BR
Database
Complete BR Locomotive Database 1948-1997
Home
Guestbook
Contact
Links
Preferences
Menu
Locomotives
Build Dates
Withdrawals
Names
Snapshots
Regional
Locomotives
Workings
ReClassifications
Pilot Scheme
Prototypes
Preservation
Diesels
Electrics
Steam
Classes
Steam
Standards
GWR
1850-1947
Barry
Brecon & Merthyr Junction
Burry Port & Gwendraeth Valley
Cambrian
Cardiff
Midland & South Western Junction
Powlesland & Mason
Port Talbot
Rhymney
Swansea Harbour Trust
Taff Vale
Vale of Rheidol
SR
1923-1947
London South Western
London, Brighton & South Coast
South Eastern & Chatham
LNER
LNER Designs 1923-1947
Great Central
Great Eastern
Great Northern
Great North of Scotland
Hull and Barnsley
Midland and Great Northern
North British
North Eastern
LMS
LMS Designs 1923-1947
Caledonian
Furness
Glasgow & South Western
Highland
London & North Western
London, Tilbury & Southend
Lancashire & Yorkshire
Maryport & Carlisle
Midland
North Staffordshire
Somerset & Dorset
ex WD
by Wheels
2 Driver Tank Engines
2-2-4T
2 Driver Tender Engines
2-2-2
4 Coupled Tank Engines
0-4-0T
0-4-0ST
0-4-2T
0-4-2ST
0-4-4T
2-4-0T
2-4-0WT
2-4-2T
4-4-0T
4-4-2T
4-4-4T
4 Coupled Tender Engines
0-4-0
0-4-2
0-4-4
2-4-0
2-4-2
4-4-0
4-4-2
4-4-4
6 Coupled Tank Engines
0-6-0T
0-6-0PT
0-6-0ST
0-6-2T
0-6-2ST
0-6-4T
2-6-0T
2-6-2T
2-6-4T
4-6-0T
4-6-2T
4-6-4T
6 Coupled Tender Engines
0-6-0
0-6-2
0-6-4
2-6-0
2-6-2
2-6-4
4-6-0
4-6-2
4-6-4
8 Coupled Tank Engines
0-8-0T
0-8-2T
0-8-4T
2-8-0T
2-8-2T
8 Coupled Tender Engines
0-8-0
0-8-2
0-8-4
2-8-0
2-8-2
10 Coupled Tank Engines
0-10-0T
10 Coupled Tender Engines
0-10-0
2-10-0
Special
0-6-6-0T
2-6-6-2T
2-8-8-2T
Diesel
Shunters
Type 1
Type 2
Type 3
Type 4
Type 5
Electric
25KV A.C
1500V D.C
750V D.C
Multiple Units
Steam Railmotors
GWR Railmotors
LNER Railmotors
LMS Railmotors
Diesel Multiple Units
GWR Railcars
LNER Railcars
1st Generation DMU's
2nd Generation DMU's
DEMU's
Pullman
HST
Electric Multiple Units
25KV A.C
1500V D.C
750V D.C
Sites
Depots
Builders
Locomotive Works
Scrapyards
People
Chief Mechanical Engineers
Management
Miscellaneous
Companies
British Railways
GWR & Constituents
Taff Vale
Rhymney
Cambrian
Barry
Cardiff Railway
SR & Constituents
LSWR
LBSCR
SECR
LNER & Constituents
GER
GCR
GNR
MGNR
NER
NBR
GNSR
ex LMS
MR
LNWR
LYR
LTSR
S&DJR
G&SWR
CR
HR
Timelines
Line Closures
Workings
Events
News Stories
Miscellaneous
Reports
Wheel Arrangements
Background Images
On This Day ...
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.
?
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 297 Today
» 5773 Yesterday
» 11223 Week
» 104457 Month
» 564398 Year
» 5003835 Total
Record: 12282 (30/03/2025)
(
Free MySQL Counter
)
Locomotive Classes with Wheel Arrangement 0-6-0
Designer
Class
Pre Grouping Class
Wheels
Year
Pre Grouping
Big 4
BR Power Class
Number Range
First
Last
#
Thumbnail
3F
0-6-0
LMS
52494 - 52510
08/1957
6
J28
0-6-0
LNER
0
J31
0-6-0
LNER
0
J32
0-6-0
LNER
0
J33
0-6-0
LNER
0
1001
0-6-0
LNER
0
398
0-6-0
LNER
0
Sharp Stewart
D1
FR class 'D1'
0-6-0
1866
FR
LMS
1F
55
Sharp Stewart
D1
FR class 'D1'
0-6-0
1866
FR
LMS
1F
55
Sharp Stewart
D1
FR class 'D1'
0-6-0
1866
FR
LMS
1F
55
Sharp Stewart
D1
FR class 'D1'
0-6-0
1866
FR
LMS
1F
55
Maryport Works
1
MCR class '1'
0-6-0
1866
MCR
1
Armstrong
Standard Goods
0-6-0
1866
GWR
310
Stirling
58
GSWR class '58'
0-6-0
1866
GSWR
LMS
G
05/1866
1923
26
Maryport Works
12
MCR class '12'
0-6-0
1870
MCR
1
700
0-6-0
1870
LMS
58110 - 58113
02/1870
10/11/1951
4
Maryport Works
6
MCR class '6'
0-6-0
1871
MCR
LMS
2
Beyer Peacock Ltd.
