Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Donations

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 206 Today
» 3545 Yesterday
» 16513 Week
» 68398 Month
» 693753 Year
» 3720606 Total
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Locomotive Classes with Wheel Arrangement 4-4-0

Designer Class Pre Grouping Class Wheels Year Pre Grouping Big 4 BR Power Class Number Range First Last # Thumbnail
  STRAT   4-4-0               0
  D   4-4-0     LNER         0
  38   4-4-0     LNER         0
Johnson 60   4-4-0   MR LMS     1898 08/1962 40
Johnson 2781   4-4-0   MR LMS     1902 09/1952 70
Manson D47 GNSR class 'K' 4-4-0 1866 GNSR LNER         0
Manson D47 GNSR class 'L' 4-4-0 1866 GNSR LNER         0
Stirling 6 GSWR class '6' 4-4-0 1873 GSWR LMS     07/1873 06/1896 22
Drummond D27 NBR class 'M' 4-4-0 1877 NBR LNER         12
Drummond D28   4-4-0 1877 NBR LNER          
Johnson 1327   4-4-0 1877 MR LMS     1877 10/1934 20
Sacré D12 GCR class '6B' 4-4-0 1877 GCR LNER         0
Manson D45 GNSR class 'M' 4-4-0 1878 GNSR LNER         0
Cowan D39 GNSR class 'C' 4-4-0 1878 GNSR LNER         3
Adams 380 LSWR class '380' 4-4-0 1879 LSWR SR     09/1879 12/1925 12
Adams 135 LSWR class '135' 4-4-0 1880 LSWR SR     11/1880 12/1924 12
Barton Wright 629   4-4-0 1880 LYR LMS     0000   94
  A-Rebuild MGNR class 'A Rebuild' 4-4-0 1882 MGNR LNER         0
Johnson 2P   4-4-0 1882 MR LMS   40332 - 40397 10/1882 02/1961 17
Johnson 1562   4-4-0 1882 MR LMS     1882 09/1959 30
Smellie 119 GSWR class '119' 4-4-0 1882 GSWR LMS         24
Jones Skye Bogie HR class 'L' 4-4-0 1882 HR LMS 1P   05/1882 06/1930 9
Brittain 179 CR class '179' 4-4-0 1882 CR LMS         10
Brittain 179 CR class '179 Rbld' 4-4-0 1882 CR LMS         10
Adams 445 LSWR class '445' 4-4-0 1883 LSWR SR     04/1883 12/1925 12
Drummond 66 CR class '66' 4-4-0 1884 CR LMS 1P       28
Drummond 66 CR class '66 Y21' 4-4-0 1884 CR LMS 1P       28
Drummond 66 CR class '66 Y25' 4-4-0 1884 CR LMS 1P       28
Holmes D31   4-4-0 1884 NBR LNER   62059 - 62283     48
Holmes 574 NBR class '574' 4-4-0 1884 NBR LNER     06/1884 02/1937 6
Adams 460 LSWR class '460' 4-4-0 1884 LSWR SR     06/1884 12/1928 21
Johnson 1667   4-4-0 1884 MR LMS     1884 01/1961 10
Manson D44 GNSR class 'A' 4-4-0 1884 GNSR LNER         0
Johnson 1738   4-4-0 1885 MR LMS     1885 12/1956 20
Manson D48 GNSR class 'G' 4-4-0 1885 GNSR LNER         0
Worsdell D22 NER class 'F-T' 4-4-0 1886 NER LNER         0
Drummond 124 CR class '124' 4-4-0 1886 CR LMS         1
Drummond 124 CR class '124 Rbld' 4-4-0 1886 CR LMS         1
Holden D13 GER class 'T19 Rbt' 4-4-0 1886 GER LNER         0
Holmes D25 NBR class 'N' 4-4-0 1886 NBR LNER     04/1886 07/1933 12
Wainwright Jumbos   4-4-0 1886   SR   31002 - 31231 11/1886 03/1949 9
Smellie 153 GSWR class '153' 4-4-0 1886 GSWR LMS          
Jones Bruce HR class 'E' 4-4-0 1886 HR LMS     12/1886 06/1930 8
Worsdell D23 NER class 'G-T' 4-4-0 1887 NER LNER         0
Parker D7   4-4-0 1887 MSLR LNER     11/1887 12/1939 31
Manson D46 GNSR class 'N' 4-4-0 1887 GNSR LNER         0
