Locomotive Classes with Wheel Arrangement 0-6-0ST
Designer | Class | Pre Grouping Class | Wheels | Year | Pre Grouping | Big 4 | BR Power Class | Number Range | First | Last | # | Thumbnail |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Webb | 2F | 0-6-0ST | LNWR | LMS | 0 | |||||||
Armstrong | 302 | 0-6-0ST | 1864 | GWR | 302 - 309 | 8 | ||||||
Armstrong | 1016 | 0-6-0ST | 1867 | GWR | 0-6-0ST | 01/1867 | 07/1935 | 60 | ||||
Armstrong | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1870 | GWR | 266 | |||||||
Wheatley | J86 | NBR class 'E' | 0-6-0ST | 1870 | NBR | LNER | 0 | |||||
Wheatley | J85 | NBR class 'E' | 0-6-0ST | 1870 | NBR | LNER | 0 | |||||
Canty | H&I | 0-6-0ST | 1872 | RR | GWR | 22 | ||||||
Wheatley | J84 | NBR class 'E' | 0-6-0ST | 1873 | NBR | LNER | 0 | |||||
Stirling | J55 | 0-6-0ST | 1874 | GNR | LNER | 68317 - 68319 | 24/12/1948 | 0 | ||||
Dean | 850 | 0-6-0ST | 1875 | GWR | 48 | |||||||
1331 | 0-6-0ST | 1877 | GWR | 1331 | 01/01/1877 | 30/01/1950 | 1 | ![]() |
||||
Fletcher | 44 | NER class '44' | 0-6-0ST | 1881 | NER | LNER | 0 | |||||
Brittain | 486 | CR class '486' | 0-6-0ST | 1881 | CR | LMS | 6 | |||||
Brittain | 486 | CR class '486 Rbld' | 0-6-0ST | 1881 | CR | LMS | 6 | |||||
Stirling | J57 | 0-6-0ST | 1882 | GNR | LNER | 12/1882 | 06/1938 | 8 | ||||
Unclassified | ANDR class 'Unclass' | 0-6-0ST | 1886 | ANDR | GWR | 680 | 01/01/1886 | 12/1948 | 1 | |||
Dean | 1661 | 0-6-0ST | 1886 | GWR | 40 | |||||||
Drummond | 323 | CR class '323 Ext' | 0-6-0ST | 1887 | CR | LMS | 3F | 30 | ||||
Drummond | 323 | CR class '323' | 0-6-0ST | 1887 | CR | LMS | 3F | 30 | ||||
Drummond | 272 | CR class '272' | 0-6-0ST | 1888 | CR | LMS | 6 | |||||
Aspinall | 23 | LYR class '23' | 0-6-0ST | 1891 | LYR | LMS | 51304 - 51530 | 03/1877 | 12/1964 | 240 | ![]() |
|
Dean | 655 | 0-6-0ST | 1892 | GWR | 52 | |||||||
Ivatt | J53 | GNR class 'J14' | 0-6-0ST | 1892 | GNR | LNER | 12/1892 | 07/1958 | 52 | |||
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd | 6 | CWR class '6' | 0-6-0ST | 1894 | CWR | LMS | 2 | |||||
Stirling | J52 | GNR class 'J13' | 0-6-0ST | 1894 | GNR | LNER | 68757 - 68889 | 08/1897 | 03/1961 | 85 | ![]() |
|
J84 | 0-6-0ST | 1895 | EWYUR | LNER | 0 | |||||||
Lambie | 211 | CR class '211' | 0-6-0ST | 1895 | CR | LMS | 3F | 5 | ||||
Pollitt | J62 | 0-6-0ST | 1897 | MSLR | LNER | 0F | 68200 - 68203 | 01/1897 | 11/1951 | 12 | ||
Unclassified | 0-6-0ST | 1900 | BPGVR | GWR | 2192 | 08/1900 | 04/1951 | 1 | ||||
Unclassified | 0-6-0ST | 1901 | BPGVR | GWR | 2193 | 09/1901 | 02/1952 | 1 | ||||
Unclassified | 0-6-0ST | 1903 | BPGVR | GWR | 2194 - 2195 | 05/1903 | 02/1953 | 2 | ||||
Unclassified | 0-6-0ST | 1906 | BPGVR | GWR | 2196 | 09/1906 | 01/1956 | 1 | ||||
Unclassified | 0-6-0ST | 1907 | BPGVR | GWR | 2176 | 01/01/1907 | 03/1955 | 1 | ||||
Brittain | 8 | CWR class '8' | 0-6-0ST | 1907 | CWR | LMS | 2 | |||||
Webb/Whale | Coal Engine Saddle Tank | LNWR class 'Coal Tanks' | 0-6-0ST | 1909 | LNWR | LMS | 58870 | 03/1909 | 11/12/1948 | |||
Churchward | 1361 | 0-6-0ST | 1910 | GWR | 1361 - 1365 | 04/1910 | 20/11/1962 | 5 | ![]() |
|||
Unclassified | SHT class 'Unclass' | 0-6-0ST | 1912 | SHT | GWR | 1085 - 1086 | 04/1912 | 04/1951 | 2 | |||
Unclassified | LMMR class 'Unclass' | 0-6-0ST | 1917 | LMMR | GWR | 359 | 06/1917 | 02/1954 | 1 | |||
J85 | 0-6-0ST | 1919 | EWYUR | LNER | 0 | |||||||
Hudswell Clarke | 10 | CWR class '10' | 0-6-0ST | 1920 | CWR | LMS | 1 | |||||
Riddles | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 1943 | LNER | 68006 - 68080 | 01/1944 | 10/1967 | 75 | ![]() |