Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 117 Today
» 1069 Yesterday
» 1186 Week
» 1186 Month
» 68048 Year
» 1733424 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #648
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 14
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
L3 5345   15/09/1934
L3 5367   30/10/1937
L3 5337   28/06/1941
L3 5366   29/01/1944
L3 9061   06/12/1947