Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Donations

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 261 Today
» 3545 Yesterday
» 16568 Week
» 68453 Month
» 693808 Year
» 3720661 Total
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
Locomotives of the London and North Western Railway
Build Date LNWR Class LMS Class First LNWR Number Wheels Designer Manufacturer Order Number Works Number Withdrawn
04/1872     1201 0-4-0ST J. Ramsbottom Crewe Works ?? 1469 04/1905
04/1872     1202 0-4-0ST J. Ramsbottom Crewe Works ?? 1470 12/1904
04/1872     1203 0-4-0ST J. Ramsbottom Crewe Works ?? 1471 12/1931
04/1872     1204 0-4-0ST J. Ramsbottom Crewe Works ?? 1472 10/1930
04/1872     1205 0-4-0ST J. Ramsbottom Crewe Works ?? 1473 12/1872
04/1872     1206 0-4-0ST J. Ramsbottom Crewe Works ?? 1474 12/1947
04/1872     1207 0-4-0ST J. Ramsbottom Crewe Works ?? 1475 05/1904
04/1872     1208 0-4-0ST J. Ramsbottom Crewe Works ?? 1476 03/1904
04/1872     1209 0-4-0ST J. Ramsbottom Crewe Works ?? 1477 11/1927
04/1872     1210 0-4-0ST J. Ramsbottom Crewe Works ?? 1478 10/1946
1873     1290 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1642 1907
1873     1291 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1643
1873     1292 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1644 1908
1873     1293 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1645 1908
1873     1294 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1646 11/1910
1873     1295 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1647 1906
1873     1296 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1648 1908
1873     1297 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1649 1907
1873     1298 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1650 08/1901
1873     1299 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1651 10/1903
1873     1300 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1652 01/1904
02/1873     944 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1622 01/08/1953
03/1873     188 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1623 03/1902
03/1873     495 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1624 03/1902
03/1873     496 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1625 1907
03/1873     497 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1626 05/1910
03/1873     500 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1627 10/1903
03/1873     501 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1628 1906
03/1873     502 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1629 06/1911
03/1873     929 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1630 1908
03/1873     931 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1631 11/1930
03/1873     932 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1632 10/1934
03/1873     933 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1633 1908
03/1873     936 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1634 05/1924
03/1873     937 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1635 1907
03/1873     939 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1636 1908
03/1873     940 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1637 1908
04/1873     1130 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1639 05/1902
04/1873     1205 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1641 1932
04/1873     433 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1638 1906
04/1873     745 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1640 08/1915
05/1873     2071 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1653 08/1928
05/1873     2072 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1654 31/01/1948
05/1873     2073 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1655 1908
05/1873     2074 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1656 05/1902
05/1873     2075 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1657 05/1927
05/1873     2076 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1658 1908
05/1873     2077 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1659 1909
05/1873     2078 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1660 1907
05/1873     2079 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1661 11/1930
05/1873     2080 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1662 01/1903
05/1873     2081 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1663 06/1911
05/1873     2082 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1664 21/02/1948
05/1873     2083 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1665 08/1910
05/1873     2084 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1666 1908
05/1873     2085 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1667 24/07/1948
05/1873     2086 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1668 04/1913
05/1873     2087 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1669 1907
06/1873     2088 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1670 19/01/1952
06/1873     2089 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1671 08/1911
01/1874     107 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1762 06/1913
01/1874     113 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1763 1908
01/1874     734 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1764 1932
01/1874     976 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1765 1907
01/1874     982 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1766 03/1916
01/1874     983 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1767 06/1902
01/1874     984 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1768 10/1914
01/1874     985 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1769 02/1939
01/1874     986 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1770 02/05/1953
01/1874     987 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1771 06/1901
02/1874     601 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1773 05/1910
02/1874     606 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1774 02/1905
02/1874     616 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1775 07/1906
02/1874     688 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1776 1905
02/1874     695 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1777 1903
02/1874     741 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1778 03/1902
02/1874     988 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1772 1906
03/1874     1019 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1782 07/08/1948
03/1874     1021 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1783 12/1937
03/1874     2110 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1787 1908
03/1874     2111 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1788 1907
03/1874     2112 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1789 1907
03/1874     2113 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1790 03/1902
03/1874     2114 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1791 05/1902
03/1874     2115 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1792 1905
03/1874     2116 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1793 1905
03/1874     2117 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1794 28/08/1948
03/1874     2118 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1795 09/1903
03/1874     316 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1784 11/1930
03/1874     405 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1785 05/1902
03/1874     412 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1786 1904
03/1874     778 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1779
03/1874     784 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1780 1906
03/1874     811 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1781 1905
04/1874     2119 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1796 25/04/1953
04/1874     2120 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1797 1905
04/1874     2121 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1798 08/1901
04/1874     2122 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1799
04/1874     2123 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1800 1908
04/1874     2124 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1801 02/1913
04/1874 Precursor   2145 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1802 03/1894
08/1874 Precursor   1143 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1807 04/1894
08/1874 Precursor   1144 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1808 12/1892
08/1874 Precursor   2146 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1803 06/1893
08/1874 Precursor   2147 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1804 11/1895
08/1874 Precursor   2148 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1805 06/1893
08/1874 Precursor   2149 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1806 06/1893
09/1874 Precursor   1145 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1809 04/1894
09/1874 Precursor   1152 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1810 12/1892
09/1874 Precursor   1153 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1811 08/1895
09/1874 Precursor   1154 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1812 12/1892
09/1874 Precursor   1155 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1813 04/1894
09/1874 Precursor   402 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1814 06/1893
09/1874 Precursor   406 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1815 12/1892
09/1874 Precursor   408 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1816 04/1894
10/1874 Precursor   409 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1817 12/1892
10/1874 Precursor   413 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1818 06/1893
10/1874 Precursor   425 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1819 06/1893
10/1874 Precursor   426 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1820 02/1895
10/1874 Precursor   427 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1821 04/1894
12/1874     2160 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1862 1909
12/1874     2161 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1863 1907
12/1874     2162 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1864 08/1926
12/1874     2163 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1865 06/1952
12/1874     2164 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1866 04/1904
12/1874     2165 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1867 1906
12/1874     2166 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1868 1905
12/1874     2167 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1869 17/08/1950
12/1874     2168 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1870 01/1911
12/1874     2169 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1871 08/1904
12/1874 Precedent   2175 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1902 11/1894
1875     2220 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2004 08/1911
01/1875     1121 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1876 04/1924
01/1875     1122 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1877 04/1904
01/1875     1123 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1878 1908
01/1875     1124 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1879 02/1915
01/1875     1125 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1880 1907
01/1875     1126 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1881 1908
01/1875     1127 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1882
01/1875     1128 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1883 07/1926
01/1875     1129 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1884 1906
01/1875     1131 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1885 02/1905
01/1875     1133 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1886 06/1925
01/1875     653 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1872 1906
01/1875     684 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1873 05/1902
01/1875     716 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1874
01/1875     807 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1875 1907