Barton Wright 209   4-4-0 1887 LYR LMS     0000   16
Drummond 80 CR class '80' 4-4-0 1888 CR LMS 1P       12
Drummond 80 CR class '80 Lrg' 4-4-0 1888 CR LMS 1P       12
Aspinall 978 LYR class '978' 4-4-0 1888 LYR LMS         30
Aspinall 978 LYR class '2' 4-4-0 1888 LYR LMS         30
Parker D8 MSLR class '6DB' 4-4-0 1888 MSLR LNER     07/1888 03/1926 3
Johnson 1808   4-4-0 1888 MR LMS     1888 02/1961 25
Manson D42 GNSR class 'O' 4-4-0 1888 GNSR LNER         0
Sharp Stewart K1 FR class 'K1' 4-4-0 1890 FR LMS 1P       4
Holmes 633 NBR class '633' 4-4-0 1890 NBR LNER     05/1890 12/1952 24
Adams X2 LSWR class 'X2' 4-4-0 1890 LSWR SR     06/1890 11/1942 20
Manson D38 GNSR class 'Q' 4-4-0 1890 GNSR LNER         3
Manson D43 GNSR class 'P' 4-4-0 1890 GNSR LNER         0
Aspinall 1093 LYR class '1093' 4-4-0 1891 LYR LMS         40
Aspinall 1093 LYR class '3' 4-4-0 1891 LYR LMS         40
Johnson 2P   4-4-0 1891 MR LMS   40400 - 40562 06/1891 22/09/1962 143
Johnson 1312   4-4-0 1891 MR LMS     11/1876 11/1930 10
Worsdell D17   4-4-0 1892 NER LNER   62111 - 62112 06/1896 07/02/1948 50
Adams T3 LSWR class 'T3' 4-4-0 1892 LSWR SR     12/1892 08/1945 20
Johnson 2183   4-4-0 1892 MR LMS     1892 02/1961 20
Manson 8 GSWR class '8' 4-4-0 1892 GSWR LMS 1P   05/1892 07/1933 57
Jones Strath HR class 'D' 4-4-0 1892 HR LMS 1P   05/1892 08/1930 12
Johnson 2203   4-4-0 1893 MR LMS     1893 09/1962 55
Johnson/Pickersgill D41   4-4-0 1893 GNSR LNER     12/1893 02/1953 32
Holmes D35 NBR class 'N' 4-4-0 1894 NBR LNER         24
Holmes/Reid D36 NBR class 'L' 4-4-0 1894 NBR LNER          
Johnson D52 MGNR class 'C' 4-4-0 1894 MGNR LNER         0
Johnson D53 MGNR class 'C' 4-4-0 1894 MGNR LNER         0
Johnson D54 MGNR class 'C' 4-4-0 1894 MGNR LNER         0
Lambie 13 CR class '13' 4-4-0 1894 CR LMS 1P       6
Dean Duke   4-4-0 1895   GWR   9054 - 9091 06/1896 07/1951 60
Pollitt D5 GCR class '11' 4-4-0 1895 GCR LNER     07/1895 03/1933 6
Adams T6 LSWR class 'T6' 4-4-0 1895 LSWR SR     09/1895 04/1943 10
Adams X6 LSWR class 'X6' 4-4-0 1895 LSWR SR     12/1895 12/1946 10
Manson 336 GSWR class '336' 4-4-0 1895 GSWR LMS         25
Sharp Stewart K2 FR class 'K2' 4-4-0 1896 FR LMS 1P       8
Worsdell D18 NER class 'Q1' 4-4-0 1896 NER LNER         0
McIntosh 721 CR class '721' 4-4-0 1896 CR LMS 2P       15
Ivatt D3 GNR class 'D3' 4-4-0 1896 GNR LNER   62000 - 62151     0
Ivatt D4 GNR class 'D2' 4-4-0 1896 GNR LNER 1P   12/1896 10/1951 51
Johnson 156   4-4-0 1896 MR LMS     1896 02/1961 35
Wainwright Flying Bedsteads   4-4-0 1896   SR   31013 - 31459 07/1896 03/1951 16
Jones Loch HR class 'B' 4-4-0 1896 HR LMS 2P   07/1896 04/1950 18
Worsdell D19 NER class 'M' 4-4-0 1897 NER LNER         0
Worsdell D19 NER class '3CC' 4-4-0 1897 NER LNER         0
Webb Iron Duke LNWR class 'Iron Duke' 4-4-0 1897 LNWR LMS     06/1897 05/1898 2
McIntosh 766 CR class '766 Super' 4-4-0 1897 CR LMS 2P       15
McIntosh 766 CR class '766' 4-4-0 1897 CR LMS 2P       15
Dean Badminton   4-4-0 1897   GWR   3292 - 3311 12/1897 05/1931 20
