BR
Database
Complete BR Locomotive Database 1948-1997
Home
Guestbook
Contact
Links
Preferences
Menu
Locomotives
Build Dates
Withdrawals
Names
Snapshots
Regional
Locomotives
Workings
ReClassifications
Pilot Scheme
Prototypes
Preservation
Diesels
Electrics
Steam
Classes
Steam
Standards
GWR
1850-1947
Barry
Brecon & Merthyr Junction
Burry Port & Gwendraeth Valley
Cambrian
Cardiff
Midland & South Western Junction
Powlesland & Mason
Port Talbot
Rhymney
Swansea Harbour Trust
Taff Vale
Vale of Rheidol
SR
1923-1947
London South Western
London, Brighton & South Coast
South Eastern & Chatham
LNER
LNER Designs 1923-1947
Great Central
Great Eastern
Great Northern
Great North of Scotland
Hull and Barnsley
Midland and Great Northern
North British
North Eastern
LMS
LMS Designs 1923-1947
Caledonian
Furness
Glasgow & South Western
Highland
London & North Western
London, Tilbury & Southend
Lancashire & Yorkshire
Maryport & Carlisle
Midland
North Staffordshire
Somerset & Dorset
ex WD
by Wheels
2 Driver Tank Engines
2-2-4T
2 Driver Tender Engines
2-2-2
4 Coupled Tank Engines
0-4-0T
0-4-0ST
0-4-2T
0-4-2ST
0-4-4T
2-4-0T
2-4-0WT
2-4-2T
4-4-0T
4-4-2T
4-4-4T
4 Coupled Tender Engines
0-4-0
0-4-2
0-4-4
2-4-0
2-4-2
4-4-0
4-4-2
4-4-4
6 Coupled Tank Engines
0-6-0T
0-6-0PT
0-6-0ST
0-6-2T
0-6-2ST
0-6-4T
2-6-0T
2-6-2T
2-6-4T
4-6-0T
4-6-2T
4-6-4T
6 Coupled Tender Engines
0-6-0
0-6-2
0-6-4
2-6-0
2-6-2
2-6-4
4-6-0
4-6-2
4-6-4
8 Coupled Tank Engines
0-8-0T
0-8-2T
0-8-4T
2-8-0T
2-8-2T
8 Coupled Tender Engines
0-8-0
0-8-2
0-8-4
2-8-0
2-8-2
10 Coupled Tank Engines
0-10-0T
10 Coupled Tender Engines
0-10-0
2-10-0
Special
0-6-6-0T
2-6-6-2T
2-8-8-2T
Diesel
Shunters
Type 1
Type 2
Type 3
Type 4
Type 5
Electric
25KV A.C
1500V D.C
750V D.C
Multiple Units
Steam Railmotors
GWR Railmotors
LNER Railmotors
LMS Railmotors
Diesel Multiple Units
GWR Railcars
LNER Railcars
1st Generation DMU's
2nd Generation DMU's
DEMU's
Pullman
HST
Electric Multiple Units
25KV A.C
1500V D.C
750V D.C
Sites
Depots
Builders
Locomotive Works
Scrapyards
People
Chief Mechanical Engineers
Management
Miscellaneous
Companies
British Railways
GWR & Constituents
Taff Vale
Rhymney
Cambrian
Barry
Cardiff Railway
SR & Constituents
LSWR
LBSCR
SECR
LNER & Constituents
GER
GCR
GNR
MGNR
NER
NBR
GNSR
ex LMS
MR
LNWR
LYR
LTSR
S&DJR
G&SWR
CR
HR
Timelines
Line Closures
Workings
Events
News Stories
Miscellaneous
Reports
Graphs
Anecdotes
Headcodes
Royal Trains
Accidents
Wheel Arrangements
Modernisation Plan 1955
The Beeching Plan
Generate an ABC!
Background Images
On This Day ...
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.
?
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
» 36 Online
» 2034 Today
» 2521 Yesterday
» 16386 Week
» 63219 Month
» 365240 Year
» 2765704 Total
Record: 6840 (19/09/2023)
(
Free MySQL Counter
)
Locomotive Classes of the London and North Western Railway
Designer
Class
Pre Grouping Class
Wheels
Year
Pre Grouping
Big 4
BR Power Class
Number Range
First
Last
#
Thumbnail
Webb
2F
0-6-0ST
LNWR
LMS
0
Webb
Coal Tank
0-6-2T
LNWR
LMS
2F
58880 - 58937
09/1881
10/1958
300
Ramsbottom
835
0-4-0ST
1865
LNWR
LMS
1865
10/1946
56
Beyer Peacock Ltd.