02/1875 Precedent   2176 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1903 02/1896
03/1875 Precedent   2177 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1904 08/1895
03/1875 Precedent   2178 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1905 01/1894
03/1875 Precedent   2179 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1906 05/1897
03/1875 Precedent   2180 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1907 03/1897
03/1875 Precedent   2181 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1908 07/1907
03/1875 Precedent   2183 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1910 05/1895
03/1875 Precedent   2184 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1909 02/1895
03/1875 Precedent   2184 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1911 05/1897
04/1875 Precedent   2185 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1912 01/1896
04/1875 Precedent   2186 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1913 01/1896
04/1875 Precedent   2187 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1914 12/1896
04/1875 Precedent   2188 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1915 02/1895
04/1875 Precedent   2189 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1916 07/1897
04/1875 Precedent   2190 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1917 07/1932
04/1875 Precedent   2191 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1918 14/11/1934
04/1875 Precedent   2192 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1919 01/1894
05/1875     1134 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1887 08/1930
05/1875     1135 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1888 1906
05/1875     1136 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1889 1907
05/1875     1137 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1890 01/1905
05/1875     1196 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1896 1907
05/1875     122 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1891 10/1915
05/1875     170 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1892 1903
05/1875     172 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1893 05/1910
05/1875     175 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1894 03/1928
05/1875     2170 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1897 02/1946
05/1875     2171 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1898
05/1875     2172 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1899 16/10/1948
05/1875     2173 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1900 1907
05/1875     2174 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1901 03/1947
05/1875 Precedent   2193 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1920 01/1896
05/1875 Precedent   2194 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1921 10/1896
05/1875     964 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1895 12/1930
06/1875     181 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1922 1906
06/1875     203 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1923 14/03/1953
06/1875     37 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1924 08/1936
06/1875     41 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1925 1903
06/1875     46 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1926 03/1902
06/1875     55 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1927 03/1902
06/1875     58 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1928 12/1914
06/1875     78 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1929 03/1902
06/1875     82 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1930 01/1913
06/1875     83 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1931 1933
07/1875     100 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1933 04/1902
07/1875     101 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1934 04/1924
07/1875     105 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1935 03/1902
07/1875     106 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1936 10/1904
07/1875     108 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1937 12/1930
07/1875     112 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1938 1932
07/1875     171 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1939 05/1927
07/1875     174 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1940 05/1902
07/1875     877 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1941
07/1875     89 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1932 03/1913
08/1875     2195 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1964 1932
08/1875     2196 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1965 1907
08/1875     2197 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1966 04/1913
08/1875     2198 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1967 08/1930
08/1875     2199 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1968 1908
08/1875     2200 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1969 04/1914
08/1875     2201 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1970 1932
08/1875     2202 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1971 1905
08/1875     2203 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1972 06/1915
09/1875     2204 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1973 12/1930
09/1875     2205 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1974 12/1930
09/1875     2206 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1975 03/1901
09/1875     2207 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1976 02/1953
09/1875     2208 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1977 11/1903
09/1875     2209 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1978 1907
09/1875     2210 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1979 07/1906
09/1875     2211 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1980 03/1902
09/1875     2212 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1981 06/1911
09/1875     2213 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1982 03/1928
09/1875     2214 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1983 03/1936
11/1875     2221 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2005 1933
11/1875     2222 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2006
11/1875     2223 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2007 02/1909
11/1875     2224 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2008 06/1930
1876     2231 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2015 09/1906
02/1876     2225 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2009 04/1928
02/1876     2226 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2010 1945
02/1876     2227 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2011 08/1901
02/1876     2228 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2012 02/1909
02/1876     2229 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2013 11/1906
02/1876     2230 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2014 11/1936
03/1876     1114 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2018 08/1905
03/1876     1119 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2019 07/1908
03/1876     1161 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2022 05/1913
03/1876     225 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2017 06/1901
03/1876     62 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2016 05/1947
03/1876     650 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2021 04/1936
03/1876     775 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2020 06/1902
04/1876     1195 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2023 10/1910
06/1876     878 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2078 11/1934
08/1876 2234   2233 2-4-0T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2000 11/1897
09/1876 2234   2234 2-4-0T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1984 01/1928
09/1876 2234   2235 2-4-0T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1985 11/1897
09/1876 2234   2236 2-4-0T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1986 11/1897
09/1876 2234   2237 2-4-0T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1987 11/1898
09/1876 2234   2238 2-4-0T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1988 09/1925
10/1876 2234   2239 2-4-0T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1989 01/1897
10/1876 2234   2240 2-4-0T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1990 02/1936
10/1876 2234   2241 2-4-0T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1991 01/1897
11/1876     1006 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2059 09/1925
11/1876     1110 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2060 04/1904
11/1876     1142 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2061 03/10/1953
11/1876     1179 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2062
11/1876     12 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2063 09/1937
11/1876     18 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2064 05/1902
11/1876 2234   2242 2-4-0T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1992 10/1898
11/1876 2234   2243 2-4-0T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1993 10/1927
11/1876 2234   2244 2-4-0T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1994 07/1930
11/1876 2234   2245 2-4-0T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1995 07/1898
11/1876     2253 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2068 10/1907
11/1876     2254 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2069 12/1930
11/1876     2255 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2070
11/1876     2256 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2071 08/11/1947
11/1876     2257 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2072 07/1905
11/1876     2258 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2073 03/1928
11/1876     370 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2054 08/1908
11/1876     40 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2065 03/1905
11/1876     856 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2055 09/1914
11/1876     884 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2056 12/1908
11/1876     918 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2057 02/1904
11/1876     920 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2066 02/1909
11/1876     924 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2067 05/1906
11/1876     962 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2058 03/1920
12/1876 2234   2246 2-4-0T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1996 04/1897
12/1876 2234   2247 2-4-0T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1997 03/1936
12/1876 2234   2248 2-4-0T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1998 1925
12/1876 2234   2249 2-4-0T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 1999 12/1897
12/1876 2234   2250 2-4-0T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2001 01/1898
12/1876 2234   2251 2-4-0T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2002 03/1896
1877     2268 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2084 08/1910
1877     2269 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2085 09/1906
1877     2270 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2086 10/1907
1877     2271 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2087 10/1910
1877     2272 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2088 10/1903
1877     881 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2081 07/1926
1877     882 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2082 06/1911
1877     911 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2083 08/1905
01/1877 2234   2252 2-4-0T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2003 1933
03/1877     2273 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2089 10/1929
03/1877     2274 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2090 01/1952
03/1877     2275 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2091 1933
03/1877     2276 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2092 01/1950
03/1877     2277 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2093 01/1915