21
MCR class '21 Rbld'
0-6-0
1871
MCR
LMS
3
Beyer Peacock Ltd.
21
MCR class '21'
0-6-0
1871
MCR
LMS
3
Stoke Works
74
NSR class '74'
0-6-0
1871
NSR
LMS
1F
22
Stoke Works
74
NSR class '74'
0-6-0
1871
NSR
LMS
1F
22
Stoke Works
74
NSR class '74 VF'
0-6-0
1871
NSR
LMS
1F
22
Stoke Works
74
NSR class '74 BP'
0-6-0
1871
NSR
LMS
1F
22
Stoke Works
74
NSR class '74 Long WB'
0-6-0
1871
NSR
LMS
1F
22
Stoke Works
69
NSR class '69'
0-6-0
1873
NSR
LMS
1F
8
Webb
Coal Engines
0-6-0
1873
LNWR
LMS
2F
58320 - 58361
01/1873
03/10/1953
500
Ivatt
J4
GNR class 'J5'
0-6-0
1873
GNR
LNER
64109 - 64167
25/11/1950
315
Maryport Works
9
MCR class '9'
0-6-0
1875
MCR
LMS
1875
07/1930
2
Johnson
1142
0-6-0
1875
MR
LMS
2F
58114 - 58187
02/1875
28/01/1964
120
Barton Wright
/
Aspinall
568
LYR class '25'
0-6-0
1876
LYR
LMS
07/1887
07/1959
280
Stirling
13
GSWR class '13'
0-6-0
1877
GSWR
LMS
1F
12/1877
07/1928
12
Beyer Peacock Ltd.
25
MCR class '25'
0-6-0
1878
MCR
LMS
3
Johnson
2F
0-6-0
1878
MR
LMS
58188 - 58310
01/01/1878
07/07/1962
103
Johnson
1357
MR class '1357'
0-6-0
1878
MR
LMS
58188 - 58228
01/01/1885
13/06/1959
20
Johnson
1357
MR class 'H'
0-6-0
1878
MR
LMS
58188 - 58228
01/01/1885
13/06/1959
20
Johnson
1357
MR class '37'
0-6-0
1878
MR
LMS
58188 - 58228
01/01/1885
13/06/1959
20
Stirling
O
0-6-0
1878
SER
SR
122
Drummond
J34
0-6-0
1879
NBR
LNER
1879
11/01/1928
101
Webb
Cauliflowers
LNWR class 'Express Goods'
0-6-0
1880
LNWR
LMS
2F
58362 - 58430
06/1880
12/1955
310
Sacré
J12
0-6-0
1880
MSLR
LNER
08/1880
02/1930
62
Maryport Works
11
MCR class '11'
0-6-0
1881
MCR
LMS
4
Adams
Jumbos
0-6-0
1881
LSWR
SR
30564 - 30581
12/1881
09/1959
18
Smellie
22
GSWR class '22'
0-6-0
1881
GSWR
LMS
1F
06/1881
11/1934
64
Stirling
/
Wainwright
O1
0-6-0
1882
SR
31003 - 31439
09/1882
06/1961
Drummond
294
CR class '294'
0-6-0
1883
CR
LMS
2F
163
Drummond
294
CR class '294 Y32'
0-6-0
1883
CR
LMS
2F
163
Drummond
294
CR class '294 Y37'
0-6-0
1883
CR
LMS
2F
163
Dean
Dean Goods
0-6-0
1883
GWR
2322 - 2579
01/1884
05/1957
260
Worsdell
J15
GER class 'Y14'
0-6-0
1883
GER
LNER
65350 - 65479
07/1883
16/09/1962
289
Stirling
J7
GNR class 'J9'
0-6-0
1883
GNR
LNER
06/1883
09/1936
18
Stirling
J7
GNR class 'J10'
0-6-0
1883
GNR
LNER
06/1883
09/1936
18
McDonnell
J22
NER class '59'
0-6-0
1883
NER
LNER
09/1883
01/1930
44
Dean
1833
0-6-0
1884
GWR
Dean
2361
0-6-0
1885
GWR
20
Johnson
3F
0-6-0
1885
MR
LMS
43174 - 43750
1885
19/08/1961
11
Worsdell
J21
NER class 'C'
0-6-0
1886
NER
LNER
2F
65025 - 65123
08/1886
23/04/1962
201
Worsdell
J21
NER class 'C1'
0-6-0
1886
NER
LNER
2F
65025 - 65123
08/1886
23/04/1962
201
Worsdell
