Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 435 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 4927 Week
» 29761 Month
» 64093 Year
» 1729469 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1672
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 14
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
L3 367   03/1917
L3 5370   12/07/1930
L3 5366   28/04/1934
L3 5341   19/06/1937
L3 5276   27/01/1940