04/1877 Precedent   1177 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2035 03/1896
04/1877 Precedent   857 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2036 07/1897
04/1877 Precedent   890 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2034 02/1895
05/1877 Precedent   1105 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2047 12/1897
05/1877 Precedent   1189 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2045 06/1897
05/1877 Precedent   858 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2037 05/1897
05/1877 Improved Precedent   858 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 3745 07/1912
05/1877 Renewed Precedent   858 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 3745 07/1912
05/1877 Precedent   860 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2038 11/1894
05/1877 Precedent   861 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2039 09/1901
05/1877 Precedent   862 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2040 07/1897
05/1877 Precedent   863 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2041 10/1907
05/1877 Precedent   864 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2042 03/1896
05/1877 Precedent   865 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2043 07/1894
05/1877 Precedent   866 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2044 01/1896
05/1877 Precedent   883 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2046 08/1894
06/1877 Precedent   867 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2048 07/1894
06/1877 Precedent   868 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2049 10/1896
06/1877 Precedent   869 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2050 11/1896
06/1877 Precedent   870 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2051 03/1898
06/1877 Precedent   871 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2052 05/1894
06/1877 Precedent   872 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2053 08/1895
06/1877     873 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2074 10/1930
06/1877     874 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2075 08/1906
06/1877     875 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2076 01/1907
06/1877     876 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2077 05/1934
06/1877     879 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2079 05/1902
07/1877 Improved Precedent   862 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 3779 08/1931
07/1877 Renewed Precedent   862 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 3779 08/1931
07/1877     880 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2080 08/1909
09/1877 2234   1167 2-4-0T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2117 12/1897
09/1877 2234   1176 2-4-0T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2118 02/1897
09/1877 2234   1184 2-4-0T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2114 09/1896
09/1877 2234   1185 2-4-0T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2115 04/1898
09/1877 2234   681 2-4-0T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2119 02/1897
09/1877 2234   892 2-4-0T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2121 04/1896
09/1877 2234   896 2-4-0T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2120 01/1896
09/1877 2234   951 2-4-0T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2116 09/1898
10/1877 2234   2278 2-4-0T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2123 15/03/1952
10/1877 2234   2279 2-4-0T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2124 04/1897
10/1877 2234   2280 2-4-0T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2125 06/1924
10/1877 2234   842 2-4-0T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2122 01/1896
12/1877 2234   2281 2-4-0T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2126 12/1897
12/1877 2234   2282 2-4-0T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2127 08/1896
12/1877 2234   2283 2-4-0T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2128 12/1897
12/1877 2234   2284 2-4-0T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2129 05/1898
12/1877 2234   2285 2-4-0T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2130 11/1897
12/1877 2234   2286 2-4-0T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2131 05/1897
12/1877 2234   2287 2-4-0T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2132 02/1897
12/1877 2234   2288 2-4-0T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2133 01/1898
1878     1138 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2152 03/1910
1878     1140 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2153 06/1902
1878     1186 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2149 03/1911
1878     916 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2151 10/1903
01/1878     2290 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2135 05/1930
01/1878     2291 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2136 06/1911
01/1878     2292 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2137 12/1930
01/1878     2293 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2138 05/1919
01/1878     2294 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2139
01/1878     2295 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2140 06/1924
01/1878     2296 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2141 11/1937
01/1878     2297 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2142 09/1930
01/1878     2298 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2143 14/02/1948
02/1878     1172 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2148 07/1932
02/1878     2299 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2144 10/1934
02/1878     2300 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2145 03/1915
02/1878     2301 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2146 10/1949
02/1878     2302 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2147 11/1924
02/1878     915 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2150 1932
08/1878 Precedent   1173 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2219 01/1894
08/1878 Precedent   1193 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2220 08/1896
09/1878 Precursor   1149 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2231 04/1894
09/1878 Precedent   1170 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2224 1931
09/1878 Precedent   1183 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2227 08/1896
09/1878 Precedent   1187 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2228 07/1896
09/1878 Precedent   1194 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2221 12/1896
09/1878 Precedent   193 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2226 03/1897
09/1878 Precedent   517 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2223 01/1896
09/1878 Precedent   749 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2222 05/1895
09/1878 Precedent   919 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2225 12/1893
10/1878 Precursor   1147 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2229 04/1894
10/1878 Precursor   1148 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2230 04/1894
10/1878 Precursor   1150 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2232 06/1893
10/1878 Precursor   1151 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2233 05/1895
10/1878 Precursor   1169 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2235 12/1892
10/1878 Precursor   1174 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2236 06/1893
10/1878 Precursor   697 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2237 04/1894
10/1878 Precursor   847 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2238 02/1895
11/1878 Precursor   1165 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2234 12/1892
12/1878     155 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2333 17/08/1950
1879     1158 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2273 1909
1879     1159 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2274 06/1913
1879     2336 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2261
1879     2337 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2262
1879     2344 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2269 05/1902
01/1879 2234   1178 2-4-0T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2245 04/1897
01/1879 2234   1181 2-4-0T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2243 03/1898
01/1879 2234   1188 2-4-0T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2246 12/1897
01/1879 2234   1191 2-4-0T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2247 08/1896
01/1879 2234   1192 2-4-0T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2248 10/1895
01/1879 Precursor   255 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2253 02/1895
01/1879 2234   351 2-4-0T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2242 06/1898
01/1879 Precursor   431 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2249 12/1892
01/1879 Precursor   481 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2251 12/1892
01/1879     614 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2260 03/1952
01/1879 Precursor   626 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2252 02/1895
01/1879 2234   668 2-4-0T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2240 04/1897
01/1879 2234   669 2-4-0T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2241 09/1895
01/1879 Precursor   680 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2254 02/1895
01/1879 4ft 6 Tanks   71 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2239 12/1909
01/1879 Precursor   838 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2250 09/1895
01/1879 2234   841 2-4-0T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2244 11/1896
01/1879     968 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2259 05/1947
02/1879 Precursor   1180 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2258 02/1895
02/1879     2338 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2263 1933
02/1879     2339 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2264 09/1904
02/1879     2340 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2265 06/1927
02/1879     2341 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2266
02/1879     2342 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2267 05/1902
02/1879     2343 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2268 02/1935
02/1879 Precursor   338 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2255 12/1892
02/1879 Precursor   718 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2256 06/1893
02/1879 Precursor   779 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2257 06/1893
03/1879     2345 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2270 10/1929
03/1879     670 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2272
03/1879     713 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2271 08/1926
04/1879     2346 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2275 01/08/1953
04/1879     2347 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2276 04/1927
04/1879     2348 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2277
04/1879     2349 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2278
10/1879     17 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2320
10/1879     21 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2321 12/1930
10/1879     24 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2322
10/1879     27 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2323 1933
10/1879     849 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2319 12/1930
11/1879     116 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2326 12/1934
11/1879     138 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2324 07/1913
11/1879     72 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2325
12/1879     126 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2327 01/1936
12/1879     137 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2328 03/1934
12/1879     143 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2329 04/1902
12/1879     146 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2330 01/1928
