Locomotive Classes of the London and South Western Railway
Designer | Class | Pre Grouping Class | Wheels | Year | Pre Grouping | Big 4 | BR Power Class | Number Range | First | Last | # | Thumbnail |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Beattie | Well Tank | 2-4-0WT | 1874 | LSWR | SR | 30585 - 30587 | 05/1874 | 29/12/1962 | 3 | ![]() |
||
Adams | 46 | 1879 | LSWR | SR | 06/1879 | 07/1925 | 12 | |||||
Adams | 380 | LSWR class '380' | 4-4-0 | 1879 | LSWR | SR | 09/1879 | 12/1925 | 12 | |||
Adams | 135 | LSWR class '135' | 4-4-0 | 1880 | LSWR | SR | 11/1880 | 12/1924 | 12 | |||
Adams | Jumbos | 0-6-0 | 1881 | LSWR | SR | 30564 - 30581 | 12/1881 | 09/1959 | 18 | |||
Adams | Radial Tanks | LSWR class '415' | 4-4-2T | 1882 | LSWR | SR | 1P | 30582 - 30584 | 08/1882 | 07/1961 | 71 | ![]() |
Adams | 445 | LSWR class '445' | 4-4-0 | 1883 | LSWR | SR | 04/1883 | 12/1925 | 12 | |||
Adams | 460 | LSWR class '460' | 4-4-0 | 1884 | LSWR | SR | 06/1884 | 12/1928 | 21 | |||
Adams | Jubilee | 0-4-2 | 1887 | LSWR | SR | 30612 - 30636 | 05/1887 | 12/1948 | 90 | |||
Adams | T1 | LSWR class 'T1' | 0-4-4T | 1888 | LSWR | SR | 30001 - 30367 | 06/1888 | 05/1951 | 50 | ![]() |
|
Adams | O2 | LSWR class 'O2' | 0-4-4T | 1889 | LSWR | SR | 1P | 30177 - 30236 | 12/1889 | 03/1967 | 60 | ![]() |
Adams | X2 | LSWR class 'X2' | 4-4-0 | 1890 | LSWR | SR | 06/1890 | 11/1942 | 20 | ![]() |
||
Adams | B4 | 0-4-0T | 1891 | LSWR | SR | 30081 - 30176 | 10/1891 | 10/1963 | 25 | ![]() |
||
Adams | T3 | LSWR class 'T3' | 4-4-0 | 1892 | LSWR | SR | 12/1892 | 08/1945 | 20 | |||
Adams | G6 | 0-6-0T | 1894 | LSWR | SR | 30160 - 30354 | 08/1894 | 11/11/1961 | 34 | ![]() |
||
Adams | T6 | LSWR class 'T6' | 4-4-0 | 1895 | LSWR | SR | 09/1895 | 04/1943 | 10 | |||
Adams | X6 | LSWR class 'X6' | 4-4-0 | 1895 | LSWR | SR | 12/1895 | 12/1946 | 10 | |||
Drummond | Black Motors | LSWR class '700' | 0-6-0 | 1897 | LSWR | SR | 30306 - 30701 | 03/1897 | 23/12/1962 | 30 | ![]() |
|
Drummond | M7 | LSWR class 'M7' | 0-4-4T | 1897 | LSWR | SR | 30021 - 30676 | 03/1897 | 05/1964 | 105 | ![]() |
|
Drummond | Greyhounds | LSWR class 'T9' | 4-4-0 | 1899 | LSWR | SR | 30113 - 30733 | 01/1899 | 07/1963 | 67 | ![]() |
|
Drummond | Small Hoppers | LSWR class 'K10' | 4-4-0 | 1901 | LSWR | SR | 30135 - 30394 | 12/1901 | 06/1951 | 31 | ||
Drummond | S11 | LSWR class 'S11' | 4-4-0 | 1903 | LSWR | SR | 30395 - 30404 | 06/1903 | 11/1954 | 10 | ||
Drummond | Large Hoppers | LSWR class 'L11' | 4-4-0 | 1903 | LSWR | SR | 30134 - 30442 | 05/1903 | 06/1952 | 40 | ||
Drummond | Bulldogs | LSWR class 'L12' | 4-4-0 | 1904 | LSWR | SR | 30415 - 30434 | 06/1904 | 03/1955 | 20 | ||
Drummond | T14 | LSWR class 'T14' | 4-6-0 | 1911 | LSWR | SR | 30443 - 30462 | 04/1911 | 06/1951 | 9 | ![]() |
|
Urie | H15 | LSWR class 'H15' | 4-6-0 | 1914 | LSWR | SR | 30330 - 30524 | 09/1905 | 09/12/1961 | 26 | ||
Urie/Maunsell | King Arthur | LSWR class 'N15' | 4-6-0 | 1918 | LSWR | SR | 30448 - 30806 | 09/1918 | 24/11/1962 | 74 | ![]() |
|
Urie/Maunsell | S15 | LSWR class 'S15' | 4-6-0 | 1920 | LSWR | SR | 30496 - 30815 | 03/1920 | 09/1965 | 45 | ![]() |
|
Urie | H16 | LSWR class 'H16' | 4-6-2T | 1921 | LSWR | SR | 30516 - 30520 | 11/1921 | 29/12/1962 | 5 | ![]() |
|
Urie | Hump Engines | LSWR class 'G16' | 4-8-0T | 1921 | LSWR | SR | 30492 - 30495 | 07/1921 | 15/12/1962 | 4 | ![]() |