |
Added detailed information for GNR class J52/J53 0-6-0ST's |
Link |
|
07/02/2012 16:50:07 |
Added RCTS detail for LNER Class N2 |
Link |
|
01/02/2012 23:54:20 |
Added basic data for all Southern Railway numbers carried by BR Southern Region survivors. |
|
|
01/02/2012 23:53:00 |
Added data for Kirtley 0-6-0T Class T (London, Chatham & Dover Railway) |
Link |
|
29/01/2012 21:37:25 |
Altered Webb 0-6-0 Express Goods (Cauliflower) details - now all 310 locos |
Link |
Baxter & Yeadon |
27/01/2012 17:01:45 |
Updated allocation and renumbering details for Stanier moguls |
Link |
British Railways Illustrated Vol 2/2 |
24/01/2012 16:21:01 |
Inserted Bowen-Cooke LNWR 4-6-2T tanks |
Link |
Baxter |
24/01/2012 13:38:39 |
Updated details of Beames LNWR 380 class 0-8-4T |
Link |
Baxter |
24/01/2012 12:04:52 |
Updated details of Bowen Cooke LNWR 1185 class 0-8-2T |
Link |
Baxter |
23/01/2012 23:41:23 |
Updated details of CR 72 Class 4-4-0's (Pickersgill) |
Link |
Baxter |
23/01/2012 23:41:12 |
Updated details of CR 113 Class 4-4-0's (Pickersgill) |
Link |
Baxter |
23/01/2012 19:24:25 |
Inserted LNWR Precursor Tank data |
Link |
Baxter |
21/01/2012 20:00:23 |
Detailed data for GCR class B18 |
Link |
|
17/01/2012 21:43:52 |
Added detailed data for LNER class M1 |
Link |
|
17/01/2012 20:57:09 |
Added detailed data for LNER class L2 |
Link |
|
17/01/2012 18:31:38 |
Added detailed data for LNER class L3 |
Link |
|
17/01/2012 16:25:04 |
Added data for Metropolitan Railways/LNER Class H2 |
Link |
|
17/01/2012 16:24:41 |
Added data for LNER Class A8/H1 |
Link |
|
17/01/2012 16:23:07 |
Added detailed information for LNER Class A6 4-6-2T |
Link |
|
12/01/2012 22:42:56 |
Added detailed information for LNER Gresley Class K1 (K2's) |
Link |
|
12/01/2012 22:41:51 |
Added detailed information for LNER Peppercorn Class K1 |
Link |
|
11/01/2012 09:21:57 |
LNER A7's updated - loads of details available. |
Link |
|
09/01/2012 09:20:52 |
Added renumbering dates for Black Fives |
Link |
|
08/01/2012 09:21:18 |
Added facts about LMS Crabs |
Link |
|
04/01/2012 09:23:31 |
Added a new page to list all of the locos of a Pre-Grouping company - go to Companies on the menu. |
|
|
29/12/2011 00:20:38 |
Updated details of LNER Class J94 0-6-0ST's |
Link |
|
16/10/2011 16:00:00 |
Added details for NBR Class C, LNER Class J36 |
Link |
|
28/09/2011 20:37:00 |
Added class stubs (no data yet) from about 70 LNER classes that didn't make BR |
Link |
|
28/09/2011 20:33:00 |
Added LNER class P1 details |
Link |
|
23/09/2011 16:58:00 |
Included subsidiary companies when doing a search for Pre-Grouping class lists |
|
|
23/09/2011 16:57:00 |
Added LNER class Y2 |
Link |
|
21/09/2011 00:00:00 |
Added class details for a number of diesel classes, particularly shunters - many new images |
|
Various |
21/09/2011 00:00:00 |
Added forward and backward buttons on diesel loco pages |
|
|
21/09/2011 00:00:00 |
Added walking directions to a number of depots |
|
|
21/09/2011 00:00:00 |
Added better summary data for diesels - check out D1008 |
|
|
21/09/2011 00:00:00 |
New tables to manage diesel locomotive components - will soon be able to report on these components |
|
|
15/09/2011 14:41:00 |
Baby Deltic liveries |
|
CD&E Magazine Issue 6 |
04/08/2011 23:12:20 |
Updated GCR/LNER N4's |
Link |
|
02/08/2011 19:14:11 |
Updated GER/LNER D16's |
Link |
|
02/08/2011 19:13:52 |
Updated GER/LNER D15's |
Link |
|
02/08/2011 19:13:14 |
Updated GER/LNER D14's |
Link |
|
17/04/2011 23:55:03 |
Updated GNR Ivatt 0-6-0 (LNER Class J2) |
Link |
|
17/04/2011 18:54:23 |
Updated GER Class J15 0-6-0's |
Link |
|
15/04/2011 18:55:08 |
Updated LNER J27's |
Link |
|
14/04/2011 20:50:52 |
Updated Gresley K1's |
Link |
|
14/04/2011 12:51:29 |
Updated LNER K2's |
Link |
|
14/04/2011 12:51:29 |
Updated LNER K3's |
Link |
|
14/04/2011 12:51:29 |
Updated LNER K4's |
Link |
|
14/04/2011 12:51:29 |
Updated LNER K5's |
Link |
|
14/04/2011 12:51:29 |
Updated Peppercorn K1's |
Link |
|
12/04/2011 00:17:49 |
Updated GER/LNER J65's |
Link |
|
12/04/2011 00:17:31 |
Updated GCR/LNER J63's |
Link |
|
12/04/2011 00:17:06 |
Updated MLSR/GCR/LNER J62's |
Link |
|
11/04/2011 11:24:00 |
Added Webb LNWR 4-Cylinder Compound 4-6-0's |
Link |
|
10/04/2011 22:21:43 |
Added Whale LNWR Experiment Goods 4-6-0's |
Link |
|
05/04/2011 15:32:30 |
LNER Class S1's updated |
Link |
|
01/04/2011 13:42:33 |
Added NER D21 Class |
Link |
|
31/03/2011 15:39:43 |
Rebuilt LNER Class V1/V3 data |
Link |
|
26/03/2011 13:42:27 |
LNWR 'Prince of Wales' data augmented |
Link |
|