12/1879     153 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2331
12/1879     154 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2332 09/1930
12/1879     159 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2334 10/1946
12/1879     160 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2335 04/1927
12/1879     162 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2336 03/1928
1880     2382 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2375 06/1902
01/1880     163 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2337 08/1929
01/1880     176 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2338 05/1927
03/1880 4ft 6 Tanks   361 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2309 06/1911
04/1880 4ft 6 Tanks   228 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2310 01/1911
05/1880     2360 0-4-0WT F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2214 08/1927
05/1880     2361 0-4-0WT F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2215 08/1927
05/1880     2362 0-4-0WT F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2216 08/1927
05/1880     2363 0-4-0WT F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2217 02/1926
05/1880     2364 0-4-0WT F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2218 1942
05/1880 4ft 6 Tanks   677 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2311 12/1909
05/1880 4ft 6 Tanks   979 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2312 01/1914
06/1880 Express Goods   2365 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2379 07/04/1951
06/1880     2366 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2359 06/1929
06/1880     2367 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2360 06/1930
06/1880     2368 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2361 12/1937
06/1880     2369 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2362 05/1902
06/1880     2370 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2363 1945
06/1880     2371 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2364
06/1880     2372 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2365 10/1919
06/1880 4ft 6 Tanks   322 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2314 1908
06/1880 4ft 6 Tanks   326 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2315 01/1913
06/1880 4ft 6 Tanks   327 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2316 09/1912
06/1880 4ft 6 Tanks   328 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2317 11/1912
06/1880 4ft 6 Tanks   917 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2313 1908
07/1880     2373 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2366 1932
07/1880     2374 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2367
07/1880     2375 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2368 11/1935
07/1880     2376 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2369 07/1926
07/1880     2377 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2370 02/1914
07/1880     2378 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2371 08/1913
07/1880     2379 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2372
07/1880     2380 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2373 05/06/1948
07/1880     2381 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2374
07/1880 2234   329 2-4-0T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2318 02/1898
08/1880     226 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2376 1933
08/1880     2383 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2384
08/1880     2384 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2385 05/1950
08/1880     2385 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2386 10/1929
08/1880     2386 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2387 1933
08/1880     2387 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2388 12/1915
08/1880     2388 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2389 07/1901
08/1880     2389 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2390 12/1930
08/1880     352 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2377 05/1902
08/1880     354 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2378
08/1880     360 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2380 10/1935
08/1880     362 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2381 12/1930
08/1880     375 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2382
08/1880     376 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2383 03/1913
10/1880 Precedent   619 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2400 02/1896
10/1880 Precedent   789 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2401 07/1894
11/1880 Precedent   477 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2402 01/1896
11/1880 Precedent   478 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2403 08/1896
11/1880 Precedent   480 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2404 02/1897
11/1880 Precedent   482 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2405 01/1894
11/1880 Precedent   506 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2406 07/1896
11/1880 Precedent   512 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2407 08/1929
11/1880 Precedent   514 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2408 10/1895
11/1880 Precedent   945 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2409 05/1895
12/1880     233 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2414 03/1946
12/1880     2390 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2391 03/1952
12/1880     2391 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2392 05/1924
12/1880     2392 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2393 05/1915
12/1880     2393 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2394 09/1947
12/1880     2394 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2395 10/1940
12/1880     2395 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2396 11/1936
12/1880     2396 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2397 12/1928
12/1880     2397 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2398 29/05/1948
12/1880     2398 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2399 04/1928
12/1880     2399 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2410 04/1928
12/1880     2400 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2411 04/1930
12/1880     2401 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2412 1933
12/1880     2402 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2413 11/1931
12/1880     700 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2415 08/1935
12/1880     720 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2416 09/1929
12/1880     993 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2417 1933
1881 4ft 6 Tanks   1108 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2435 10/1912
1881 4ft 6 Tanks   2359 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2434 08/1911
1881 4ft 6 Tanks   238 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2431 10/1910
1881 4ft 6 Tanks   250 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2432 08/1914
1881 4ft 6 Tanks   289 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2438 01/1912
1881 4ft 6 Tanks   56 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2433 1907
1881 4ft 6 Tanks   783 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2436 04/1910
1881 4ft 6 Tanks   963 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2437 09/1912
01/1881     1010 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2419 05/1902
01/1881     1103 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2420 03/1953
01/1881     43 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2421 10/1929
01/1881     45 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2422 09/1936
01/1881     48 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2423 07/1929
01/1881     53 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2424 01/1949
01/1881     704 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2425 12/1930
01/1881     714 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2426 04/1950
01/1881     750 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2429 1933
01/1881     845 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2418 04/1913
01/1881     851 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2428 11/1935
01/1881     961 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2427 01/1919
03/1881 4ft 6 Tanks   956 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2430 04/1911
05/1881     2403 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2440 12/1930
05/1881     2404 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2441 11/1928
05/1881     2405 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2442 03/10/1953
05/1881     2406 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2443 12/1937
05/1881     2407 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2444 10/1928
05/1881     2408 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2445 05/1946
05/1881     2409 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2446 08/1926
05/1881     2410 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2447 03/1930
05/1881     2411 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2448 06/1924
05/1881     2412 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2449 24/04/1948
05/1881     2413 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2450 04/1939
05/1881     2414 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2451 03/1949
05/1881     2415 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2452 1933
05/1881     2416 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2453 24/01/1948
05/1881     2417 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2454 1932
05/1881     2418 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2455
05/1881 4ft 6 Tanks   57 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2439 03/1919
06/1881     2419 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2456 02/1935
06/1881     2420 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2457 08/1927
06/1881     2421 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2458 1932
06/1881     2422 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2459 17/08/1950
06/1881     2423 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2460 03/1930
06/1881     2424 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2461 1907
06/1881     2425 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2462 08/1929
06/1881     2426 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2463
06/1881     2427 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2464 04/1918
06/1881     2428 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2465 05/1913
06/1881     2429 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2466 06/1927
06/1881     2430 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2467 04/1924
06/1881     2431 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2468 03/1952
06/1881     2432 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2469 10/1935
09/1881     102 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2477 09/1934
09/1881     1060 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2476 12/1938
09/1881     119 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2478 02/1946
09/1881     141 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2479 08/1928
09/1881     602 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2470 1932
09/1881     627 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2471 06/1927
09/1881     703 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2473 08/1946
09/1881     766 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2475 11/1946
09/1881     957 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2474 1932
09/1881     971 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2472 01/1929
10/1881     205 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2481 31/12/1949
10/1881     207 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2482 02/1929
10/1881     208 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2483 1931
10/1881     227 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2484 11/1938
10/1881     232 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2487 13/11/1948