J21
NER class 'C'
0-6-0
1886
NER
LNER
2F
65025 - 65123
08/1886
23/04/1962
201
Parker
J8
GCR class '6AI'
0-6-0
1887
GCR
LNER
11/1887
05/1930
12
Holmes
J36
NBR class 'C'
0-6-0
1888
NBR
LNER
2F
65210 - 65346
08/1888
06/1967
168
Johnson
3F
0-6-0
1888
MR
LMS
43191 - 43773
09/1888
15/02/1964
325
Aspinall
27
LYR class '27'
0-6-0
1889
LYR
LMS
2F
52088 - 52529
11/1889
12/12/1962
246
Aspinall
11
0-6-0
1889
LYR
LMS
3F
10/1889
03/1957
Parker
J13
MSLR class '9'
0-6-0
1889
MSLR
LNER
01/1889
11/1935
6
Stirling
J23
HBR class 'B'
0-6-0
1889
HBR
LNER
03/1889
05/11/1938
55
Johnson
3F
0-6-0
1890
MR
LMS
43194 - 43260
05/1890
09/1962
9
Parker
/
Pollitt
J9
GCR class '9B'
0-6-0
1891
GCR
LNER
31
Parker
/
Pollitt
J9
GCR class '9E'
0-6-0
1891
GCR
LNER
31
Parker
J10
0-6-0
1892
MLSR
LNER
65126 - 65209
01/1894
08/1961
124
Manson
306
GSWR class '306'
0-6-0
1892
GSWR
LMS
1F
11/1892
11/1932
20
Holden
J14
GER class 'N31'
0-6-0
1893
GER
LNER
01/1893
04/1925
81
Billinton
Small Vulcans
0-6-0
1893
SR
32435 - 32533
03/1893
02/1950
3
Marsh
Large Vulcans
0-6-0
1893
SR
32434 - 32554
03/1893
10/02/1962
45
Worsdell
/
Raven
J24
0-6-0
1894
NER
LNER
65600 - 65644
25/11/1950
34
McIntosh
711
CR class '711 Con'
0-6-0
1895
CR
LMS
2F
81
McIntosh
711
CR class '711'
0-6-0
1895
CR
LMS
2F
81
Ivatt
/
Gresley
J3
GNR class 'J4'
0-6-0
1896
GNR
LNER
64105 - 64163
12/1954
0
Johnson
J40
MGNR class 'D'
0-6-0
1896
MGNR
LNER
16
Johnson
J41
MGNR class 'D Rbld'
0-6-0
1896
MGNR
LNER
0
Longbottom
100
NSR class '100'
0-6-0
1896
NSR
LMS
2F
8
Drummond
Black Motors
LSWR class '700'
0-6-0
1897
LSWR
SR
30306 - 30701
03/1897
23/12/1962
30
Manson
160
GSWR class '160'
0-6-0
1897
GSWR
LMS
1F
12/1897
04/1933
18
Worsdell
/
Raven
J25
NER class 'P1'
0-6-0
1898
NER
LNER
65645 - 65728
05/1898
18/06/1962
120
McIntosh
812
CR class '812'
0-6-0
1899
CR
LMS
3F
79
Pettigrew
D3
FR class 'D3'
0-6-0
1899
FR
LMS
2F
12
Drummond
K
0-6-0
1900
HR
LMS
02/1900
01/1952
12
Holden
J16
GER class 'F48'
0-6-0
1900
GER
LNER
09/1900
16/09/1962
60
Holden
J16
GER class 'J16'
0-6-0
1900
GER
LNER
09/1900
16/09/1962
60
Holden
J17
0-6-0
1900
GER
LNER
65500 - 65589
04/1905
16/09/1962
30
Wainwright
C
0-6-0
1900
SECR
SR
31004 - 31725
06/1900
07/1963
109
Manson
361
GSWR class '361'
0-6-0
1900
GSWR
LMS
2F
05/1900
12/1937
34
Longbottom
159
NSR class '159'
0-6-0
1900
NSR
LMS
2F
6
Longbottom
159
NSR class '159'
0-6-0
1900
NSR
LMS
2F
6
Robinson
J11
GCR class '9J'
0-6-0
1901
GCR
LNER
64280 - 64453
09/1901
21/10/1962
174
15
CambR class '15'
0-6-0
1903
CambR
GWR
844 - 896
30/03/1903
10/1954
11
Deeley
3F
0-6-0
1903
LMS
43775 - 43833
07/1903
08/09/1962
