Locomotive Classes of the North British Railway
Designer | Class | Pre Grouping Class | Wheels | Year | Pre Grouping | Big 4 | BR Power Class | Number Range | First | Last | # | Thumbnail |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Wheatley | J86 | NBR class 'E' | 0-6-0ST | 1870 | NBR | LNER | 0 | |||||
Wheatley | J85 | NBR class 'E' | 0-6-0ST | 1870 | NBR | LNER | 0 | |||||
Wheatley | J81 | NBR class 'E' | 0-6-0T | 1872 | NBR | LNER | 0 | |||||
Wheatley | J84 | NBR class 'E' | 0-6-0ST | 1873 | NBR | LNER | 0 | |||||
Drummond | J82 | NBR class 'R' | 0-6-0T | 1875 | NBR | LNER | 25 | |||||
Drummond | G8 | NBR class 'P' | 0-4-4T | 1877 | NBR | LNER | 06/1877 | 09/1925 | 6 | |||
Drummond | D27 | NBR class 'M' | 4-4-0 | 1877 | NBR | LNER | 12 | |||||
Drummond | D28 | 4-4-0 | 1877 | NBR | LNER | |||||||
Drummond | D50 | NBR class 'P' | 4-4-0T | 1879 | NBR | LNER | 0 | |||||
Drummond | J34 | 0-6-0 | 1879 | NBR | LNER | 1879 | 11/01/1928 | 101 | ||||
Drummond | D51 | NBR class 'R' | 4-4-0T | 1880 | NBR | LNER | 0 | |||||
Neilson, Reid & Co. | Y9 | NBR class 'G' | 0-4-0ST | 1882 | NBR | LNER | 29/12/1962 | 38 | ![]() |
|||
Holmes | D31 | 4-4-0 | 1884 | NBR | LNER | 62059 - 62283 | 48 | |||||
Holmes | 574 | NBR class '574' | 4-4-0 | 1884 | NBR | LNER | 06/1884 | 02/1937 | 6 | |||
Holmes | D25 | NBR class 'N' | 4-4-0 | 1886 | NBR | LNER | 04/1886 | 07/1933 | 12 | |||
Holmes | J36 | NBR class 'C' | 0-6-0 | 1888 | NBR | LNER | 2F | 65210 - 65346 | 08/1888 | 06/1967 | 168 | ![]() |
Holmes | 633 | NBR class '633' | 4-4-0 | 1890 | NBR | LNER | 05/1890 | 12/1952 | 24 | |||
Holmes | D35 | NBR class 'N' | 4-4-0 | 1894 | NBR | LNER | 24 | |||||
Holmes/Reid | D36 | NBR class 'L' | 4-4-0 | 1894 | NBR | LNER | ||||||
Holmes | 729 | NBR class '729' | 4-4-0 | 1898 | NBR | LNER | 03/1898 | 02/1951 | 18 | |||
Holmes | J83 | NBR class 'D' | 0-6-0T | 1900 | NBR | LNER | 2F | 68442 - 68481 | 08/1900 | 29/12/1962 | 40 | ![]() |
Holmes | D26 | NBR class 'K' | 4-4-0 | 1903 | NBR | LNER | 05/1903 | 07/1926 | 12 | |||
Reid | J88 | NBR class 'F' | 0-6-0T | 1904 | NBR | LNER | 0F | 68320 - 68354 | 12/1904 | 29/12/1962 | 35 | ![]() |
Reid | C10 | NBR class 'I' | 4-4-2 | 1906 | NBR | LNER | 0 | |||||
Reid | C10 | NBR class 'H' | 4-4-2 | 1906 | NBR | LNER | 0 | |||||
Reid | J35 | NBR class 'B' | 0-6-0 | 1906 | NBR | LNER | 3F | 64460 - 64535 | 06/1906 | 29/12/1962 | 76 | |
Reid | D32 | 4-4-0 | 1906 | NBR | LNER | 62443 - 62454 | 10/1906 | 29/03/1951 | 12 | |||
Reid | C11 | NBR class 'H' | 4-4-2 | 1906 | NBR | LNER | 0 | |||||
Reid | D29 | NBR class 'J' | 4-4-0 | 1909 | NBR | LNER | 62400 - 62413 | 07/1909 | 14/11/1952 | 16 | ||
Reid | N14 | NBR class 'A' | 0-6-2T | 1909 | NBR | LNER | 4MT | 69120 - 69125 | 09/1909 | 03/1954 | 6 | |
Reid | D33 | NBR class 'K' | 4-4-0 | 1909 | NBR | LNER | 3P | 62455 - 62466 | 10/1909 | 09/1953 | 12 | |
Reid | G9 | NBR class 'M' | 0-4-4T | 1909 | NBR | LNER | 09/1909 | 11/1940 | 12 | |||
Reid | N15 | NBR class 'A' | 0-6-2T | 1910 | NBR | LNER | 4MT | 69126 - 69224 | 06/1910 | 29/12/1962 | 99 | ![]() |
Reid | C15 | NBR class 'M' | 4-4-2T | 1911 | NBR | LNER | 67452 - 67481 | 12/1911 | 12/04/1960 | 30 | ||
Reid | D30 | NBR class 'D30' | 4-4-0 | 1912 | NBR | LNER | 62417 - 62442 | 09/1912 | 25/06/1960 | 27 | ||
Reid | D30 | NBR class 'J' | 4-4-0 | 1912 | NBR | LNER | 62417 - 62442 | 09/1912 | 25/06/1960 | 27 | ||
Reid | Glen | NBR class 'K' | 4-4-0 | 1913 | NBR | LNER | 62467 - 62498 | 09/1913 | 17/12/1962 | 30 | ![]() |
|
Reid | J37 | NBR class 'S' | 0-6-0 | 1914 | NBR | LNER | 4F | 64536 - 64639 | 12/1914 | 22/04/1967 | 104 | ![]() |
Reid | J37 | NBR class 'B' | 0-6-0 | 1914 | NBR | LNER | 4F | 64536 - 64639 | 12/1914 | 22/04/1967 | 104 | ![]() |
Reid | C16 | NBR class 'L' | 4-4-2T | 1915 | NBR | LNER | 67482 - 67502 | 12/1915 | 04/1961 | 21 |