10/1881     313 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2480 08/1928
10/1881     68 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2485 08/1932
10/1881     850 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2486 01/1937
11/1881     239 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2488 18/09/1948
11/1881     241 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2489 09/1932
11/1881     242 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2490 11/1932
11/1881     243 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2491 09/1925
11/1881     244 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2492 11/1947
12/1881     142 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2499 07/1922
12/1881     246 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2493 01/1949
12/1881     247 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2494 01/1936
12/1881     248 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2495 04/1938
12/1881     249 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2496 08/1938
12/1881     251 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2497 06/1930
12/1881     252 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2498 09/04/1955
1882 4ft 6 Tanks   1002 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2530 12/1909
1882 4ft 6 Tanks   1011 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2522 1907
1882 4ft 6 Tanks   1071 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2524 04/1910
1882 4ft 6 Tanks   131 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2527 03/1914
1882 4ft 6 Tanks   132 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2528 03/1913
1882 4ft 6 Tanks   136 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2529 06/1915
1882 4ft 6 Tanks   217 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2525 01/1911
1882 4ft 6 Tanks   524 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2533 1908
1882 4ft 6 Tanks   621 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2516 08/1910
1882 4ft 6 Tanks   630 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2517 1908
1882 4ft 6 Tanks   67 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2518 1908
1882 4ft 6 Tanks   674 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2534 07/1912
1882 4ft 6 Tanks   705 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2521 1908
1882 4ft 6 Tanks   707 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2532 1907
1882 4ft 6 Tanks   887 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2531 1909
1882 4ft 6 Tanks   888 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2526 06/1911
01/1882     2453 0-4-0WT F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2511 1942
01/1882     2454 0-4-0WT F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2512 08/1927
01/1882     2455 0-4-0WT F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2513 08/1926
01/1882     2456 0-4-0WT F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2514 08/1927
01/1882     2457 0-4-0WT F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2515 06/1930
01/1882 Precedent   253 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2501 02/1895
01/1882 Precedent   254 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2502 02/1895
01/1882 Precedent   256 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2503 08/1894
01/1882 Precedent   257 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2504 04/1915
01/1882 Precedent   260 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2505 10/1895
01/1882 Precedent   262 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2506 01/1897
01/1882 Precedent   264 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2507 01/1896
01/1882 Precedent   265 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2508 07/1894
01/1882 Experiment   66 2-(2-2)-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2500 02/1905
02/1882 Precedent   364 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2509 08/1894
02/1882 Precedent   955 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2510 10/1912
03/1882 4ft 6 Tanks   798 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2519 04/1924
03/1882 4ft 6 Tanks   965 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2520 04/1910
04/1882 4ft 6 Tanks   969 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2523 1924
07/1882 4ft 6 Tanks   1107 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2535 1909
07/1882     2433 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2536 1932
07/1882     2434 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2537 03/1950
07/1882     2435 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2538 21/01/1950
07/1882     2436 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2539
07/1882     2437 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2540 1933
07/1882     2438 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2541 03/1936
07/1882     2439 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2542 09/1937
07/1882     2440 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2543 14/04/1951
07/1882     2441 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2544 1933
07/1882     2442 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2545 1932
07/1882     2443 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2546 01/1951
07/1882     2444 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2547 10/1939
07/1882     2445 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2548 1924
07/1882     2446 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2549 1907
07/1882     2447 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2550 12/1930
07/1882     2448 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2551
07/1882     2449 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2552 1932
08/1882     2458 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2556 11/1947
08/1882     2459 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2557 06/1927
08/1882     2460 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2558 12/1930
08/1882     2461 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2559 07/1937
08/1882     2462 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2560 1931
08/1882     2463 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2561 30/09/1954
08/1882     605 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2566 11/1928
08/1882     701 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2564 04/1946
08/1882     770 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2565 30/04/1954
08/1882     991 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2563 11/1928
08/1882     996 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2562 11/1930
09/1882     140 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2572 1932
09/1882     157 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2573 1931
09/1882     158 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2574 04/1927
09/1882     267 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2575 1932
09/1882     268 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2587 03/1936
09/1882     269 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2588 12/1945
09/1882     270 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2589 10/1928
09/1882     292 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2569 04/1946
09/1882     611 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2567 08/1947
09/1882     679 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2570 31/08/1953
09/1882     682 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2568 03/1946
09/1882     693 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2585 11/1930
09/1882     717 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2571 11/1946
09/1882     997 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2586 10/1934
10/1882 Express Goods   2464 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2576 09/1931
11/1882     2450 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2553 05/1952
11/1882     2451 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2554 12/1934
11/1882     2452 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2555 08/1932
11/1882 Express Goods   2465 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2577 24/02/1951
11/1882 Express Goods   2466 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2578 02/1936
11/1882 Express Goods   2467 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2579 17/05/1952
11/1882 Express Goods   2468 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2580 07/1948
11/1882 Express Goods   2469 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2581 01/1950
11/1882 Express Goods   2470 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2582 08/1935
11/1882 Express Goods   2471 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2583 09/1929
11/1882 Express Goods   2472 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2584 10/1932
1883 4ft 6 Tanks   2494 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2675 08/1911
1883 4ft 6 Tanks   2495 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2676 04/1911
1883 4ft 6 Tanks   2496 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2677 05/1902
1883 4ft 6 Tanks   2497 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2678 1907
1883 4ft 6 Tanks   2498 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2679 06/1911
1883 4ft 6 Tanks   2499 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2680 02/1920
1883 4ft 6 Tanks   2512 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2693 10/1910
01/1883     1009 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2597 16/10/1948
01/1883     272 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2590 10/1947
01/1883     273 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2591 11/1949
01/1883     274 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2592 04/1928
01/1883     277 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2593 08/1955
01/1883     281 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2594 04/1927
01/1883     673 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2595 06/1946
01/1883     797 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2596 11/1944
02/1883     1015 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2600 09/1924
02/1883     2473 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2605 04/1927
02/1883     2474 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2606 05/1928
02/1883     2475 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2607 12/1934
02/1883     2476 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2608 09/1944
02/1883     2477 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2609 07/1933
02/1883     2478 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2610 06/1926
02/1883 Experiment   300 2-(2-2)-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2625 07/1905
02/1883     607 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2602 02/1928
02/1883     615 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2604 01/1948
02/1883     629 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2598 11/1944
02/1883     671 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2601 1933
02/1883     690 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2603 03/1946
02/1883     747 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2599 24/05/1952
03/1883     2479 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2611 05/1929
03/1883     2480 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2612 03/1949
03/1883     2481 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2613 12/1947
03/1883     2482 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2614 03/1926
03/1883     2483 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2615 07/1934
03/1883     2484 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2616 11/1936
03/1883     2485 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2617 10/1947
03/1883     2486 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2618 11/1932
03/1883     2487 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2619 09/1932
03/1883 Experiment   301 2-(2-2)-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2626 10/1904