Metropolitan Tank
4-4-0T
1871
LNWR
1871
09/1911
16
Webb
Coal Engines
0-6-0
1873
LNWR
LMS
2F
58320 - 58361
01/1873
03/10/1953
500
Webb
Precursor
LNWR class 'Precursor'
2-4-0
1874
LNWR
04/1874
11/1895
40
Webb
Precedent
LNWR class 'Precedent'
2-4-0
1874
LNWR
LMS
12/1874
10/1934
70
Webb
2234
LNWR class '2234'
2-4-0T
1877
LNWR
LMS
09/1877
14/03/1952
50
Webb
4ft 6 Tank
LNWR class '4ft 6 Tanks'
2-4-2T
1879
LNWR
LMS
01/1879
1933
220
Webb
Cauliflowers
LNWR class 'Express Goods'
0-6-0
1880
LNWR
LMS
2F
58362 - 58430
06/1880
12/1955
310
Webb
2360
0-4-0WT
1880
LNWR
LMS
05/1880
06/1930
10
Webb
Experiment 2-(2-2)-0
LNWR class 'Experiment'
2-(2-2)-0
1882
LNWR
01/1882
12/1905
30
/
Webb
Split Drive Metro Tank
LNWR class 'Split Drive Metro Tank'
4-(2-2)-0T
1884
LNWR
12/1884
03/1897
1
Webb
Dreadnought
LNWR class 'Dreadnought'
2-(2-2)-0
1884
LNWR
30
Webb
687
LNWR class '687'
2-(2-2)-2T
1885
LNWR
10/1885
11/1901
1
Webb
777
LNWR class '777'
2-(2-4)-0T
1887
LNWR
11/1887
11/1901
1
Webb
600
LNWR class '600'
2-(2-2)-2T
1887
LNWR
06/1887
12/1901
1
Webb
Waterloo
LNWR class 'Waterloo'
2-4-0
1889
LNWR
LMS
11/1889
04/1936
90
Webb
Waterloo
LNWR class 'Whitworth'
2-4-0
1889
LNWR
LMS
11/1889
04/1936
90
Webb
Teutonic
LNWR class 'Teutonic'
2-(2-2)-0
1889
LNWR
03/1889
07/1907
10
Webb
1P
2-4-2T
1890
LNWR
LMS
46601 - 46757
09/1890
09/1955
160
Webb
Greater Britain
LNWR class 'Greater Britain'
2-(2-2)-2
1891
LNWR
10/1891
07/1907
10
Webb
2524
0-8-0
1892
LNWR
LMS
10/1892
12/1906
1
Webb
Crane Tank
0-4-2ST
1893
LNWR
LMS
06/1893
11/1946
Webb
A Compound
0-8-0
1893
LNWR
LMS
09/1893
29/12/1962
111
Webb
Improved Precedent
LNWR class 'Improved Precedent'
2-4-0
1893
LNWR
LMS
Webb
Improved Precedent
LNWR class 'Renewed Precedent'
2-4-0
1893
LNWR
LMS
Webb
John Hick
2-(2-2)-2
1894
LNWR
02/1894
05/1912
10
Webb
Crane Tank
LNWR class '853'
0-4-2WT
1894
LNWR
LMS
11/1894
12/1947
5
Webb
Iron Duke
LNWR class 'Iron Duke'
4-4-0
1897
LNWR
LMS
06/1897
05/1898
2
Webb
Jubilee
LNWR class 'Jubilee'
4-4-0
1898
LNWR
LMS
05/1898
1924
38
Webb
1560
LNWR class '1560'
0-6-2T
1898
LNWR
LMS
05/1898
02/1953
80
Webb
Alfred The Great
LNWR class 'Alfred The GReat'
4-4-0
1901
LNWR
LMS
40
Webb
317
LNWR class '317'
0-4-2ST
1901
LNWR
LMS
11/1896
03/11/1956
20
Webb
4 Cylinder Compound
0-8-0
1901
LNWR
LMS
08/1901
12/1964
170
Webb
1400
LNWR class '4-Cylinder Compound'
4-6-0
1903
LNWR
02/1903
09/1920
30
Webb
/
Whale
Rebuilt Compound
2-8-0
1904
LNWR
LMS
0
Whale
Precursor
LNWR class 'Precursor'
4-4-0
1904
LNWR
LMS
2P/3P
58010
03/1904
06/1949
130
Whale
Experiment
LNWR class 'Experiment'
4-6-0
1905
LNWR
LMS
105
Webb
/
Whale
Rebuilt Compound
2-8-0
1906
LNWR
LMS
0
Whale
2 Cylinder Rebuilds + New
0-8-0
1906
LNWR
LMS
01/1910
15/12/1962
60
Whale
19" Goods
4-6-0
1906
LNWR
LMS
4F
48801 - 48834
12/1906
02/1950
170
Whale
Precursor Tank
4-4-2T
1906
LNWR
LMS
2P
05/1906
02/1940
50
Whale
2 Cylinder Rebuilds
0-8-0
1907
LNWR
LMS
0
Whale
Renown
LNWR class 'Renown'
4-4-0
1908-06-00
LNWR
LMS
0000
0000
0
Webb
/
Whale
Coal Engine Saddle Tank
LNWR class 'Coal Tanks'
0-6-0ST
1909
LNWR
LMS
58870
03/1909
11/12/1948
Cooke
2 Cylinder Rebuilds
0-8-0
1909
LNWR
LMS
0
Cooke
2665
LNWR class '5' 6" Tank (Superheated)'
4-6-2T
1910
LNWR
LMS
12/1910
04/1941
47
Cooke
2665
LNWR class '2665'
4-6-2T
1910
LNWR
LMS
12/1910
04/1941
47
Cooke
Queen Mary
4-4-0
1910
LNWR
LMS
07/1910
11/1938
10
Cooke
George V
4-4-0
1910
LNWR
LMS
58011 - 58012
07/1910
22/05/1948
80
Whale
2 Cylinder Simple
0-8-0
1911
LNWR
LMS
0
Cooke
1185
LNWR class '1185'
0-8-2T
1911
LNWR
LMS
6F
47875 - 47896
12/1911
02/1953
30
Cooke
Prince of Wales
LNWR class 'Prince of Wales'
4-6-0
1911
LNWR
LMS
58000 - 58003
10/1911
01/1949
246
Cooke
Claughton
LNWR class 'Claughton'
4-6-0
1913
LNWR
LMS
46004
08/1920
23/04/1949
130
Beames
G2
0-8-0
1921
LNWR
LMS
49395 - 49454
11/1921
12/1964
60
Beames
7F
LNWR class '380'
0-8-4T
1923
LNWR
LMS
7F
47930 - 47959
02/1923
12/1951
30