55
Worsdell
J26
0-6-0
1904
NER
LNER
65730 - 65779
06/1904
18/06/1962
50
Worsdell
/
Raven
J27
NER class 'P3'
0-6-0
1906
NER
LNER
65780 - 65894
04/1906
09/1967
115
Hughes
898
0-6-0
1906
LYR
LMS
3F
22
Marsh
C3
0-6-0
1906
LBSCR
SR
32300 - 32309
03/1906
01/1952
10
Reid
J35
NBR class 'B'
0-6-0
1906
NBR
LNER
3F
64460 - 64535
06/1906
29/12/1962
76
Pettigrew
D4
FR class 'D4'
0-6-0
1906
FR
LMS
3F
4
Adams
82
NSR class '82'
0-6-0
1907
NSR
LMS
2F
2
North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
18
MCR class '18'
0-6-0
1908
MCR
LMS
1
McIntosh
652
CR class '652'
0-6-0
1908
CR
LMS
3F
17
Ivatt
J1
GNR class 'J21'
0-6-0
1908
GNR
LNER
2MT
65002 - 65014
08/1908
22/11/1954
15
Ivatt
J5
GNR class 'J22'
0-6-0
1909
GNR
LNER
3F
65480 - 65499
10/1909
12/1955
20
Adams
84
NSR class '84'
0-6-0
1909
NSR
LMS
3F
8
Adams
84
NSR class '84'
0-6-0
1909
NSR
LMS
3F
8
Manson
17
GSWR class '17'
0-6-0
1910
GSWR
LMS
07/1910
01/1937
15
Fowler
4F
0-6-0
1911
LMS
43835 - 44026
10/1911
06/11/1965
192
Fowler
4F
0-6-0
1911
MR
LMS
44027 - 44606
04/1922
10/1966
580
Ivatt
/
Gresley
J6
GNR class 'J22'
0-6-0
1911
GNR
LNER
3F
64170 - 64279
08/1911
20/06/1962
110
Smellie
/
Manson
281 Renewed
GSWR class '281'
0-6-0
1911
GSWR
LMS
06/1911
1930
J18
0-6-0
1912
LNER
10
McIntosh
30
CR class '30'
0-6-0
1912
CR
LMS
3F
4
Ivatt
J2
GNR class 'J21'
0-6-0
1912
GNR
LNER
2MT
08/1912
07/1954
10
Drummond
279
GSWR class '279'
0-6-0
1913
GSWR
LMS
4F
04/1913
09/1933
15
Pettigrew
D5
FR class 'D5'
0-6-0
1913
FR
LMS
3F
19
Pettigrew
D5
FR class 'D5'
0-6-0
1913
FR
LMS
3F
19
Reid
J37
NBR class 'B'
0-6-0
1914
NBR
LNER
4F
64536 - 64639
12/1914
22/04/1967
104
Reid
J37
NBR class 'S'
0-6-0
1914
NBR
LNER
4F
64536 - 64639
12/1914
22/04/1967
104
Hill
/
Gresley
J19
0-6-0
1916
GER
LNER
64640 - 64674
16/09/1962
60
Pickersgill
300
CR class '300 SVSh'
0-6-0
1918
CR
LMS
3F
43
Pickersgill
300
CR class '300 PSh'
0-6-0
1918
CR
LMS
3F
43
Pickersgill
300
CR class '300 SV'
0-6-0
1918
CR
LMS
3F
43
Pickersgill
300
CR class '300'
0-6-0
1918
CR
LMS
3F
43
Hill
J20
0-6-0
1920
GER
LNER
64675 - 64699
04/1920
16/09/1962
25
Yorkshire Engine Company
29
MCR class '29'
0-6-0
1921
MCR
LMS
2
Whitelegg
150
GSWR class '150'
0-6-0
1921
GSWR
LMS
07/1921
04/1935
2
Connor
23 Rbld
NSR class '23 Rbld'
0-6-0
1924
NSR
LMS
0
Gresley
J38
0-6-0
1926
LNER
6F
65900 - 65934
28/01/1926
22/04/1967
35
Gresley
J39
0-6-0
1926
LNER
4F
64700 - 64988
28/09/1926
29/12/1962
289
Collett
2251
0-6-0
1930
GWR
3MT
2200 - 3219
03/1930
06/1965
120
Maunsell
Q
0-6-0
1938
SR
30530 - 30549
01/1938
04/1965
20
Bulleid
Q1
0-6-0
1942
SR
33001 - 33040
03/1942
01/1966
40