04/1883     2488 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2620 07/1934
04/1883     2489 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2621 04/1926
04/1883     2490 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2622 01/1947
04/1883     2491 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2623 12/1945
04/1883     2492 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2624 09/1926
04/1883 Experiment   302 2-(2-2)-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2627 07/1905
04/1883 Experiment   303 2-(2-2)-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2628 01/1905
05/1883 4ft 6 Tanks   1014 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2630 1907
05/1883 4ft 6 Tanks   1059 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2634 11/1910
05/1883 4ft 6 Tanks   282 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2636 1906
05/1883 4ft 6 Tanks   284 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2637 07/1928
05/1883 4ft 6 Tanks   286 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2638 12/1930
05/1883 4ft 6 Tanks   287 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2639 1933
05/1883 4ft 6 Tanks   288 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2640 1931
05/1883 4ft 6 Tanks   686 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2633 06/1919
05/1883 4ft 6 Tanks   691 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2629 10/1924
05/1883 4ft 6 Tanks   769 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2635 10/1927
05/1883 4ft 6 Tanks   891 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2631 08/1927
05/1883 4ft 6 Tanks   894 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2632 1908
06/1883 4ft 6 Tanks   294 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2641 01/1925
06/1883 4ft 6 Tanks   297 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2642 11/1930
06/1883 4ft 6 Tanks   298 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2643 04/1927
06/1883 4ft 6 Tanks   299 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2644 1931
07/1883     1004 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2659 09/1938
07/1883     110 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2661 12/1947
07/1883     148 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2662 12/1947
07/1883 Experiment   305 2-(2-2)-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2669 06/1904
07/1883 Experiment   306 2-(2-2)-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2670 07/1905
07/1883 Experiment   307 2-(2-2)-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2671 02/1905
07/1883     42 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2660 07/1946
07/1883     518 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2653 03/1928
07/1883 Experiment   519 2-(2-2)-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2673 02/1905
07/1883 Experiment   520 2-(2-2)-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2672 04/1905
07/1883 4ft 6 Tanks   522 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2646 1908
07/1883 4ft 6 Tanks   523 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2647 08/1925
07/1883 4ft 6 Tanks   529 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2648 10/1925
07/1883     617 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2651 11/1934
07/1883     678 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2652 06/1927
07/1883     692 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2655 10/1951
07/1883     694 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2654 04/1937
07/1883     698 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2656 1932
07/1883     780 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2657 04/1927
07/1883     952 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2649 10/1938
07/1883     953 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2650 11/1936
07/1883     959 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2658 11/1935
07/1883 4ft 6 Tanks   §21 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2645 01/1926
08/1883     150 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2663 03/1928
08/1883     169 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2664 01/1947
08/1883     178 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2665 01/1920
08/1883     179 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2666 1931
08/1883     223 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2667 1931
08/1883     259 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2668 01/1949
09/1883 4ft 6 Tanks   2493 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2674 05/1925
10/1883     1106 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2694 10/1947
10/1883     1109 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2695 07/1928
10/1883 4ft 6 Tanks   2500 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2681 1931
10/1883 4ft 6 Tanks   2501 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2682 1931
10/1883 4ft 6 Tanks   2502 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2683 1902
10/1883 4ft 6 Tanks   2503 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2684 1907
10/1883 4ft 6 Tanks   2504 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2685 06/1924
10/1883 4ft 6 Tanks   2505 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2686 1924
10/1883 4ft 6 Tanks   2506 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2687 11/1932
10/1883 4ft 6 Tanks   2507 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2688 11/1910
10/1883 4ft 6 Tanks   2508 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2689 1908
10/1883 4ft 6 Tanks   2509 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2690 10/1927
10/1883 4ft 6 Tanks   2510 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2691 1931
10/1883 4ft 6 Tanks   2511 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2692 02/1920
11/1883     1101 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2698 07/1931
11/1883     1112 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2699 10/1950
11/1883     1118 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2701 06/1947
11/1883     324 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2696 06/1927
11/1883     373 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2700 11/1935
11/1883     491 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2703 03/1928
11/1883     848 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2697 05/1927
11/1883     981 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2702 01/1937
12/1883     1013 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2705 02/10/1948
12/1883     149 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2704 1932
12/1883     367 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2706 04/1927
12/1883     489 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2707 10/1927
12/1883     490 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2708 11/1935
12/1883     492 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2709 12/1930
1884 4ft 6 Tanks   3 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2732 01/1907
01/1884 Experiment   311 2-(2-2)-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2734 07/1905
01/1884     925 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2710 10/1928
01/1884     926 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2711 1932
01/1884     927 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2712 12/1945
01/1884     928 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2713 1932
02/1884 Experiment   315 2-(2-2)-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2735 07/1905
02/1884 Experiment   321 2-(2-2)-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2736 01/1905
02/1884 Experiment   323 2-(2-2)-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2737 03/1905
02/1884 Experiment   333 2-(2-2)-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2738 11/1904
02/1884 Experiment   353 2-(2-2)-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2739 07/1905
02/1884 Experiment   363 2-(2-2)-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2740 02/1905
03/1884 4ft 6 Tanks   1017 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2726 08/1902
03/1884 Experiment   310 2-(2-2)-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2743 11/1904
03/1884 Experiment   365 2-(2-2)-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2741 04/1905
03/1884 Experiment   366 2-(2-2)-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2742 05/1905
03/1884 4ft 6 Tanks   708 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2727 02/1925
03/1884 4ft 6 Tanks   880 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2725 04/1924
04/1884 4ft 6 Tanks   1056 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2730 05/1932
04/1884 4ft 6 Tanks   1073 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2729 06/1926
04/1884     23 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2781 10/1927
04/1884     30 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2782 11/1928
04/1884     32 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2783 05/1932
04/1884     6 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2779 08/1954
04/1884 4ft 6 Tanks   768 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2728 1931
04/1884     8 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2780 03/1928
04/1884 4ft 6 Tanks   946 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2731 07/1926
05/1884 Experiment   1102 2-(2-2)-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2744 10/1904
05/1884 4ft 6 Tanks   2513 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2714 1906
05/1884 4ft 6 Tanks   2514 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2715 1931
05/1884 4ft 6 Tanks   2515 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2716 06/1924
05/1884 4ft 6 Tanks   2516 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2717 1919
05/1884 4ft 6 Tanks   2517 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2718 08/1922
05/1884 4ft 6 Tanks   2518 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2719 1908
05/1884 4ft 6 Tanks   2519 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2720 12/1930
05/1884 4ft 6 Tanks   2520 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2721 1907
05/1884 4ft 6 Tanks   2521 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2722 11/1930
05/1884 4ft 6 Tanks   2522 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2723 1907
05/1884 4ft 6 Tanks   2523 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2724 05/1926
05/1884 4ft 6 Tanks   5 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2733 01/1927
06/1884 Experiment   1104 2-(2-2)-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2746 01/1905
06/1884 Experiment   1111 2-(2-2)-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2748 02/1905
06/1884 Experiment   1113 2-(2-2)-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2747 08/1904
06/1884 Experiment   1120 2-(2-2)-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2745 12/1905
07/1884     1057 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2774 07/1947
07/1884 Experiment   1115 2-(2-2)-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2749 03/1905
07/1884 Experiment   1116 2-(2-2)-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2750 08/1905
07/1884 Experiment   1117 2-(2-2)-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2751 10/1904
07/1884 Experiment   372 2-(2-2)-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2752 06/1905
07/1884 Experiment   374 2-(2-2)-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2753 09/1905
07/1884     948 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2775 07/1927
08/1884     751 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2777 04/1938
09/1884     145 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2785 08/1928
09/1884     152 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2776 1935
09/1884     161 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2787 03/1948
09/1884     186 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2786 10/1954
09/1884     258 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2788 07/1927
09/1884 Dreadnought   503 2-(2-2)-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2795 04/1904
09/1884     63 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2784 04/1924
