Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 42 Today
» 753 Yesterday
» 2840 Week
» 14522 Month
» 167475 Year
» 1832851 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #163
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 14
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
L3 339   27/08/1921
L3 5368   27/09/1924
L3 5275   23/01/1932
L3 5276   28/04/1934
L3 5337   25/03/1939
L3 5369   28/06/1941
L3 5342   23/09/1944