Pollitt D6 GCR class '11A' 4-4-0 1897 GCR LNER     09/1897 12/1947 33
Manson 11 GSWR class '11' 4-4-0 1897 GSWR LMS     04/1897 11/1934 1
Manson 11 GSWR class '11 Rbld' 4-4-0 1897 GSWR LMS     04/1897 11/1934 1
Drummond C HR class 'C' 4-4-0 1898 HR LMS 2P   07/1898 02/1953 20
Drummond BEN   4-4-0 1898   LMS   54397 - 54416 07/1898 03/1953 11
Webb Jubilee LNWR class 'Jubilee' 4-4-0 1898 LNWR LMS     05/1898 1924 38
Holmes 729 NBR class '729' 4-4-0 1898 NBR LNER     03/1898 02/1951 18
Ivatt D2 GNR class 'D1' 4-4-0 1898 GNR LNER   62150 - 62199 06/1898 06/1951 70
Ivatt D2 GNR class '1321' 4-4-0 1898 GNR LNER   62150 - 62199 06/1898 06/1951 70
Worsdell D20   4-4-0 1899 NER LNER 2P 62340 - 62397 08/1899 12/1957 60
Drummond Greyhounds LSWR class 'T9' 4-4-0 1899 LSWR SR   30113 - 30733 01/1899 07/1963 66
McIntosh 900 CR class '900 Super' 4-4-0 1899 CR LMS 2P       16
McIntosh 900 CR class '900' 4-4-0 1899 CR LMS 2P       16
Dean Bulldog   4-4-0 1899   GWR   3335 - 3455 10/1899 11/1951 121
Dean 3521 4-4-0   4-4-0 1899   GWR   3521 - 3560     40
Billinton Greybacks   4-4-0 1899   SR   32043 - 32073 12/1899 12/1951 12
Pickersgill/Heywood D40   4-4-0 1899 GNSR LNER   62260 - 62279 10/1900 09/1966 18
Manson 6 Rblds GSWR class '6 Rblds' 4-4-0 1899 GSWR LMS     05/1899 1930  
Holden D14 GER class 'S46' 4-4-0 1900 GER LNER     03/1900 03/1960 41
Holden D15   4-4-0 1900 GER LNER     12/1903 02/1960 70
Dean Atbara   4-4-0 1900   GWR         40
Billinton Scotchmen   4-4-0 1900   SR   32044 - 32074 05/1900 06/1951 7
Johnson 2606   4-4-0 1900 MR LMS     1900 11/1947 10
Drummond Small Hoppers LSWR class 'K10' 4-4-0 1901 LSWR SR   30135 - 30394 12/1901 06/1951 31
Webb Alfred The Great LNWR class 'Alfred The GReat' 4-4-0 1901 LNWR LMS         40
Robinson D9 GCR class '11B' 4-4-0 1901 GCR LNER   62300 - 62333 10/1901 07/1950 40
Robinson D9 GCR class '11C' 4-4-0 1901 GCR LNER   62300 - 62333 10/1901 07/1950 40
Robinson D9 GCR class '11D' 4-4-0 1901 GCR LNER   62300 - 62333 10/1901 07/1950 40
Maunsell D1   4-4-0 1901   SR   31145 - 31749 01/1901 11/11/1961 20
Wainwright Coppernobs   4-4-0 1901   SR   31057 - 31750 03/1901 12/1956 28
Pettigrew K3 FR class 'K3' 4-4-0 1901 FR LMS 1P       4
Johnson 4P   4-4-0 1902 MR LMS 4P 41000 - 41044 01/1902 01/1953 45
Johnson 3P   4-4-0 1902 MR LMS   40711 - 40762 01/1902 09/1952 22
Drummond S11 LSWR class 'S11' 4-4-0 1903 LSWR SR   30395 - 30404 06/1903 11/1954 10
Drummond Large Hoppers LSWR class 'L11' 4-4-0 1903 LSWR SR   30134 - 30442 05/1903 06/1952 40
Holmes D26 NBR class 'K' 4-4-0 1903 NBR LNER     05/1903 07/1926 12
Churchward City   4-4-0 1903   GWR   3440 05/1903 05/1961 10
Drummond Bulldogs LSWR class 'L12' 4-4-0 1904 LSWR SR   30415 - 30434 06/1904 03/1955 20
Whale Precursor LNWR class 'Precursor' 4-4-0 1904 LNWR LMS 2P/3P 58010 03/1904 06/1949 130
McIntosh 140 CR class '140 Super' 4-4-0 1904 CR LMS 2P       19
McIntosh 140 CR class '140' 4-4-0 1904 CR LMS 2P       19
Churchward County   4-4-0 1904   GWR     05/1904 11/1933 40
Manson 240 GSWR class '240' 4-4-0 1904 GSWR LMS 2P   10/1904 10/1934 15