09/1884     994 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2778 07/1922
10/1884     1005 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2789 11/1946
10/1884     483 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2793 06/1928
10/1884 Dreadnought   508 2-(2-2)-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2796 02/1904
10/1884     947 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2790 07/1928
10/1884     949 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2791 07/1948
10/1884     950 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2792 12/1930
11/1884 4ft 6 Tanks   1001 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2768 10/1929
11/1884 4ft 6 Tanks   1003 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2764 08/1927
11/1884 4ft 6 Tanks   1008 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2770 06/1927
11/1884 4ft 6 Tanks   1058 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2771 07/1908
11/1884 4ft 6 Tanks   1060 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2767 05/1924
11/1884 4ft 6 Tanks   1072 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2772 04/1924
11/1884 4ft 6 Tanks   1074 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2773 1906
11/1884 4ft 6 Tanks   603 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2754 04/1924
11/1884 4ft 6 Tanks   740 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2755 01/1906
11/1884 4ft 6 Tanks   765 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2756 1933
11/1884 4ft 6 Tanks   893 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2760 1906
11/1884 4ft 6 Tanks   895 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2761 06/1922
11/1884 4ft 6 Tanks   977 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2757 04/1927
11/1884 4ft 6 Tanks   978 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2758 1906
11/1884 4ft 6 Tanks   980 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2759 02/1926
11/1884 4ft 6 Tanks   989 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2762 1907
11/1884 4ft 6 Tanks   990 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2763 1906
11/1884 4ft 6 Tanks   992 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2769 1907
11/1884 4ft 6 Tanks   998 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2765 11/1930
11/1884 4ft 6 Tanks   999 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2766 09/1932
12/1884     484 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2805 02/1920
12/1884     652 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2806 12/1930
12/1884     699 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2807 03/1928
12/1884     771 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2808 06/1947
12/1884     782 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2809 11/1922
12/1884     796 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2810 31/12/1954
12/1884     958 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2811 01/1947
1885 4ft 6 Tanks   1357 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2825 1906
1885 4ft 6 Tanks   1359 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2827 1907
1885 4ft 6 Tanks   1360 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2828 08/1911
1885 4ft 6 Tanks   1361 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2829 1907
1885 4ft 6 Tanks   1366 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2834 01/1911
01/1885     1012 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2814 07/1922
01/1885     1016 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2815 11/1932
01/1885     1075 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2816 06/1928
01/1885     1201 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2817 01/1948
01/1885     1202 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2818 09/1928
01/1885     1203 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2819 11/1947
01/1885     1204 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2820 1932
01/1885     1206 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2821 1932
01/1885     1207 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2822 30/09/1955
01/1885     1208 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2823 28/08/1948
01/1885     1209 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2824 01/1947
01/1885 4ft 6 Tanks   1358 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2826 01/1927
01/1885     966 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2812 19/06/1954
01/1885     970 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2813 07/1938
02/1885 Dreadnought   504 2-(2-2)-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2797 08/1904
03/1885 4ft 6 Tanks   1362 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2830 1931
03/1885 4ft 6 Tanks   1363 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2831 1905
03/1885 4ft 6 Tanks   1364 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2832 1907
03/1885 4ft 6 Tanks   1365 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2833 11/1927
03/1885 Dreadnought   507 2-(2-2)-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2798 07/1905
03/1885 Dreadnought   509 2-(2-2)-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2799 04/1904
04/1885     2362 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2868 09/1927
04/1885 Dreadnought   510 2-(2-2)-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2800 05/1904
05/1885 Dreadnought   511 2-(2-2)-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2801 08/1904
05/1885 Dreadnought   513 2-(2-2)-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2802 03/1904
05/1885 Dreadnought   515 2-(2-2)-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2803 11/1904
05/1885 Dreadnought   685 2-(2-2)-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2804 09/1904
07/1885 4ft 6 Tanks   1437 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2835 1909
07/1885 4ft 6 Tanks   1438 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2836 12/1926
07/1885 4ft 6 Tanks   1439 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2837 1905
07/1885 4ft 6 Tanks   1440 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2838 01/1926
07/1885 4ft 6 Tanks   1441 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2839 10/1925
07/1885 4ft 6 Tanks   1442 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2840 12/1930
07/1885 4ft 6 Tanks   1443 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2841 07/1926
07/1885 4ft 6 Tanks   1444 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2842 11/1924
07/1885 4ft 6 Tanks   1445 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2843 01/1926
07/1885 4ft 6 Tanks   1446 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2844 03/1926
07/1885 4ft 6 Tanks   2065 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2851 1933
07/1885 4ft 6 Tanks   2066 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2852 1906
07/1885 4ft 6 Tanks   2067 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2853 04/1926
07/1885 4ft 6 Tanks   2068 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2854 12/1930
07/1885 4ft 6 Tanks   2069 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2855 05/1924
07/1885 4ft 6 Tanks   2070 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2856 1902
07/1885 4ft 6 Tanks   383 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2845 10/1925
07/1885 4ft 6 Tanks   384 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2846 12/1930
07/1885 4ft 6 Tanks   385 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2847 1931
07/1885 4ft 6 Tanks   386 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2848 04/1930
07/1885 4ft 6 Tanks   387 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2849 12/1924
07/1885 4ft 6 Tanks   388 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2850 1909
07/1885 4ft 6 Tanks   389 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2857 08/1925
07/1885 4ft 6 Tanks   390 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2858 02/1926
07/1885 4ft 6 Tanks   391 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2859 1909
07/1885 4ft 6 Tanks   392 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2860 1907
07/1885 4ft 6 Tanks   835 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2861 1931
08/1885     216 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2920 06/1952
08/1885 4ft 6 Tanks   839 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2862 01/1928
08/1885 4ft 6 Tanks   844 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2863 02/1927
08/1885 4ft 6 Tanks   846 2-4-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2864 08/1925
10/1885 687   687 2-(2-2)-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2885 11/1901
12/1885 Dreadnought   2055 2-(2-2)-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2886 01/1905
12/1885 Dreadnought   2056 2-(2-2)-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2887 04/1904
12/1885 Dreadnought   2057 2-(2-2)-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2888 07/1904
12/1885 Dreadnought   2058 2-(2-2)-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2889 02/1905
12/1885 Dreadnought   2059 2-(2-2)-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2890 02/1905
12/1885 Dreadnought   2060 2-(2-2)-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2891 07/1904
12/1885 Dreadnought   2061 2-(2-2)-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2892 04/1905
12/1885 Dreadnought   2062 2-(2-2)-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2893 07/1905
12/1885 Dreadnought   2063 2-(2-2)-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2894 09/1904
12/1885 Dreadnought   2064 2-(2-2)-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2895 03/1905
03/1886 Dreadnought   173 2-(2-2)-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2896 08/1904
03/1886 Dreadnought   2 2-(2-2)-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2897 06/1904
04/1886     1210 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2865 04/1927
04/1886     2360 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2866 08/1938
04/1886     2361 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2867 11/1930
04/1886     2363 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2869 03/1936
04/1886     2364 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2870 12/1938
04/1886     2453 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2871 01/1944
04/1886     2454 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2872 13/11/1948
04/1886     2455 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2873 06/1928
04/1886     2456 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2874 05/1928
04/1886     2457 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2875 02/10/1948
06/1886 Dreadnought   1353 2-(2-2)-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2900 07/1904
06/1886 Dreadnought   1370 2-(2-2)-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2901 01/1904
06/1886 Dreadnought   1379 2-(2-2)-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2903 02/1905
06/1886 Dreadnought   1395 2-(2-2)-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2902 03/1904
06/1886 Dreadnought   1539 2-(2-2)-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2898 07/1904
06/1886 Dreadnought   410 2-(2-2)-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2899 04/1904
07/1886     210 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2880 12/06/1948
07/1886     240 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2879 05/07/1952
07/1886     355 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2876 11/1928
07/1886     357 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2877 05/1936
07/1886     359 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2878 10/11/1951
07/1886     369 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2881 09/1936
07/1886     436 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2882 1931
07/1886     438 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2884 12/1930
07/1886     452 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2883 1931
07/1886 Dreadnought   545 2-(2-2)-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2904 12/1903
07/1886 Dreadnought   659 2-(2-2)-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2905 05/1904
