Locomotive Classes with Wheel Arrangement 0-4-0T
Designer | Class | Pre Grouping Class | Wheels | Year | Pre Grouping | Big 4 | BR Power Class | Number Range | First | Last | # | Thumbnail |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Whale | Steam Rail Motor | 0-4-0T | LMS | 29988 | 06/11/1948 | 1 | ||||||
Connor | 446 | CR class '446 Rbld' | 0-4-0T | 1873 | CR | LMS | 2 | |||||
Connor | 446 | CR class '446' | 0-4-0T | 1873 | CR | LMS | 2 | |||||
Neilson, Reid & Co. | 15 | MCR class '15' | 0-4-0T | 1880 | MCR | LMS | 2 | |||||
Worsdell | Y6 | 0-4-0T | 1883 | GER | LNER | 68082 - 68083 | 2 | |||||
Smellie | 291 | GSWR class '191' | 0-4-0T | 1885 | GSWR | LMS | 1 | |||||
Worsdell | Y7 | 0-4-0T | 1888 | NER | LNER | 68088 - 68089 | 12/1952 | 2 | ||||
Worsdell | Y8 | 0-4-0T | 1890 | NER | LNER | 68090 - 68091 | 15/11/1948 | 2 | ||||
Adams | B4 | 0-4-0T | 1891 | LSWR | SR | 30081 - 30176 | 10/1891 | 10/1963 | 25 | ![]() |
||
Churchward | 101 | 0-4-0T | 1902 | GWR | 101 | 06/1903 | 09/1911 | 1 | ||||
Drummond | Potato Cans | 0-4-0T | 1906 | SR | 30588 - 30589 | 01/09/1906 | 04/1959 | 3 | ||||
Deeley | 1528 | 0-4-0T | 1907 | MR | LMS | 0F | 08/1907 | 12/1966 | 5 | ![]() |
||
Hill | Y4 | GER class 'B74' | 0-4-0T | 1913 | GER | LNER | 0F | 68125 - 68129 | 07/1913 | 12/1963 | 5 | |
Sentinel | Y1 | 0-4-0T | 1925 | LNER | 09/1925 | 04/1963 | 24 | ![]() |
||||
Collett | 1101 | 0-4-0T | 1926 | GWR | 1101 - 1106 | 06/1926 | 30/01/1960 | 6 | ||||
Y3 | 0-4-0T | 1927 | LNER | 68154 - 68185 | 12/1927 | 05/1964 | 32 | |||||
Sentinel | 0-4-0T | 1929 | LMS | 47190 - 47191 | 09/1929 | 03/1961 | 2 | ![]() |
||||
Sentinel | 0-4-0T | 1930 | LMS | 47180 - 47184 | 06/1930 | 11/1956 | 5 | |||||
Y10 | 0-4-0T | 1930 | LNER | 68186 - 68187 | 13/08/1948 | 2 |