Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Donations

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 29 Online
» 2569 Today
» 3922 Yesterday
» 30091 Week
» 62557 Month
» 265221 Year
» 3292074 Total
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Locomotive Classes with Wheel Arrangement 0-8-0

Designer Class Pre Grouping Class Wheels Year Pre Grouping Big 4 BR Power Class Number Range First Last # Thumbnail
Cooke G2A   0-8-0     LMS   48893 - 49394     0
Sharp Stewart D   0-8-0 1887 BaR GWR         4
Webb 2524   0-8-0 1892 LNWR LMS     10/1892 12/1906 1
Cooke G1   0-8-0 1892   LMS   48892 - 49384 10/1892 07/1964 171
Webb A Compound   0-8-0 1893 LNWR LMS     09/1893 29/12/1962 111
Aspinall 91 LYR class '30' 0-8-0 1900 LYR LMS 5F       110
Aspinall 91 LYR class '91' 0-8-0 1900 LYR LMS 5F       110
Worsdell Q5 NER class 'T1' 0-8-0 1901 NER LNER 6F 63250 - 63339 08/1901 06/10/1951 90
Worsdell Q5 NER class 'T' 0-8-0 1901 NER LNER 6F 63250 - 63339 08/1901 06/10/1951 90
Webb 4 Cylinder Compound   0-8-0 1901 LNWR LMS     08/1901 12/1964 170
McIntosh 600 CR class '600' 0-8-0 1901 CR LMS 4F       8
Ivatt Q1 GNR class 'K1' 0-8-0 1901 GNR LNER     02/1901 10/02/1937 50
Robinson Q4 GCR class '8A' 0-8-0 1902 GCR LNER 5F 63200 - 63243 1902 15/09/1959 89
Ivatt Q2 GNR class 'K1' 0-8-0 1902 GNR LNER     10/1909 02/1934 5
Hoy 392   0-8-0 1902 LYR LMS     02/1902   20
Hughes 1452   0-8-0 1906 LYR LMS     02/1906 04/1927 10
Whale 2 Cylinder Rebuilds + New   0-8-0 1906 LNWR LMS     01/1910 15/12/1962 60
Whale 2 Cylinder Rebuilds   0-8-0 1907 LNWR LMS         0
Stirling Q10 HBR class 'A' 0-8-0 1907 HBR LNER     02/1907 04/11/1931 15
Cooke 2 Cylinder Rebuilds   0-8-0 1909 LNWR LMS         0
Hughes 9   0-8-0 1910 LYR LMS     07/1910 02/1951 40
Whale 2 Cylinder Simple   0-8-0 1911 LNWR LMS         0
Hughes 1546   0-8-0 1912 LYR LMS         115
Raven Q6 NER class 'T2' 0-8-0 1913 NER LNER 6F 63340 - 63459 02/1913 09/09/1967 120
Ivatt/Gresley Q3 GNR class 'K2' 0-8-0 1914 GNR LNER         0
Raven Q7 NER class 'T3' 0-8-0 1919 NER LNER 7F 63460 - 63474 10/1919 17/12/1962 15
Beames G2   0-8-0 1921 LNWR LMS   49395 - 49454 11/1921 12/1964 60
Fowler 7F   0-8-0 1929   LMS 7F 49500 - 49674 26/03/1929 20/01/1962 175