Maunsell E1A   4-4-0 1905   SR   31019 - 31511 12/1905 11/11/1961 11
Wainwright E   4-4-0 1906   SR   31036 - 31587 02/1906 05/1955 15
Reid D32   4-4-0 1906 NBR LNER   62443 - 62454 10/1906 29/03/1951 12
Deeley 999   4-4-0 1907 MR LMS     03/1907 02/1929 10
Manson 18 GSWR class '18' 4-4-0 1907 GSWR LMS 2P   06/1907 10/1932 13
Worsdell D21 NER class 'R1' 4-4-0 1908 NER LNER     11/1908 09/02/1946 10
Drummond U   4-4-0 1908 HR LMS 2P   05/1908 03/1937 6
Dean Flower   4-4-0 1908   GWR         20
Whale Renown LNWR class 'Renown' 4-4-0 1908-06-00 LNWR LMS     0000 0000 0
Dean Bird   4-4-0 1909   GWR     05/1909 11/1951 15
Reid D29 NBR class 'J' 4-4-0 1909 NBR LNER   62400 - 62413 07/1909 14/11/1952 16
Reid D33 NBR class 'K' 4-4-0 1909 NBR LNER 3P 62455 - 62466 10/1909 09/1953 12
Cooke George V   4-4-0 1910 LNWR LMS   58011 - 58012 07/1910 22/05/1948 80
Cooke Queen Mary   4-4-0 1910 LNWR LMS     07/1910 11/1938 10
McIntosh 139 CR class '139 Y101' 4-4-0 1910 CR LMS 3P       11
McIntosh 139 CR class '139' 4-4-0 1910 CR LMS 3P       11
Stirling D24 HBR class 'J' 4-4-0 1910 HBR LNER         5
Adams 86 NSR class '86' 4-4-0 1910 NSR LMS 2P       4
Ivatt D1 GNR class 'D1' 4-4-0 1911 GNR LNER 1P 62203 - 62215 03/1911 11/1950 15
Drummond D15   4-4-0 1912   SR   30463 - 30472 02/1912 01/1956 10
Johnson/Fowler 483   4-4-0 1912 MR LMS         0
Reid D30 NBR class 'D30' 4-4-0 1912 NBR LNER   62417 - 62442 09/1912 25/06/1960 27
Reid D30 NBR class 'J' 4-4-0 1912 NBR LNER   62417 - 62442 09/1912 25/06/1960 27
Adams 38 NSR class '38' 4-4-0 1912 NSR LMS 2P       1
Drummond 131 GSWR class '131' 4-4-0 1913 GSWR LMS 3P   06/1913 12/1937 6
McIntosh 43 CR class '43' 4-4-0 1913 CR LMS 3P       11
Robinson D10 GCR class '11E' 4-4-0 1913 GCR LNER   62650 - 62659 08/1913 08/10/1955 10
Reid Glen NBR class 'K' 4-4-0 1913 NBR LNER   62467 - 62498 09/1913 17/12/1962 30
Pettigrew K4 FR class 'K4' 4-4-0 1913 FR LMS 2P       4
Pettigrew K4 FR class 'K4' 4-4-0 1913 FR LMS 2P       4
Johnson 2P   4-4-0 1914   LMS   40322 - 40326 04/1914 09/1956 5
Wainwright German Engines   4-4-0 1914   SR   31760 - 31781 1914 09/12/1961 22
Drummond 137 GSWR class '137' 4-4-0 1915 GSWR LMS 3P   01/1915 08/1937 6
Pickersgill 113 CR class '113' 4-4-0 1916 CR LMS 3P       16
Cumming 73   4-4-0 1917 HR LMS     1917 04/1936 3
Robinson Large/Scottish Director GCR class '11F' 4-4-0 1919 GCR LNER   62660 - 62694 12/1919 15/01/1962 35
Pickersgill 72 CR class '72' 4-4-0 1920 CR LMS 3P       32
Whitelegg 485 GSWR class '485' 4-4-0 1921 GSWR LMS     07/1921 12/1933 1
Hill D16   4-4-0 1923   LNER   62564 - 62620 06/1923 10/1960 10
Fowler Compound   4-4-0 1924   LMS   40900 - 41199 02/1924 07/1961 195
Maunsell L1   4-4-0 1926   SR   31753 - 31789 03/1926 10/02/1962 15
Gresley Shire/Hunt   4-4-0 1927   LNER   62700 - 62775 29/10/1927 03/07/1961 76
Fowler 2P   4-4-0 1928   LMS   40563 - 40700 03/1928 17/12/1962 136
Maunsell Schools   4-4-0 1930   SR   30900 - 30939 03/1930 30/12/1962 40
Dean/Collett Earl/Dukedog   4-4-0 1936   GWR   9000 - 9028 04/1936 10/1960 29