08/1886     120 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2906 01/1928
08/1886     123 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2918 03/1936
08/1886     183 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2919 10/1947
08/1886     192 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2912 12/1930
08/1886     211 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2913 07/1931
08/1886     215 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2909 16/12/1950
08/1886     220 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2914 10/1927
08/1886     221 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2916 04/1927
08/1886     237 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2917 09/1947
08/1886     261 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2907 28/08/1948
08/1886     266 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2908 30/09/1954
08/1886     293 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2910 1931
08/1886     296 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2911 04/1927
08/1886     407 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2921 31/03/1954
08/1886     440 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2915 09/1947
12/1886     1338 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2922 01/1935
12/1886     2010 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2923 04/1946
12/1886     224 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2938 03/1946
12/1886     411 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2936 1932
12/1886     417 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2937 07/10/1950
12/1886     429 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2925 02/1939
12/1886     442 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2924 05/1928
12/1886     549 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2939 07/1931
12/1886     551 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2940 12/1930
1887 Improved Precedent   1220 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2998 03/1921
1887 Renewed Precedent   1220 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2998 03/1921
1887 Improved Precedent   1487 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2999 04/1907
1887 Renewed Precedent   1487 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2999 04/1907
1887 Improved Precedent   1670 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 3001 12/1905
1887 Renewed Precedent   1670 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 3001 12/1905
02/1887 Express Goods   147 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2926 12/1947
02/1887     554 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2941 06/1927
02/1887     557 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2942 12/1944
02/1887     558 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2943 24/04/1948
02/1887     567 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2945 02/1936
02/1887     568 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2946 1928
02/1887     569 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2947 04/1947
02/1887     570 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2948 20/12/1952
02/1887     571 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2949 03/1936
02/1887     572 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2950 11/1930
02/1887     573 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2951 12/1924
02/1887     575 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2953 09/1946
02/1887     576 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2954 09/1950
02/1887     578 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2955 02/1950
02/1887     579 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2944 06/1927
02/1887     974 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2952 09/1930
03/1887 Express Goods   1382 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2928 06/1951
03/1887 Express Goods   1475 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2927 08/1932
03/1887 Express Goods   343 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2929 07/1929
04/1887 Express Goods   34 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2930 04/1946
04/1887 Express Goods   532 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2931 11/1933
04/1887 Express Goods   598 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2932 12/1932
05/1887 Express Goods   1022 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2934 02/1948
05/1887 Express Goods   1025 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2935 10/1931
05/1887 Express Goods   1026 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2933 01/1936
05/1887     125 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2964 04/1927
05/1887     129 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2956 07/1948
05/1887     135 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2958 1931
05/1887     435 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2963 10/1949
05/1887     443 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2957 1932
05/1887     580 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2959 04/1932
05/1887     582 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2960 14/08/1948
05/1887     584 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2961 1934
05/1887     585 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2962 21/08/1954
05/1887     588 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2965 1932
05/1887     589 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2966 01/1936
06/1887 Improved Precedent   1132 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2997 05/1906
06/1887 Renewed Precedent   1132 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2997 05/1906
06/1887 Improved Precedent   271 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2996 12/1927
06/1887 Renewed Precedent   271 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2996 12/1927
06/1887     493 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2974 01/1947
06/1887     590 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2967 01/1950
06/1887     591 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2968 12/1930
06/1887     592 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2969 30/09/1954
06/1887     594 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2970 11/1937
06/1887     595 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2971 1932
06/1887     596 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2972 30/09/1955
06/1887     597 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2973 10/1934
06/1887 600   600 2-(2-2)-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 3000 12/1901
07/1887     325 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2975 02/1948
11/1887 Express Goods   1027 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 3002 08/1932
11/1887 Express Goods   1028 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 3003 12/1932
11/1887 Express Goods   1029 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 3004 01/1933
11/1887 Express Goods   1030 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 3005 12/1935
11/1887 777   777 2-(2-4)-0T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2794 11/1901
12/1887 Improved Precedent   1485 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 3022 05/1914
12/1887 Renewed Precedent   1485 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 3022 05/1914
12/1887 Express Goods   722 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 3010 05/1934
12/1887 Express Goods   726 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 3011 11/1947
12/1887 Express Goods   822 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 3007 11/1930
12/1887 Express Goods   831 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 3008 12/1932
12/1887 Express Goods   836 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 3009 10/1932
12/1887 Express Goods   930 0-6-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 3006 08/1927
01/1888 Improved Precedent   1219 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 3027 02/1909
01/1888 Renewed Precedent   1219 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 3027 02/1909
01/1888 Improved Precedent   1522 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 3025 07/1932
01/1888 Renewed Precedent   1522 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 3025 07/1932
01/1888 Improved Precedent   1679 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 3026 12/1913
01/1888 Renewed Precedent   1679 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 3026 12/1913
01/1888 Improved Precedent   1749 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 3023 05/1915
01/1888 Renewed Precedent   1749 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 3023 05/1915
01/1888 Improved Precedent   275 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 3024 12/1909
01/1888 Renewed Precedent   275 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 3024 12/1909
02/1888 Improved Precedent   1527 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 3030 05/1925
02/1888 Renewed Precedent   1527 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 3030 05/1925
02/1888 Improved Precedent   1528 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 3029 02/1916
02/1888 Renewed Precedent   1528 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 3029 02/1916
02/1888 Improved Precedent   1681 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 3028 08/1911
02/1888 Renewed Precedent   1681 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 3028 08/1911
03/1888 Improved Precedent   1669 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 3031 01/1906
03/1888 Renewed Precedent   1669 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 3031 01/1906
03/1888 Dreadnought   637 2-(2-2)-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 3012 08/1904
04/1888 Dreadnought   638 2-(2-2)-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 3013 11/1904
05/1888 Dreadnought   639 2-(2-2)-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 3014 10/1904
05/1888 Dreadnought   640 2-(2-2)-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 3015 01/1904
05/1888 Dreadnought   641 2-(2-2)-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 3016 02/1904
05/1888 Dreadnought   643 2-(2-2)-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 3017 10/1904
06/1888 Dreadnought   644 2-(2-2)-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 3018 07/1904
06/1888 Dreadnought   645 2-(2-2)-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 3019 01/1905
06/1888 Dreadnought   647 2-(2-2)-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 3020 04/1904
06/1888 Dreadnought   648 2-(2-2)-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 3021 10/1904
06/1888     706 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2976 12/1945
07/1888     753 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2977 05/1927
09/1888     1031 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2986 03/1936
09/1888     1053 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2978 09/1928
09/1888     1054 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2979 31/10/1958
09/1888     1062 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2980 10/1927
09/1888     1063 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2981 1932
09/1888     1067 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2982 10/1949
09/1888     1068 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2983 27/01/1951
09/1888     1069 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2984 10/1934
09/1888     1076 0-6-2T F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 2985 1931
10/1888 Improved Precedent   1481 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 3043 05/1913
10/1888 Renewed Precedent   1481 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 3043 05/1913
10/1888 Improved Precedent   379 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 3044 02/1928
10/1888 Renewed Precedent   379 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 3044 02/1928
10/1888 Improved Precedent   941 2-4-0 F. Webb Crewe Works ?? 3042 04/1925
10/1888