Locomotive Classes with Wheel Arrangement 2-6-0
Designer | Class | Pre Grouping Class | Wheels | Year | Pre Grouping | Big 4 | BR Power Class | Number Range | First | Last | # | Thumbnail |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Baldwin Locomotive Works | Baldwin 2-6-0 | 2-6-0 | 1899 | MR | 2501 - 2540 | 1899 | 05/1914 | 30 | ||||
Schenectady Locomotive Works | Schenectady 2-6-0 | 2-6-0 | 1899 | MR | 2511 - 2520 | 1899 | 08/1915 | 10 | ||||
Dean | Aberdare | 2-6-0 | 1900 | GWR | 2600 - 2681 | 04/1901 | 27/10/1949 | 81 | ||||
Churchward | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 1911 | GWR | 4303 - 9319 | 06/1911 | 11/1964 | 342 | ||||
Gresley | K1 | GNR class 'H2' | 2-6-0 | 1912 | GNR | LNER | 4MT | 08/1912 | 06/12/1960 | 10 | ||
McIntosh | 34 | CR class '34' | 2-6-0 | 1912 | CR | LMS | 3F | 5 | ||||
Gresley | K2 | GNR class 'H3' | 2-6-0 | 1913 | GNR | LNER | 4MT | 61720 - 61794 | 04/1914 | 22/06/1962 | 65 | ![]() |
Billinton | Moguls | 2-6-0 | 1913 | SR | 32337 - 32353 | 09/1913 | 30/12/1962 | 17 | ![]() |
|||
Drummond | 403 | GSWR class '403' | 2-6-0 | 1915 | GSWR | LMS | 4F | 09/1915 | 03/1947 | 11 | ||
Maunsell | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 1917 | SR | 31400 - 31875 | 06/1917 | 06/1966 | 80 | ![]() |
|||
Gresley | K3 | GNR class 'H4' | 2-6-0 | 1920 | GNR | LNER | 61800 - 61992 | 03/1920 | 16/09/1963 | 193 | ![]() |
|
Maunsell | N1 | 2-6-0 | 1923 | SR | 31822 - 31880 | 03/1923 | 17/11/1962 | 6 | ||||
Hughes | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 1926 | LMS | 42700 - 42944 | 19/06/1926 | 21/01/1967 | 245 | ![]() |
|||
Maunsell | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 1928 | SR | 31610 - 31809 | 06/1917 | 06/1966 | 50 | ![]() |
|||
Maunsell | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 1928 | SR | 31890 - 31910 | 06/1928 | 07/1963 | 21 | ![]() |
|||
Stanier | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 1933 | LMS | 6P5F | 42945 - 42984 | 21/10/1933 | 11/02/1967 | 40 | ![]() |
||
Gresley | K4 | 2-6-0 | 1937 | LNER | 61993 - 61998 | 01/1937 | 18/12/1961 | 6 | ![]() |
|||
Gresley/Thompson | K5 | 2-6-0 | 1945 | LNER | 61863 | 0 | ||||||
Gresley/Thompson | K1/1 | 2-6-0 | 1945 | LNER | 61997 | 0 | ||||||
Ivatt | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 1946 | LMS | 2MT | 46400 - 46527 | 12/1946 | 06/1967 | 128 | ![]() |
||
Ivatt | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 1947 | LMS | 43000 - 43161 | 12/1947 | 22/06/1968 | 162 | ![]() |
|||
Peppercorn | K1 | 2-6-0 | 1949 | LNER | 62001 - 62070 | 30/05/1949 | 30/12/1967 | 70 | ![]() |
|||
Riddles | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 1952 | 78000 - 78064 | 12/1952 | 05/1967 | 65 | ![]() |
||||
Riddles | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 1952 | 76000 - 76114 | 12/1952 | 12/1967 | 115 | ![]() |
||||
Riddles | Standard Class 3 | 2-6-0 | 1954 | 3MT | 77000 - 77019 | 09/02/1954 | 09/07/1967 | 20 | ![]() |